Doe I et al v. Butler Amusements, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Doe II and John Doe I
Defendant: Butler Amusements, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03027
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE: AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER, signed 12/9/14, re 84 Letter filed by Butler Amusements, Inc., for Wayne Pierce to appear by phone on 12/12/14 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING re 41 Letter filed by Butler Amusements, Inc., for Wayne Pierce to appear by phone on 2/14/14 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/15/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe I et al v. Butler Amusements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler Amusements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe II
Represented By: Denise M. Hulett
Represented By: Fernando Flores
Represented By: Charlotte Whiton Noss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe I
Represented By: Charlotte Whiton Noss
Represented By: Denise M. Hulett
Represented By: Fernando Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?