Bowerman et al v. Field Asset Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fred Bowerman and Julia Bowerman
Defendant: Field Asset Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00057
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 INTERIM ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 446 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Fred Bowerman. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 446 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 8/29/2018. Reply due by 9/19/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/28/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting 453 Stipulation. Deadlines reset as to 446 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 8/24/2018. Reply due by 9/7/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 9/26/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER DENYING 407 MOTION FOR CLASS DECERTIFICATION/RECONSIDERATION by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION, GRANTING DEFENDANTS 417 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ENTERING JUDGMENT FOR CLAIMANTS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON UCL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/18/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 408 MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. The Court will treat defendants' 407 motion to decertify as a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. The hearing on the motion is VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge William H. Orrick denying 360 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 308 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Advancing the hearing date on its 304 Motion to Dismiss Discovery Vendors For Discovery Violations. Response due by 6/28/2017. Reply due by 6/30/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 288 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME ON HEARING re 287 MOTION to Dismiss Purported Class Member Fred Acevedo. Responses due by 6/19/2017. Replies due by 6/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER ON DAUBERT MOTIONS AND TRIAL PLAN by Judge William H. Orrick re 220 Motion to Strike and 221 Motion to Strike. Additional days of jury trial set. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Denying 154 Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class; Granting 155 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 152 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 182 STIPULATION Modifying Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Decertification. Responses due by 2/1/2017. Replies due by 2/8/2017. Motion Hearing continued to2/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ON DISCOVERY 125 LETTER BRIEF FILED ON MAY 16, 2016 - Fact discovery cutoff: 11/4/2016. Dispositive motions to be heard by 1/11/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSAL FOR CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. By May 16, 2016, the parties shall file their proposal for continuing the case management deadlines. At the same time, the parties shall file a redlined questionnaire if they have not already reached agreement on that issue. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE re 109 Stipulation Regarding Discovery. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 94 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2015 is VACATED and RESET to 4/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2015. Discovery is not stayed during this continuance. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 65 RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 78 Summary Order. This order explains that the modifications plaintiffs made to the proposed class definition allow for common questions of law and fact to predominate over questions affecting only individual class members, and that plaintiffs motion establishes that the rest of the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 are satisfied. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUMMARY ORDER GRANTING RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 65 MOTION to Certify Class. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/26/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William H. Orrick denying 43 and 49 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiffs may attempt to redefine the class and file a further motion within 45 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline. The expert disclosure deadlines are continued indefinitely, and the trial date of December 1, 2014 is vacated. The Court will set a further Case Management Conference date in the Order on the pending motion, which the parties should expect within the next two weeks. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REQUEST FOR AND CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - Attorneys Susan T. Ye, Christopher Jay Borders, and Amy K. Jensen terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/26/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 24 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting as modified 25 STIPULATION OF PARTIES TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion to certify class to be heard by 5/14/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2014 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/1/2014 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/29/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowerman et al v. Field Asset Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Bowerman
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Bowerman
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Asset Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?