Lopez v. Koch et al

Defendant: Matthew Koch and Joshua Vincelet
Plaintiff: Richard Lopez, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2013cv01610
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
August 8, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Spero for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/27/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
October 18, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
February 6, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/15/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/6/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
September 23, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 41 TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
May 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request for telephonic appearance on 7/10/13 01:30 Case Management Conference 7 Proposed Order filed by Richard Lopez, Sr., 6 Letter filed by Richard Lopez, Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/17/13. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Re: Telephonic Appearance Procedures for Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Koch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Vincelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lopez, Sr.
Represented By: James Randall Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.