Ortega v. Wells Fargo & Company Short Term Disability Plan

Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Short Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Gary Ortega
Case Number: 4:2013cv02866
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION FOR SHORT CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
November 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/15/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
December 2, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 23 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Responses due by 1/10/2014. Replies due by 1/17/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 5, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Wells Fargo & Company Short Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Short Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ortega
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.