Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp. v. Jenzeh et al
Plaintiff: |
Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp. |
Defendant: |
Quantum Biotek Pty, Ltd., Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh and Omni Enviro, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00564 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Donna M. Ryu |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER 34 Approving Stipulation to Stay Declaratory Action. Case is Stayed. Motions terminated: 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Case Management Conference and Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed by Capitol Spe cialty Insurance Corp., 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss of Stay Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines Re: Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp., 22 MO TION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh, 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Declaratory Action filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Quantum Biotek Pty, Ltd., Michael Jenzeh, Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp., Stefanie Jenzeh, 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss of Stay filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER Deeming Case to be Related to C-12-01809-RMW. The Clerk shall reassign case to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Claudia Wilken is no longer assigned to the case. All hearings presently set before Judge Wilken are vacated. Parties are directed to re-notice any pending motions before Judge Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/2/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 25 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 20 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 13 REQUEST TO VACATE AND RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?