Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv02023
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2015 Filing 534 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Craig E. Davis (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 15, 2015 Filing 533 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jennifer Lu Gilbert on Behalf of Banys, P.C., Counsel for Adaptix, Inc. (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (431) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (499) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (424) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (395) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (471) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 531 RESPONSE (re 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] ) Adaptix's Response To Supplemental Brief filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re (439 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 529 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 556 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 472 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 495 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 23, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (555) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (471) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (494) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (438) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (528) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 21, 2015 Filing 528 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 re 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and Supporting Papers filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2015. Replies due by 8/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 527 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. re 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] - Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 526 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. - Joint Notice Regarding Claim Construction Opinion (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 525 OBJECTIONS to re 523 Costs Taxed and Motion to Amend Taxation of Amended Bill of Costs by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 524 Costs Taxed re: 469 in amount of $-0- against Adaptix, Inc. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 523 Costs Taxed re: 468 502 in amount of $-0- against Adaptix, Inc. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 16, 2015 Filing 522 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-7-15, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (483 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2015. (las, ) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 10, 2015 Filing 521 REDACTION to 481 Opposition/Response to Motion,, [Redacted] Public Redacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nigel Jones Public Redacted Version, # 2 Exhibit F Public Redacted Version, # 3 Exhibit G Public Redacted Version, # 4 Exhibit H Public Redacted Version)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 520 REDACTION to 496 Reply to Opposition/Response, Public Redacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 519 REDACTION to 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] Public Redacted Version of Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 2 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 4 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, # 5 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Declaration of Christopher A. Hughes, # 7 Public Redacted Version of Declaration of Bryant C. Boren, Jr.)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (533) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (472), (474) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (427) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (506) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 7, 2015 Filing 517 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 4/7/2015.As to Case Nos. 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (In Re: ECF Nos. 431 in -01776, 499 in -01777, 424 in -01778, 395 in -01844 and 471 in -02023) held on 4/7/2015. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issuedAs to Case Nos. 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-02894-PSG, 5:14-cv-02895-PSG, 5:15-cv-00165-PSG, 5:15-cv-00166-PSG, 5:15-cv-00167-PSG and 5:15-cv-00168-PSG: Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Related Cases (In Re: ECF Nos. 73 in -02359, 89 in -02360, 118 in -02894, 120 in -02895, 150 in -00165, 153 in -00166, 162 in -00167 and 125 in-00168) held on 4/7/2015. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued.As to Case Nos. 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-02894-PSG, 5:14-cv-02895-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:15-cv-00165-PSG, 5:15-cv-00166-PSG, 5:15-cv-00167-PSG, 5:15-cv-00168-PSG, 5:15-cv-00364-PSG, 5:15-cv-00365-PSG, 5:15-cv-00366-PSG, 5:15-cv-00367-PSG, 5:15-cv-00962-PSG, 5:15-cv-00971-PSG and 5:15-cv-00972-PSG: Case Management Conference held on 4/7/2015. Case management scheduling order to issue as to ZTE cases. Entry of case scheduling order deferred as to Case Nos. 5:15-cv-00364-PSG, 5:15-cv-00365-PSG, 5:15-cv-00366-PSG, 5:15-cv-00367-PSG, 5:15-cv-00962-PSG, 5:15-cv-00971-PSG and 5:15-cv-00972-PSG pending ruling on any pending motions to dismiss.4/14/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend its Infringement Contentions (In Re: ECF Nos. 94 in -00165, 93 in -00166, 98 in -00167 and 78 in -00168) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.4/21/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review (In Re: ECF Nos. 79 in -02359, 95 in -02360, 124 in -02894, 126 in -02895, 162 in -00165, 165 in -00166, 171 in -00167 and 134 in -00168) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.4/28/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF Nos. 17 in -00364 and 22 in -00365) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.4/28/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF Nos. 25 in -00364 and 16 in -00366) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.4/28/2015 Hearing on Defendant Verizon's Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF Nos. 28 in -00365 and 30 in -00367) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.4/28/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF Nos. 19 in -00366 and 24 in -00367) reset to 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.5/12/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF No. 15 in -00962) reset to 5/14/2015 at 1:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.5/12/2015 10:00 AM Hearing on Defendants Verizon, Inc. and Dell, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (In Re: ECF No. 27 in -00971) reset to 5/14/2015 at 1:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge (Time in Court: 1:48 to 3:19). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Christopher Banys, James Foster and Daniel McGonagle. Appearing telephonically: Michael Ercolini. Also present: Christopher Judge. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Mark Selwyn, Craig Davis, Fred Williams, Todd Landis, Rob Cruzen, David Eiseman, Geoff Godfrey, Mark Flanagan, Dennis Wang, Inge Larish, Steve Moore, Doug Kubehl, Kurt Pankratz, James Mahon, Vid Bhakar, Mark McGrory and Nathaniel Bruno. Appearing telephonically: Jonathan Hardt, Jonathon Rubenstein, Christopher Hughes, David Clonts, Michael Reeder and Kathleen Barry. Also present: Vincent Lam. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2015) Modified on 4/13/2015 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE APRIL 7, 2015 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (542) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (479) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG and granting (515) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 515 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY, LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE APRIL 7, 2015 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (540) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG and granting (513) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 513 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the April 7, 2015 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE APRIL 7, 2015 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting ECF No. 538 in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting ECF No. 511 in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 511 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the April 7, 2015 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tempesta, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 508 Certificate of Service re: 506 filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 506 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2015) Modified on 3/25/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2015 Filing 507 OBJECTIONS to re 502 Bill of Costs, of Apple by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 506 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Objections to Apple's Amended Bill of Costs)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal re: (495), (498), (500), (507), (510), (512), (519), (520), (522), (530) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; (423), (426), (433), (436), (438), (445), (446), (447), (453) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; (426), (428), (430), (432), (443), (447), (449), (455), (456), (458), (468) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; (392), (394), (396), (403), (406), (408), (414), (415), (416), (424) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; (467), (470), (472), (480), (483), (485), (492), (493), (495), (501) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 18, 2015 acknowledging receipt from Office of the Clerk United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Washington, DC.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 504 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. Filing fee $ 505. re: 499 Appeal Record due by 4/16/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 503 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. Filing fee $ 505. re: 497 Appeal Record due by 4/16/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 502 AMENDED BILL OF COSTS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn In Support Of Apple's Bill Of Costs, # 2 Amended Schedule A-1, # 3 Amended Schedule B-1)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2015) Modified on 3/17/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2015 Filing 501 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Defendant's Reply In Support of Motion For Attorneys' Fees)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 500 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Status Conference held on 3/13/2015 re: 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-02894-PSG, 5:14-cv-02895-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:15-cv-00165-PSG, 5:15-cv-00166-PSG, 5:15-cv-00167-PSG and 5:15-cv-00168-PSG. The court relates cases 3:15-cv-00367-JCS, 3:15-cv-00962-EDL, 3:15-cv-00971-JSC, 3:15-cv-00972-LB, 4:15-cv-00364-DMR, 3:15-cv-00366-JSC and 4:15-cv-00365-KAW to 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-02894-PSG, 5:14-cv-02895-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:15-cv-00165-PSG, 5:15-cv-00166-PSG, 5:15-cv-00167-PSG and 5:15-cv-00168-PSG. FTR Time: (1:08 to 1:28). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Christopher Banys and James Foster. Also present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Fred Williams, Mark Selwyn and Craig Davis. Also present (telephonically): Kathleen Barry, Geoffrey Godfrey, Robert Cruzen, Michael Reeder, Ronald Lemieux, Kurt Pankratz, Ben Satnick, James Williams, Nathaniel Bruno, Robert Hill, Mark McGrory and Inge Larish. This is a text only Minute Entry(ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 499 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 461 Judgment, 447 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, 371 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9359490. Appeal Record due by 4/13/2015. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 498 Transcript Designation Form re 478 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,, Transcript due by 3/13/2015. (Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 497 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 461 Judgment, 371 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9356775. Appeal Record due by 4/13/2015. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 496 REPLY (re 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 495 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 3 Declaration of S. Dennis Wang, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Highlighted])(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 494 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 493 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Attachment 1 - Adaptix's Opposition, # 3 Attachment 2 - 9/2/14 Ercolini to Hardt Email, # 4 Attachment 3 - Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 492 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees 480 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 491 Declaration of Michael Reeder in Support of Adaptix's Administrative Motion to Seal [Dkt. 480] filed by HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Highlighted), # 2 Declaration of Nigel Jones (Highlighted), # 3 Exhibit G (Highlighted), # 4 Exhibit H (Highlighted))(Williams, Fred) (Filed on 3/9/2015) Modified on 3/10/2015 (incorrect event selected.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2015 Filing 490 Declaration of John T. Moehringer in Support of 469 Bill of Costs, (Supplemental Declaration of John T. Moehringer in Support of AT&T's Bill of Costs) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit F, # 2 Corrected Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 469 ) (Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 489 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby in Support of 469 Bill of Costs, (Supplemental Declaration of Gina A. Bibby in Support of AT&T's Bill of Costs) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit A, # 2 Corrected Exhibit B, # 3 Corrected Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 469 ) (Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 488 EXHIBITS re 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certificate of Service filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 , 485 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 487 EXHIBITS re 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certificate of Service filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 , 485 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Receipt of acknowledgment from the Office of the Clerk United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 486 OBJECTIONS to re 469 Bill of Costs, AT&T by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 485 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Objections to AT&T's Bill of Costs)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 484 OBJECTIONS to re 468 Bill of Costs, Apple by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 483 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Objections to Apple's Bill of Cost)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 482 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 478 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,,. Filing fee $ 505. Appeal Record due by 4/6/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 481 RESPONSE (re 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nigel Jones in Support of Adaptix's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 2 Declaration of Curtis Dodd in Support of Adaptix's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 3 Declaration of Kevin Gannon in Support of Adaptix's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 480 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jones, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 479 RESPONSE to re 477 Objection by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini ISO Response to Objections, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 478 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 448 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. 269 Order. 410 Order on Motion for Leave to File. 449 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. 461 Judgment, 29 Order on Motion to Change Venue, 135 Order, 455 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. by Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9323341. Appeal Record due by 3/30/2015. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 2/27/2015) Modified on 3/6/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2015 Filing 477 OBJECTIONS to re 474 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 476 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/09/2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (436 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 475 Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on January 22, 2015, before Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 4:04-4:20. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2015. (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 474 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini re 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and Supporting Papers filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Highlighted Version of Defendants' Motion to be Sealed, # 2 Exhibit Highlighted Version of Exhibit 7 to Davis Decl. to be Sealed, # 3 Exhibit Highlighted Version of Exhibit 8 to Davis Decl. to be Sealed)(Related document(s) 470 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/25/2015 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2015 Filing 473 Proposed Order re 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /AT&T's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Regarding Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 SUPERSEDES Proposed Order Filed at D.I. 1776-430-4; -1777-498-4; -1778-423-4; -1844-394-4; 2023-470-4 by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Powell, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /AT&T's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Regarding Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 471 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Redacted] filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/3/2015. Replies due by 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1 [Filed Under Seal], # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 [Filed Under Seal], # 8 Exhibit 7 [Filed Under Seal], # 9 Exhibit 8 [Filed Under Seal], # 10 Exhibit 9 [Filed Under Seal], # 11 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], # 12 Exhibit 11 [Redacted], # 13 Exhibit 12 [Redacted], # 14 Exhibit 13 [Redacted], # 15 Exhibit 14 [Filed Under Seal], # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Declaration of Fred I. Williams, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 26 Declaration of Christopher A. Hughes [Redacted], # 27 Declaration of Bryant C. Boren, Jr. [Redacted], # 28 Declaration of Mark D. Flanagan, # 29 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 470 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and Supporting Papers filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 3 Declaration of S. Dennis Wang, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Highlighted], # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10 [Highlighted], # 12 Exhibit 11 [Highlighted], # 13 Exhibit 12 [Highlighted], # 14 Exhibit 13 [Highlighted], # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Declaration of Christopher A. Hughes [Highlighted], # 17 Declaration of Bryant C. Boren, Jr. [Highlighted])(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 469 BILL OF COSTS by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Declaration of John T. Moehringer, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J.1, # 13 Exhibit J.2, # 14 Declaration of Fred I. Williams, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 468 BILL OF COSTS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn in Support of Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs, # 2 Schedule A-1, # 3 Schedule A-2, # 4 Schedule B-1, # 5 Schedule B-2, # 6 Exhibit A-1, # 7 Exhibit A-2, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit B-1, # 9 Exhibit B-2)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 467 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B-1)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (492) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (419) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (423) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (388) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (464) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 465 RESPONSE (re 464 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Fees ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 464 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Fees filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CASES BE RELATED by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (203) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. 5:15-cv-00165-PSG, 5:15-cv-00166-PSG, 5:15-cv-00167-PSG & 5:15-cv-00168-PSG RELATED TO 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-02894-PSG, 5:14-cv-02895-PSG & 5:14-cv-03112-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 462 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing on Proposed Form of Judgment held on 2/2/2015. Attorneys James Foster, Christopher Banys for Adaptix, Inc.; Attorneys Mark Selwyn, Craig Davis for Apple, Inc.; Travis Jensen, Doug Kubehl, Kurt Pankratz, David Clonts, Fred Williams, Christopher Hughes for AT&T; Mark Flanagan, Geoffrey Godfrey for Verizon. Court to issue judgments. (FTR: 3:07pm - 3:25pm) This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 461 FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 2, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER RE: HEARING ON PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT re (487 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (417 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (416 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (381 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG), (382 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG), (412 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (486 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (413 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (459 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (458 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (411 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 2, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 459 Proposed Order re: Final Judgment by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Final Judgment)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 458 Proposed Order re Final Judgment by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (484) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (409) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (414) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (379) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (456) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 456 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Form of Judgment filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (335) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (304) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (309) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (286) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (311) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jennifer Lu Gilbert of Steve E. Lipman (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP GREEN re (342 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (327 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (369 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (340 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (329 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (368 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (300 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 22, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting ECF No. 406 in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 451 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Status Conference held on 1/22/2015 as to 5:13-cv-01776-PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc., et al., 5:13-cv-01777-PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc., et al., 5:13-cv-01778-PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. AT&T, Inc., et al., 5:13-cv-01844-PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, et al. and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc., et al. The court grants stipulation and proposed order regarding trial date, pretrial conference and related pretrial deadlines in 5:13-cv-01776 (ECF No. 406). 2/23/2015 Jury Trial in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG is vacated. Daubert Motions are deemed withdrawn without prejudice to renewal (ECF No. 327 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, ECF Nos. 368 & 369 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, ECF No. 329 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, ECF No. 300 in 5:13-cv-01844 and ECF Nos. 340 & 342 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG). The court will issue an order on pending Motion for Summary Judgment re: Invalidity. Any request to vacate further trial dates to be filed for the court's review. FTR Time (4:04 to 4:20). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: Jennifer Gilbert. Also present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini & James Foster. Defendant Attorney (s) present: Craig Davis & Mark Flanagan. Also present (telephonically): Geoff Godfrey, Christopher Hughes, Jonathon Rubenstein, Sarita Venkat, Doug Kubehl, Kurt Pankratz, Mark Selwyn, David Clonts & Fred Williams. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2015) Modified on 1/22/2015 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2015 Filing 450 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Status Conference (In Re ECF No. 406 in 5:13-cv-01776 Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc., et al.) set for 1/22/2015 at 4:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (336), (339) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (311), (312) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (288), (289) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (310), (312), (315) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (333) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (302) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (307) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (285) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (309) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (340) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (307) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (315) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (291) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (316) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER GRANTING ADAPTIX'S MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (469) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (397) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (367) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (440) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER GRANTING AT&T'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (471) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (443) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (467) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (396) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (365) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (438) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 443 MOTION for Reconsideration re 405 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, (Motion for Reconsideration of Portions of November 20, 2014 Sealing Orders) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER GRANTING 438 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER GRANTING 435 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 15, 2014 Filing 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 436 filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 439 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Notice of Supplemental Authority (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 438 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Reconsideration of November 20, 2014 Sealing Orders filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini ISO Motion for Leave, # 2 Exhibit A to Ercolini Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Ercolini Decl., # 4 Declaration of Michael Powell ISO Motion for Leave, # 5 Exhibit A to Powell Decl., # 6 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 437 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding 313 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 436 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 12/10/2014) Modified on 12/16/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2014 Filing 435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Defendant AT&T's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Certain Materials Under Seal in Support of Adaptix & AT&T's Joint Motion for Reconsideration RE November 20, 2014 Sealing Orders (D.I. 434-01777, D.I. 405-02023); filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael B. Powell, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition, # 4 Exhibit A)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 434 REDACTION to 354 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides (Redacted))(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 433 REDACTION to 327 Letter Brief Re: AT&T's Motion to Strike by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 432 REDACTION to 384 Reply to Opposition/Response, by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18 (PUBLIC VERSION))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 431 RESPONSE (re 309 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 2 Exhibit 2 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 3 Exhibit 3 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 4 Exhibit 5 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 5 Exhibit 7 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 6 Exhibit 8 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 7 Exhibit 9 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 8 Exhibit 10 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 9 Exhibit 11 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 10 Exhibit 12 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 11 Exhibit 14 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 12 Exhibit 15 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 13 Exhibit 16 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 14 Exhibit 17 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 15 Exhibit 18 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 16 Exhibit 19 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 17 Exhibit 21 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 18 Exhibit 22 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 19 Exhibit 23 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 20 Exhibit 24 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 21 Exhibit 25 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 22 Exhibit 26 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 23 Exhibit 27 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 24 Exhibit 28 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 25 Exhibit 29 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 26 Exhibit 30 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 27 Exhibit 31 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 28 Exhibit 32 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 29 Exhibit 33 (PUBLIC VERSION))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 430 REDACTION to 356 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit F (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit I (Redacted))(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 429 REDACTION to 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 2 Exhibit 5 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 3 Exhibit 6 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 4 Exhibit 9 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 5 Exhibit 10 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 6 Exhibit 11 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 7 Exhibit 12 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 8 Exhibit 13 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 9 Exhibit 15 (PUBLIC VERSION))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 428 REDACTION to 387 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 (Public version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 427 REDACTION (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION OF AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike, ECF No. 304 by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 2 Exhibit 3 (PUBLIC VERSION), # 3 Exhibit 4 (PUBLIC VERSION))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 426 REDACTION to 366 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 425 REDACTION to 391 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Public Version) Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), # 2 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), # 3 Exhibit 8 (Public Version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 424 REDACTION to 340 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted Version), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Version), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted Version), # 4 Exhibit 5 (Redacted Version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 423 REDACTION to 353 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit F (Redacted))(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 422 REDACTION to 389 Reply to Opposition/Response, Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 (Redacted version), # 2 Exhibit 9 (Redacted version), # 3 Exhibit 10 (Redacted version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 421 REDACTION to 395 Reply to Opposition/Response, by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 420 REDACTION to 342 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit 20)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 24, 2014 SEALING ORDERS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (447) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (418) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 418 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF NOVEMBER 24, 2014 SEALING ORDERS (D.I. 438 - 01777, D.I. 409-02023) REGARDING CIV. L.R. 79-5(e) DECLARATION OF JAMES C. WILLIAMS (D.I. 431-01777, D.I. 402- 02023) SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO ADAPTIXS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (D.I. 393- 01777, D.I. 365-02023) re 409 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Exhibit A - November 26, 2014 Amended Declaration of James C. Williams, # 3 (Proposed) Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 12/2/2014) Modified on 12/2/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting (444) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; (415) in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting (443) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; (414) in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 415 MOTION for Leave to File (Defendant AT&T's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File its Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration re November 24, 2014 Sealing Order) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 414 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Materials in Support of its Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration re November 24, 2014 Sealing Orders filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Declaration of James C. Williams, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED VERSION of Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert, # 4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit B to Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 413 NOTICE of Related Case Authority by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/26/2014) Modified on 12/3/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING HTC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AS TO EXHIBITS 17 AND 20 re 438 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 409 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 377 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 350 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 25, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 411 Supplemental Declaration of Jamie L. Duncan, III in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal [Dkt. 341 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 11/25/2014) Modified on 11/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (435) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (374) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (382) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (347) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (406) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 409 (AMENDED) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing Re: Sealing held on 11/24/2014. HTC to submit a declaration with proposed order confirming that green highlighting in administrative motions to seal are sections HTC seeks to redact. Court Reporter present: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini. Defendant Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Gina Bibby, Craig Davis, Jonathan Hardt, John Moehringer, Mark Selwyn, Jennifer Tempesta, James Duncan & Fred Williams. Following today's hearing, the court considered AT&T's request regarding Docket Nos. 380, 388 and 431 in Case No. 13-1777 (Docket Nos. 352, 360 and 402 in Case No. 13-2023) and rules as follows: As to Exhibit F to Docket No. 380, designations highlighted in green at Docket No. 388-6 SEALED and designations highlighted in yellow at Docket No. 380-4 EXCEPT for those lines identified at Docket No. 388-1 at 8 SEALED; all other designations UNSEALED. As to the declaration at Docket No. 431, the court finds that it was improperly filed. Specifically, the declaration refers to yellow highlighting in the underlying documents at Docket No. 393, when the underlying document contains only green highlighting. Similarly, the declaration refers to yellow highlighting in Exhibit B at Docket No. 393-5 when in fact the underlying document contains no highlighting at all. Finally, under Civ L.R. 79-5(d)(1) (D), the unredacted version of the document sought to be sealed should have been highlighted or marked by some other clear method to indicate the designated material. The laundry list of designations contained only in the declaration at Docket No. 431 does not satisfy this requirement. As such, the designations indicated at Docket No. 431 are UNSEALED. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2014 Filing 408 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing Re: Sealing held on 11/24/2014. HTC to submit a declaration with proposed order confirming that green highlighting in administrative motions to seal are sections HTC seeks to redact. The court will review AT&T's Declarations Re: Docket Nos. 380 & 393 in CV13-01777 and 352 & 400 in CV14-02023. Court Reporter present: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini. Defendant Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Gina Bibby, Craig Davis, Jonathan Hardt, John Moehringer, Mark Selwyn, Jennifer Tempesta, James Duncan & Fred Williams. This is a text only Minute Entry (ofr, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2014 Filing 407 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING RE SEALING: Hearing (Re: 367-3 in CV13-01777, 328-2 in CV13-01778, 299-2 in CV13-01844 & 341-3 in CV13-02023) set for 11/24/2014 at 1:00 PM (Special Set) before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Parties are welcome to attend but not required to. Parties that wish to attend are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 406 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Administrative Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Foster, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Foster, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Foster, # 5 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 OMNIBUS ORDER RE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG: 310 , 312 , 314 , 317 , 319 , 321 , 326 , 332 , 335 , 336 , 338 , 340 , 346 , 347 , 348 , 349 , 350 , 357 , 360 , 363 , 365 , 367 , 369 , 376 & 380 ; in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG: 328 , 334 , 336 , 338 , 343 , 348 , 351 , 366 , 367 , 372 , 376 , 379 , 380 , 383 , 387 , 388 , 389 , 390 , 391 , 393 , 406 , 411 , 414 , 416 , 418 , 420 , 422 , 428 , 429 , 432 & 433 ; in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG: 297 , 303 , 305 , 306 , 309 , 311 , 314 , 328 , 332 , 333 , 336 , 339 , 343 , 344 , 345 , 346 , 355 , 358 , 360 , 362 , 364 , 369 & 371 ; in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG: 287 , 289 , 290 , 293 , 295 , 299 , 302 , 303 , 306 , 308 , 310 , 313 , 317 , 318 , 319 , 320 , 327 , 329 , 331 , 332 , 335 , 340 , 341 , 342 & 344 ; in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: 304 , 310 , 312 , 314 , 317 , 318 , 323 , 326 , 339 , 341 , 345 , 348 , 351 , 352 , 355 , 359 , 360 , 361 , 362 , 363 , 365 , 378 , 383 , 386 , 388 , 390 , 392 , 394 , 399 , 400 , 403 & 404 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit A)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit A)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 402 Declaration of James C. Williams in Support of 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 365 ) (Williams, James) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 401 Declaration of Michael B. Powell and accompanying exemplary supporting documents in support of Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc.s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Apple Reply, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2014 Filing 400 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green on Four Separate and Independent Grounds filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green (see Dkt. Nos. 367 and 378 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 398 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/04/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (372 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 397 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: 1.) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. 307 in CV13- 01776, 333 in -01777, 302 in -01778, 285 in -01844 & 309 in -02023) 2.) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. Nos. 309 in CV13-01776, 335 in -01777, 304 in -01778, 286 in 01844 & 311 in -02023) 3.) Defendant Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 311 in CV13- 01776 & 288 in -01844) 4.) Defendants HTC America Inc. & HTC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 305-3 in CV13-01778 & 289-3 in -01844) 5.) Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 313 in CV13-01776, 337 in -01777 & 313 in -02023) 6.) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers (Dkt. Nos. 315 in CV13-01776, 340 in -01777, 307 in -01778, 291 in -01844 & 316 in -02023) 7.) Defendant Apple, Inc. & Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green (Dkt. Nos. 327 in CV13-01776, 368 in -01777 & 340 in -02023) 8.) Defendant AT&T Mobility's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 339 in CV13-01777, 303-3 in -01778 & 315 in -02023) 9.) Defendants AT&T, HTC & Verizon's Motion to Strike & Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Philip Green (Dkt. Nos. 369 in CV13-01777, 329 in -01778, 300 in -01844 & 342 in -02023). The court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY re (326 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG), (359 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (385 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (357 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), and (413 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 3, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 395 REPLY (re 342 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Exhibit 22 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit 23 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 24 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 25 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 26 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green and Exhibits Thereto filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Strike, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, # 9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 393 REPLY (re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement NO SELECTING A SET OF CANDIDATE SUBCARRIERS ) (Redacted) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 19)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 392 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants AT&T, Apple, and HTC's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Defendants AT&T, Apple, and HTC's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers", # 4 Exhibit 18)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 391 REPLY (re 340 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) (Document Sought to be Sealed) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 6 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 7 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 8 (Document Sought to be Sealed))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 389 REPLY (re 313 Document Sought To Be Sealed ) - Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought to be Sealed) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 8 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 9 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 10 (Document Sought to be Sealed))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 388 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 10)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 387 REPLY (re 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness ) (Document Sought to be Sealed) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 5)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 386 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James C. Williams, # 2 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 3 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 385 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery Deadline filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 384 REPLY (re 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement and Exhibit 18 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 AT&T's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, # 3 Exhibit 18 (UNDER SEAL), # 4 Proposed Order to Seal, # 5 Proof of Service)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 382 REPLY (re 309 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (405) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (377) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (404) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (376) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (403) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (375) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 367 filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph Messina ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Sealed Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Green, # 4 Exhibit A to Opposition to Exclude Green, # 5 Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Exclude Green)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 377 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the November 4, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 376 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the November 4, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 375 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions set for November 4, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Tempesta, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 374 Minute Entry: Motion to Compel Hearing held on 10/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (386 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (342 In 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) and (358 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG). The court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OF SEALING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO DAUBERT AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING re (372 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG)(323 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG)(355 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) (400 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) (350 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 29, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 372 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order by Plaintiff and Defendants Regarding Extension of Time to Submit Materials in Support of Sealing Documents Filed in Connection with Daubert and Summary Judgment Briefing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT ASSERTED PATENT AND DENYING CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (270) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (247) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (247) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (240) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (249) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Adaptix, Inc. is required to E-FILE the amended document in cases 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 370 Letter Brief re 358 Discovery Letter BriefIn Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Reeder Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 358 ) (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 369 Discovery Letter Brief Opposition re 358 Adaptix's Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 25, 2014 Filing 368 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER . *** RESPONSE (re 340 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph Messin ISO Oppositon to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Phillip Green, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/25/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2014 Filing 367 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, # 4 Exhibit Sealed Motion, # 5 Exhibit Sealed Expert Report of Phillip Green)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/25/2014) Modified on 10/31/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 Filing 366 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER . *** RESPONSE (re 340 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert M, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 Filing 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 4 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Adaptix's Opposition)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 364 EXHIBITS re 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 313 ) As Previously Identified in the Sealing Papers at Dkt. Nos. 312 , Exhibit 7 to Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 351 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 363 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion of Defendant, AT&T Mobility LLC, for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (see Dkt. Nos. 355 and 356 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit I to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Adaptix, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" (see Dkt. No. 354 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Adaptix's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (see Dkt. Nos. 352 and 353 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of (i) Adaptixs Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, (ii) Declaration of Dr. Michael Caloyannides, and (iii) Exhibits filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Johnson K. Kuncheria in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of (i) Adaptixs Opposition to AT&Ts Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, (ii) Declaration of Dr. Michael Caloyannides, and (iii) Exhibits filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Johnson K. Kuncheria in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 358 Discovery Letter BriefIn Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 357 CLERK'S NOTICE RE COURT DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEFS ON DAUBERT MOTIONS: Reply Briefs on Daubert Motions due by 10/31/2014 [See Civ. L.R. 7-3(c)]. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 356 RESPONSE (re 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment,, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 12 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Adaptix's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unedacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 354 RESPONSE (re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement NO SELECTING A SET OF CANDIDATE SUBCARRIERS ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 353 RESPONSE (re 313 Document Sought To Be Sealed ) Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit D, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit E, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit G, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit H)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 313 ) As Previously Identified in the Sealing Papers at Dkt. Nos. 312 , 317 , 336 , and 320 in Case No. 5:13-cv-01776-PSG filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Sealed Version), # 4 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Public Version), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Sealed Version), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Sealed Version), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), # 9 Exhibit 3 (Sealed Version), # 10 Exhibit 3 (Public Version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 350 RESPONSE (re 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Caloyannides, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 349 RESPONSE (re 309 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) (Defendants' Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f)) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Defendants Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), # 2 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 9 Exhibit 8 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 10 Exhibit 9 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 11 Exhibit 10 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 12 Exhibit 11 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 12 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 16 Exhibit 15 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 17 Exhibit 16 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 18 Exhibit 17 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 20 Exhibit 19 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 23 Exhibit 22 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 24 Exhibit 23 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 25 Exhibit 24 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 26 Exhibit 25 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 27 Exhibit 26 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 28 Exhibit 27 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 29 Exhibit 28 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 30 Exhibit 29 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 31 Exhibit 30 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 32 Exhibit 31 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 33 Exhibit 32 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 34 Exhibit 33 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 348 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), and Exhibits 1-3, 5, 7-12, 14-19, and 21-33 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 UNREDACTED Version of Defendants' Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 1, # 4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 2, # 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 3, # 6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 5, # 7 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 7, # 8 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 8, # 9 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 9, # 10 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 10, # 11 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 11, # 12 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 12, # 13 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 14, # 14 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 15, # 15 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 16, # 16 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 17, # 17 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 18, # 18 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 19, # 19 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 21, # 20 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 22, # 21 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 23, # 22 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 24, # 23 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 25, # 24 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 26, # 25 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 27, # 26 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 28, # 27 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 29, # 28 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 30, # 29 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 31, # 30 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 32, # 31 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 33, # 32 Proposed Order, # 33 Proof of Service)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 14, 2014 Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 365 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, Docket No. 327 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG and Docket No. 338 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 346 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 345 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding 341 AT&T, HTC, and Verizon's Motion to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (365) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (327) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (338) Motion f or Hearing in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER DENYING 308 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. As filed, the exhibits are only the cover pages to other materials. As the supporting declaration itself implicitly concedes, the cover pages are not in and of themselves confidential. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 10, 2014 Filing 342 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit 6 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 8 Exhibit 7 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 9 Exhibit 8 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 10 Exhibit 9 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 11 Exhibit 10 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 12 Exhibit 11 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 12 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 14 Exhibit 13 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 17 Exhibit 16 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 18 Exhibit 17 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 20 Exhibit 19 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 20 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 22 Exhibit 21-1, # 23 Exhibit 21-2, # 24 Exhibit 21-3, # 25 Proposed Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 341 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 of Bibby, # 2 of Godfrey, # 3 Declaration of Duncan, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit6, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit13, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, # 24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 340 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 7 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 2 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple's and Verizon's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 338 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Adaptix's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER AND STIPULATION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-12 IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (358) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:13-cv-01777- PSG; granting (333) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:13-cv- 02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 336 Declaration of David A. Kays for non-party Qualcomm Incorporated in Support of 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-InfringementMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,947,748 AND 7,454,212 Thereto filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 335 Declaration of Johnson Kuncheria in Support of 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 326 ) (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 334 Declaration of David A. Kays for non-party Qualcomm Incorporated in Support of 318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to 304 AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 318 ) (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 333 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) [PROPOSED] ORDER AND STIPULATION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-12 IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 332 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re: Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Strike (Dkt. Nos. 328-3 in CV13-01777, 297-3 in -01778 & 304-3 in -02023) held on 10/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court denies Defendant' Motion to Strike. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (353) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (328) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (350) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (313) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (325) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (349) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (312) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (324) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 328 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 327 Letter Brief re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Adaptix's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike, # 4 Unredacted Version of Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 325 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for October 3, 2014 Hearing Regarding Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 324 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for October 3, 2014 Hearing Regarding Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 10 to 310 AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 10)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 322 Declaration of James C. Williams in Support of 308 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 308 ) (Williams, James) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (345) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (320) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 320 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the October 3, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 319 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, Telephone number 415 722-7045. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (305 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order, (83 in 5:14-cv-02895-PSG) Transcript Order, (327 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to 304 AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judge of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Apple Motion for Summary Judgment (Sought to be Sealed))(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement NO SELECTING A SET OF CANDIDATE SUBCARRIERS filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder in Support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Motion to Seal, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED), # 6 Motion for Summary Judgment (UNDER SEAL), # 7 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 9 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL), # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 13 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 15 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # 16 Exhibit 7 (UNDER SEAL), # 17 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 8 (UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 9 (UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 10 (UNDER SEAL), # 23 Exhibit 11, # 24 Exhibit 12 (REDACTED), # 25 Exhibit 12 (UNDER SEAL), # 26 Exhibit 13 (REDACTED), # 27 Exhibit 13 (UNDER SEAL), # 28 Exhibit 14 (REDACTED), # 29 Exhibit 14 (UNDER SEAL), # 30 Exhibit 15 (REDACTED), # 31 Exhibit 15 (UNDER SEAL), # 32 Exhibit 16 (REDACTED), # 33 Exhibit 16 (UNDER SEAL), # 34 Exhibit 17, # 35 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 313 (Document Sought To Be Sealed) filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 9 Proposed Order) GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,947,748 AND 7,454,212 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified text on 9/29/2014,.( to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,947,748 AND 7,454,212 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity OF CLAIMS 8 AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,947,748 AND CLAIMS 9 AND 10 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,454,212 BASED ON INDEFINITENESS UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 112 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Professor Thomas E. Fuja, # 2 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&Ts Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (REDACTED), # 4 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (UNDER SEAL), # 5 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 5 (UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 6 (UNDER SEAL), # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 9 (UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 10 (UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 11 (UNDER SEAL), # 23 Exhibit 12 (REDACTED), # 24 Exhibit 12 (UNDER SEAL), # 25 Exhibit 13 (REDACTED), # 26 Exhibit 13 (UNDER SEAL), # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 15 (REDACTED), # 29 Exhibit 15 (UNDER SEAL), # 30 Exhibit 16 - Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102 (f) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 9 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014(incorrect event selected) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Filing 308 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement in connection with Exhibits A-C to Adaptixs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102(f). filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit A, # 4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B, # 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit C)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re (303 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 302 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 326 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 295 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 282 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 24, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Set Hearing as to AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Strike (328-3 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (297-2 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) and (304-3 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) : Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 at 9:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 3, 2014 MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (329) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (298) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (305) Motion in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 305 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. (Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion to Strike (REDACTED), # 4 Motion to Strike (CONFIDENTIAL), # 5 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 1 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED *** (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 1 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 3 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 11 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 4 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 13 Exhibit 5 (Proposed Order))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 Filing 303 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (5:00 to 6:06) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (324) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (301) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 301 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (322) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (300) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (299) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (318) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (295) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THESEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (319) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (293) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (298) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (280) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (296) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 296 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 295 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 294 EXHIBITS re 293 Joint Case Management Statement Exhibits A, B, C filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 293 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 293 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (314) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (289) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (294) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (276) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (291) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 291 JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (311) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (286) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (289) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (288) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 289 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/23/2014 10:00 AM Case Management Conference is reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 288 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 Filing 287 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (309 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT R. GILMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (306) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (283) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (286) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (270) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (285) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 285 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert R. Gilman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8906453.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilman, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART 279 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The supporting declaration addresses Doc. No. 279 Ex. A-X, but not Z, as addressed in the underlying motion. Doc. No. 279 Ex. A-X shall be filed under seal. Ex. Z shall not. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 9/8/2014 (Grewal, Paul).
September 8, 2014 Filing 283 DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint /ADAPTIX, INC.'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 282 Declaration of Fred I. Williams in Support of 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Powell, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 281 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re Plaintiff's Motion to Correct an Asserted Patent (Dkt. Nos. 247 in CV13-01776, 270 in -01777, 247 in -01778, 240 in -01844 & 249 in -02023) AND Defendants' Motion to Strike Adaptix's Reliance Upon ATTM Documents (Dkt. Nos. 297 in CV13-01777, 274 in -01778 & 277 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion to Strike. The court takes Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Asserted Patent under submission; written order to be issued. The court will issue a new settlement referral in CV14-01259 PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Dell, Inc., et al. in light of order of recusal recently entered by Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 280 EXHIBITS re 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Ercolini ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Motion to Seal, # 3 Supplement Redacted Letter Brief, # 4 Declaration Michael Ercolini ISO Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit Y, # 6 Exhibit Z, # 7 Proposed Order Motion to Strike, # 8 Supplement Unredacted Letter Brief)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 278 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON AUGUST 26, 2014 MOTIONS: 8/26/2014 10:00 AM Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 247 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 270 & 297 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 247 & 274 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 240 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 249 & 277 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 277 Discovery Letter Brief re 274 Motion for Hearing by Teleconference on August 26, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute Regarding Reliance on ATTM Documents by Adaptix filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Declaration of Fred I. Williams, # 3 Declaration Christopher A. Hughes, # 4 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 273 .(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 295 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 272 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG and 274 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) set for 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT AUGUST 26, 2014 DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (295) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (272) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; and granting (274) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 274 MOTION to Appear by Teleconference on August 26, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/14/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 Filing 273 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L. R. 6-2 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 270 Stipulation.(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 271 REPLY (re 249 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 270 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Limitations Pursuant to Court's July 8 Order filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE re (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership, (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, HTC Corporation, (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, Apple Inc., HTC Corporation, Cellco Partnership. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 8, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 268 Minute Entry: Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Michael Caloyannides's Expert Reports (In Re: Dkt. Nos. 254-4 in CV13-01776, 278-4 in -01777, 255-4 in -01778, 248-4 in -01844 & 257-4 in -02023) held on 8/7/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 267 Letter Brief Concerning Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (286) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (263) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (267) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (256) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (265) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic hearing. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 265 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING 257 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 4, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RELATING CASES, granting (256) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02895-EDL related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER RELATING CASE, granting (255) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02894-PSG related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 260 RESPONSE (re 249 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 2 Declaration of Fuja, # 3 Declaration of Selwyn, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 259 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/28/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (258 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 30, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (277) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (254) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (253) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (247) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (256) Motion in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davis, # 2 Declaration of Powell, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Motion to Strike (Redacted), # 5 Motion to Strike (Sealed), # 6 Declaration of Hughes, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), # 14 Exhibit 5, # 15 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), # 16 Exhibit 6, # 17 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), # 18 Exhibit 7 (Proposed Order))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 256 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2014. Replies due by 8/19/2014. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 255 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Dkt. Nos. 237 in CV13-01776, 263 in -01777, 238 in -01778, 230 in -01844 & 243 in -02023). The court denies Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ONE-WEEK EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (248) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (249) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (252) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 253 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to 248 Adaptix, Inc.'s Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding One-Week Extension of Expert Discovery filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR JULY 28, 2014 MOTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (271) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG and (250) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 250 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the July 28, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 249 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/1/2014. Replies due by 8/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 9 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 248 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 247 EXHIBITS re 208 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, /Public Filing of Exhibit A to the Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 208 ) (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 246 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 19, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/19/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 245 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 10, 2014 Set Hearing: Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions set for 7/28/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING ADAPTIX INC.'S MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (263) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (238) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (237) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (230) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (243) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv- 02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference to Resolve Adaptix's Request for Leave to Amend its Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 242 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (In Re: Docket Nos. 229 in 13-01776, 232 in -01777, 223 in -01778, 215 in -01844 & 212 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Parties to meet & confer regarding necessary additional discovery related to the unclean hands defense. If no agreement can be reached, parties to submit a joint, 5 page letter brief to the court outlining remaining disputes. The court will then resolve any outstanding disputes based on the brief. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:50 to 5:11) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Bibby (Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE JULY 8, 2014 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER HEARING, granting (259) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (235) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (234) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (227) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (239) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 239 MOTION to Appear by Telephone For The July 8, 2014 Hearing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 238 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motions, Continuing MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, (232 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (223 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (215 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (212 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): 7/1/2014 Motions are continued to 7/8/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY, LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JULY 1, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 236 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 236 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the July 1, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (232 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File, (223 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, (215 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File, (212 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 13, 2014 Filing 235 Reply Brief in Support of 212 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JONATHAN B RUBENSTEIN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 232 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHNSON KUNCHERIA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 231 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 232 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8689563.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 231 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8687200.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 230 RESPONSE to re 212 Exhibits, Defendants' Motion For Leave To File Amended Answer by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES C. WILLIAMS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 220 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER C. TEMPESTA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 219 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KURT M. PANKRATZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 218 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DOUGLAS M. KUBEHL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 217 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC (Boren, Bryant) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Vensel Swenson for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 225 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY ELLIOTT HOOLE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (227) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (228) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (218) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ADAPTIX TO SERVE FINAL AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (234) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (189) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (216) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (214) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Joint Stipulation Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Elliott Hoole filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667701.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, James) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 219 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667670.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tempesta, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667628.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pankratz, Kurt) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667599.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 215 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 05/16/14, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:00 - 10:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 214 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Privilege Log filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael James Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (187) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. 4:14-CV-02359-KAW and 3:14-cv-02360 JCS RELATED to 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-01386-PSG and 5:14-cv-01387-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Amended Privilege Log filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 Filing 212 EXHIBITS re 208 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 206 filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 208 ) (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INCORPORATED by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (229) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (185) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (220) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (213) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (210) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 30, 2014 Filing 210 STIPULATION WITH (PROPOSED) ORDER Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated filed by Apple, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Filing 209 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Metadata (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER DENYING 206 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5, a party looking to seal documents is required to submit a declaration establishing that the documents are in fact sealable. In addition, the request must be narrowly tailored. A declaration from outside counsel simply saying it is so does not meet this standard. In addition, the request must be narrowly tailored. A cursory review of the materials at issue in the pending motions shows portions that plainly are not sealable. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 207 Letter Brief re 200 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 200 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 205 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:00 to 10:44) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 204 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING 201 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 5/15/2014 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Set Hearing as to 200 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata. Motion to Compel set for 5/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 202 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on May 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve a Discovery Dispute filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 200 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (202) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (170) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (198) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (200) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (183) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 198 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. Nos 170-3 in -1774, 200-3 in -1776, 202-3 in -1777, 198-3 in -1778, 189-3 in -1844 & 183-3 in -2023) AND Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 207 in -1776, 210 in -1777 & 191 in -2023). The Court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel is granted. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 197 EXHIBITS re 180 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 187 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 163 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Defendants' Motion for Teleconference, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 3 Public Filing of Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 180 , 187 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 Filing 196 EXHIBITS re 180 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 187 Order on Motion for Leave to File Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 161 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 180 , 187 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 Filing 195 Letter Brief re 191 Letter Brief, Concerning Production of Email by Adaptix filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 191 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 194 Letter Brief re 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 183 ) (Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 193 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON MAY 9, 2014 MOTIONS: 5/9/2014 5:00 PM Motions are advanced to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 Set Hearing re 191 Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 190 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 191 Letter Brief re 190 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Email by Adaptix filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 190 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 190 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014) Modified on 5/1/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 Filing 189 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on April 16, 2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: FTR4:45-6:04. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Liao for Apple Inc. (Liao, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (205) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (172) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (200) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (202) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (191) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (186) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Orders Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MAY 9, 2014 MOTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 184 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 26, 2014 Set Hearing as to 170 -3 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions: Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 26, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 26, 2014 Filing 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Letter Brief, # 4 Exhibit A (Sealed Document), # 5 Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 25, 2014 Remarks: Attorneys Howard Wizenfeld, Robert Macaulay Pollaro and Michael Brian Powell status changed to Pro Hac Vice re Order (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (64) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (65) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01387-PSG; granting (66) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (69) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01386-PSG; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01380-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2014 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC /Proof of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Second Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement of AT&T Mobility LLC (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (147) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (149) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (165) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (166) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (161) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (163) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewalgranting in part and denying in part (184) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (153) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (181) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (185) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (171) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (176) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (162) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 178 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: 1.) Motion to Compel Privilege Logs (In Re: Docket Nos. 147-3 in -1774, 178-3 in -1776, 188 in -1777, 186 in -1778, 176 in -1844 and 171 in -2023. 2.) Motion to Compel Matthew Vella for Deposition (In Re: Docket Nos. 149-3 in -1774, 180-3 in -1776, 180-3 in -1777, 180-3 in -1778, 166-3 in -1844 and 163-3 in -2023. 3.) Motion to Modify the Court's Case Management Order and Supplemental Scheduling Order (In Re: Docket Nos. 153 in -1774, 185 in -1776, 184 in -1777, 181 in -1778, 171 in -1844 and 167 in -2023. Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:45 to 6:04) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 177 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING APRIL 10, 2014 RELATED CASE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 171 Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2014 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 172 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 174 Letter Brief re 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 161 , 163 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 173 RESPONSE (re 167 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, 162 Discovery Letter BriefConcerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 172 Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 171 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified on 4/14/2014(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 Filing 171 Letter Brief Concerning Request for an Order to Compel Plaintiff Adaptix to Amend Multiple Privilege Logs filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED. Case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG related to 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; 5:13- cv-01778-PSG; 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; 5:13-cv-02023-PSG; 5:14-cv-01259-PSG; 3:14-cv-01379-JSW; 3:14-cv-01380-EMC; 3:14-cv-01385-SI; 3:14-cv-01386-YGR; and 3:14-cv-01387-JST. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/10/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jennifer Lu Gilbert (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. for Unredacted Copies of Sealed Filings (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 168 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion Hearing, Setting Hearing as to 167 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2014 04:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.***</b (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 167 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 166 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING, Setting Hearing as to (149 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (147 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (148 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella(178 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (179 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (179 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (178 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (167 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (165 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (166 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (162 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (163 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (161 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs. Hearing set for 4/16/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (150) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (164) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 4/21/2014. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 Filing 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Public Redacted Version of Motion for Teleconference, # 17 Unredacted Version of Motion for Teleconference)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 162 Discovery Letter BriefConcerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 157 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 158 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 159 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 159 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493615.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 158 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493098.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pollaro, Robert) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 157 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493067.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wizenfeld, Howard) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Marc Jensen on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Bas de Blank on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO COMPEL (171 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc., (145 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (162 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (144 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (170 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (175 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (161 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (152 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (153 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 26, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 149 Letter Brief, Withdrawing Letter Brief Concerning Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 152 STIPULATION re 149 Letter Brief, Motion to Compel filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING 146 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 25, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (172 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief, (149 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief, (167 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief, Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 04:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MARCH 28, 2014 DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (171 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (166 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) and (148 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 4:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 149 Letter Brief re 148 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Verizon's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 148 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. of Related Case Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Davis, Craig) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. Fulford ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8422832.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Fulford, Thomas) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING 144 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 21, 2014 Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMLETE MEDIATION filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Moehringer)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (160) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (135) Motion Extend Time for Mediation; granting (136) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (166) Stipulation; granting (167) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (153) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (142) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Order, # 2 Stipulated Order) (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (133) Motion for Protective Order in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 139 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 18, 2014 SETTLEMENT REFERRAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR VADAS: 2/18/2014 Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas is hereby vacated. Scheduling conference to proceed in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG ONLY. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 137 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on December 19, 2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR 9:57-12:04, 1:01-2:18, 2:57-3:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 136 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2013, before Judge Paul S. Gewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Galvan Colin, Telephone number 408 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2013. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 12/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court issues constructions from the bench. Court to issue written order. Written opinion will follow. (Court Reporter FTR: (9:57 to 12:04; 1:01 to 2:18; 2:57 to 3:01) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 133 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 12/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 131 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Miele ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8228595.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Miele, Anthony) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 130 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 129 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Responsive Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (145) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (112) in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (152) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (146) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (136) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (127) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 127 MOTION re 124 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Unopposed Notice of Correction filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 126 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on August 6, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619; Email address: candace.yount@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2014. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 125 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING PERIOD by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG.Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 123 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 122 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (135 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS and (117 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS: The court grants Adaptix's motion for leave to amend its preliminary infringement contentions. Deadline to include additional products set for 12/2/2013. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 121 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent L.R. 4-3 [JOINT] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 120 Discovery Letter Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 118) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 119 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 9, 2013 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 118 Letter Brief re 117 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 117 ) (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 3, 2013 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-20-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (131) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement [UNOPPOSED] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini ISO Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013) Modified on 9/25/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2013 Filing 112 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions (90 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) and Hearing as to Defendants' Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Order held on 9/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court grants Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Tutorial continued to 12/18/13 at 10:00 in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing continued to 12/19/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court to issue amended scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 20, 2013. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting (92) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. (Attachments: # 1 Order in 13-1844, # 2 Order in 13-2023)Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin Gannon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8017983.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 108 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference (In Re: Docket Nos. 82 , 83 and 84 ) set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7982483.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7974960.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(DeBlois, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 104 Letter from Defendants Regarding Adaptix's Objections to Scheduling Proposal. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 103 Opposition to Defendants' 102 Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Orders by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2013) Modified on 8/30/2013(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 102 Proposed Order of Defendants to Amend 100 Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/30/2013) Modified on 8/30/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 22, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (123) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (93) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 98 MOTION FOR PRO HACE VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 22, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7944937.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Diaz, Samiyah) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 97 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (123 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions and re (93 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court: The court takes matters under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/22/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 96 Letter Brief re 93 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 95 Letter from Adaptix, Inc. Regarding Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING as to (123 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions and as to (93 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court: Motions set for 8/22/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for a telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 93 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Infringement Contentions Served Without Leave of Court filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 92 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/16/2013) Modified on 8/16/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 87 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 86 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET ENTRY 87***Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 Filing 85 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Court to issue order after hearing. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:05 to 10:28.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Supplemental Scheduling Order, # 2 Proposed Order Electronic Discovery Order, # 3 Proposed Order Dispute Resolution Procedure, # 4 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Evan Davis on behalf of Apple Inc. (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC / Proof of Service of Rule 26(a)1 Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement of AT&T Mobility LLC (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial Hearing set for 11/6/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/8/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/24/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J. Hayes, Esq and Change of Firm Affiliation (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 79 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Case management scheduling order to be issued. Status conference set for 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM to discuss structure of initial trial as set forth in schedule and to discuss motion practice. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:03 to 11:07.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. Amended (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 76 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 72 STIPULATION SELECTING PRIVATE ADR entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2013 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent SBC Telecom, Inc., Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 72 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Adaptix, Inc. filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (53) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (84) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (67) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt in Support of Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2013. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 4, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REFERRING RELATED CASES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/4/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel McArtur Shafer (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, Hon. Jon S. Tigar, Hon. Edward M. Chen, Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/3/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hayes) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Lipman) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Hayes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7736105.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steven E. Lipman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7735866.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 56 Statement re 53 Order / Plaintiff's Statement in Response to Notice of Pending Motion to Relate Cases by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Support for Administrative Motion to Relate Cases and Notice of Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 54 Statement re 53 Order /Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Statement in Response to Court's 5/20/13 Notice of Pending Motion to Relate Cases and Notice of Consent to Magistrate Judge by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 53 Notice of pending motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/20/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Moehringer) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Lutz) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hughes) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hardt) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION of John T. Moehringer for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7703091.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Moehringer, John) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION of Regina M. Lutz for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7701777.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION of Christopher A. Hughes for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7701712.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on May 14, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 41 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adaptix, Inc... (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 40 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 39 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by Apple, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/9/2013) Modified on 5/10/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McArtur Shafer for Adaptix, Inc. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cheng-hong Lin for Adaptix, Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Banys for Adaptix, Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Hardt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7686073.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE Re: Case Transfer in Received from the Eastern District of Texas, Case No. 6:13-cv-28-MHS-CMC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 33 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:13-cv-00028. Case file Electronically transferred. Transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/8/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (gsg)
April 29, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samiyah Diaz on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Diaz, Samiyah)
April 23, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Change Venue to Northern Dist of California. (No opposition but Magistrate Judge Craven requests to hold transferring to new court for 20 days due to a related case that is also pending transfer). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/10/2013. (sm, )
April 9, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. re 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue of Non-Opposition (Hill, Jack)
April 9, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/03/13. cc:attys 4-04-13(mll, )
March 25, 2013 Filing 25 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W Orbitz Flights, # 2 Exhibit X Orbitz Flights, # 3 Exhibit Y Table C-5 Stats, # 4 Exhibit Z Hujun Yin LinkedIn)(Smith, Melissa)
March 25, 2013 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N Tellado profile, # 2 Exhibit O Cioffi Bio, # 3 Exhibit P Kasturia LinkedIn, # 4 Exhibit Q Cioffi Bio, # 5 Exhibit R Wilson Bio, # 6 Exhibit S Broadcomm buys Beceem, # 7 Exhibit T Paulraj founder Beceem, # 8 Exhibit U Qualcomm SF Locations, # 9 Exhibit V Broadcom ND Cal)(Smith, Melissa)
March 25, 2013 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G Dooyong Lee LinkIn, # 2 Exhibit H Ex. to 3-1 Contentions, # 3 Exhibit I Dr. Shen LinkedIn, # 4 Exhibit J Michael Mallie Bio, # 5 Exhibit K Mahurin LinkedIn, # 6 Exhibit L David Tse Berkeley Bio, # 7 Exhibit M Paulraj Bio)(Smith, Melissa)
March 25, 2013 Filing 22 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hardt Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A Dr. Hui Liu Bio, # 3 Exhibit AA Pan LinkedIn, # 4 Exhibit B Hui Liu Bio, # 5 Exhibit C Our Story, # 6 Exhibit D Adaptix TX Reports, # 7 Exhibit E Acacia Sub Acquires Adaptix, # 8 Exhibit F Initial Disclosures)(Smith, Melissa)
March 25, 2013 Filing 21 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Apple and AT&T (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Caine Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Buckley Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 7, 2013 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Telecom, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher)
February 6, 2013 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Reply to Apple, Inc.'s ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adaptix, Inc..(Bostock, Dean)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of AT&T Inc. filed by Adaptix, Inc. The Court dismisses without prejudice all claims against AT&T. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/5/13. (mjc, )
February 4, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Request for Status Conference (Hill, Jack)
February 1, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Clonts, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 1, 2013 Filing 14 APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to Complaint Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 1, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark D Selwyn on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3981873. (Selwyn, Mark)
January 30, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John T Moehringer on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3976744. (Moehringer, John)
January 30, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant AT&T, Inc. Pursuant to Fed.R.Cvi.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean)
January 29, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A Hughes on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3975682. (Hughes, Christopher)
January 24, 2013 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, )
January 24, 2013 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, )
January 24, 2013 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 1/11/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/1/2013. (mll, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 6 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 9, 2013 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
January 8, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Apple, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb)
January 7, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
January 4, 2013 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
January 4, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3939184.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,454,212, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,947,748)(Bostock, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Samiyah Diaz
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes, Esq.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Steven Edward Lipman
Represented By: Daniel McArtur Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L Hardt
Represented By: Mark D Selwyn
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: David Randall Clonts
Represented By: Christopher A. Hughes
Represented By: Regina M. Lutz
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?