Rothman v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Marshal Rothman
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Old Republic Diversified Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03381
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF U.S. BANK WITH PREJUDICE The Third Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and with each party paying their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 12, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 128 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 126 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND CONSENT ORDER Robert S. McWhorter, of the law firm LeClairRyan, is substituted in the place of Nossaman LLP as attorney of record for defendant U.S. Bank. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AMENDED ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER Pursuant to stipulation, the pretrial/trial schedule is modified. All other dates not modified by this order shall remain as set forth in the Amended Pretrial Order. The sole amendment is to correct a typographical error as to the date of the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER Pursuant to stipulation, the pretrial/trial schedule is modified. All other dates not modified by this order shall remain as set forth in the Amended Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT The motion is GRANTED. Rothman shall file his First Supplemental Complaint no later than December 29, 2014. The parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss any changes, if necessary, to the current pretrial and/or trial schedule, and should the parties come to an agreement, to file a proposed revised schedule. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, they are directed to file a joint request for a status conference for the purpose of resolving any disagreement as to the schedule. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2014. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 106 Motion to Compel. The court VACATES the current hearing date. The parties are ordered to immediately begin a meet and confer process. If they are unable to resolve their disagreements without judicial intervention, the parties must file a joint discovery letter that complies with this order no later than December 31, 2014. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT DECEMBER 19, 2014 HEARING The Court does not conduct motion hearings by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions, both filed December 11, 2014, and all further discovery matters, are referred to a Magistrate Judge to be heard and considered at the convenience of the assigned Magistrate Judges calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS Plaintiff is ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of the "Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint." Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/3/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Counsel for all parties are hereby ordered to appear telephonically at the October 31, 2014 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION; ORDER DENYING STIPULATION; ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE The stipulation is denied and the Court sets a status conference for October 31, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., at which time the parties shall be prepared to show good cause for an y modification of the Court's Pretrial Preparation Order. Alternatively, if the parties do not anticipate the need for expert declarations either to support or oppose summary judgment, the parties may resubmit for approval, no later than October 24, 2014, the stipulation set forth in their October 15, 2014 filing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE The stipulation is denied without prejudice to resubmission with showing of good cause, particularly given proposed expert discovery cutoff, which postdates dispositive motion filing deadline. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS The First Cause of Action is dismissed without leave to amend; the motion is denied with respect to the Fourth Cause of Action; the motion is denied with respect to the Sixth Cause of Action; the Eighth Cause of Action is dismissed without leave to amend; with respect to the Ninth Cause of Action, the motion is denied to the extent said claim is based on the Fourth and Sixth Causes of Action, and to the extent s aid claim is based on the First and Eighth Causes of Action the motion is granted and the claim is dismissed, without leave to amend, to the extent based thereon. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 3, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE The parties' joint request is hereby denied without prejudice to the parties' seeking a continuance from Magistrate Judge Cousins. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 1, 2014 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE: TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for April 18, 2014, is continued to May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for March 21, 2014, is continued to April 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DEEMING OLD REPUBLIC DEFAULT MANAGEMENT SERVICES' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR COURT-SPONSORED MEDIATION; DEFERRING RULING ON MOTIONS AND VACATING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference is continued to January 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING OCTOBER 4, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO OCTOBER 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CONSTRUED AS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Court construes plaintiff's motion as a motion for a preliminary injunction and continues the hearing to October 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 28, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothman v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshal Rothman
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Represented By: Erin Jane Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Eric M. Alderete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Diversified Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Ming Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?