Leghorn et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Arley Leghorn and Valerie Leghorn
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation, Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00708
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting re 181 Letter filed by QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation for Amanda Raines to appear by phone on 12/5/14 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 181. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order Extending Stay and Continuing CMC re 162 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/9/2014 (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting re 164 Letter filed by QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation for Amanda Raines to appear by phone on 4/11/14 at 11 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/8/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS QBE'S MOTION TO CORRECT/AMEND ADMIN MOTION TO SEAL AND TO VACATE re 127 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/26/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING re 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Arley Leghorn, Valerie Leghorn. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 9/23/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING re 87 Letter filed by Arley Leghorn, Valerie Leghorn for Megan Yelle to appear by phone on 7/8/13 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/3/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING re 82 Letter filed by QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation for Katherine L. Halliday to appear by phone on 7/8/13 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 31 Motion to Dismiss; denying 32 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT ON REASSIGNED CASES. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/29/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 04/19/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/26/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 13 Stipulation, filed by Arley Leghorn, QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, Valerie Leghorn. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/19/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leghorn et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arley Leghorn
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Represented By: G. Tony Singh Atwal
Represented By: Kai Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Leghorn
Represented By: G. Tony Singh Atwal
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Represented By: Kai Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE First Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Gerald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?