Kibby Road, LLC v. Rousset et al

Defendant: Jean-Paul Rousset and Valerie J. Rousset
Plaintiff: Kibby Road, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv01200
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO REMAND (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/30/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/10/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kibby Road, LLC v. Rousset et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Paul Rousset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie J. Rousset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kibby Road, LLC
Represented By: Edward Alexander Nagy
Represented By: Mary Ellmann Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.