Victor v. R.C. Bigelow, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adam Victor
Defendant: R.C. Bigelow, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv02976
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING R.C. BIGELOW, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 12, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference continued to 8/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 23, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 88 STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule on MSJ and Continue CMC. Briefing schedule adopted as proposed. Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2016. Case Management Conference continued to 7/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 5, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 STIPULATION To Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 6/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
September 21, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 71 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
August 12, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISPUTE OVER DISCOVERY OF PROFITS by Hon. William H. Orrick re 65 Discovery Letter Brief. Victor's request is DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
July 7, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the second amended complaint as a separate docket entry within ten days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 8, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/5/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
July 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with modificiations 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE. Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2014. Class Certification hearing: 6/17/2015. Discovery cutoff: 9/18/2015. Dispositive motions to be heard by 11/18/2015 . Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2016 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
November 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor v. R.C. Bigelow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Victor
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.C. Bigelow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?