O'Connor et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Douglas O'Connor and Thomas Colopy
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick and Ryan Graves
Case Number: 4:2013cv03826
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 19-cv-6462-JCS, Colopy v. Uber Technologies Inc., related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/10/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 973 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen finding as moot 956 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 972 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor re 971 Clerk's Notice,,, (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 971 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff in Colopy v. Uber Technologies Inc. (3:19-cv-06462) has filed a motion to relate the case to OConnor v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (3:13-cv-03826). Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12, Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. shall have the opportunity to respond. The response must specifically address the issues in Civil L.R. 3-12(a) and (d) and be served on all parties and lodged with the Chambers of all Judges identified in the motion. The response shall be filed by 3pm on Thursday, October 10, 2019. Plaintiff to immediately notify Defendant of the opportunity to respond and the deadline by which to do so; proof of that notice shall be filed with this Court.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 976 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 975 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 964 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court as docket number 976 as IFP Pending). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 970 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Thomas Colopy. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 19-cv-5723-YGR related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/27/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 968 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 965 MOTION to Relate Case No. 4:19-cv-05723 (N.D. Cal.) ) - Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Angela McRay's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether to Relate Cases filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 967 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor re 966 Clerk's Notice,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email to Defendant's Counsel)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 966 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff in McRay v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (4:19-cv-05723) has filed a motion to relate the case to OConnor v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (3:13-cv-03826). Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12, Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. shall have the opportunity to respond. The response must specifically address the issues in Civil L.R. 3-12(a) and (d) and be served on all parties and lodged with the Chambers of all Judges identified in the motion. The response shall be filed by 12pm on Friday, September 27, 2019. Plaintiff to immediately notify Defendant of the opportunity to respond and the deadline by which to do so; proof of that notice shall be filed with this Court. . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 965 MOTION to Relate Case No. 4:19-cv-05723 (N.D. Cal.) filed by Angela McRay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order re. Relating Cases)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 954 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Granting 935 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 963 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/29/2019 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Diva Limousine, Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 962 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/29/19, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (961 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2019. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 961 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8-29-19 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Behnia, Sophia) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 960 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2019 re (954 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, (935 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 35 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Sohpia Behnia, Dhananjay Manthripragada. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 957 Supplemental Brief re 954 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Katherine Hathaway, # 2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement)(Related document(s) 954 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 959 Letter of objection dated 8/22/19 from Robert D. Belshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 958 Letter to the Court dated 8/19/19 from Mohammad Moaddab. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 956 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (Attachments: # 1 Response in Opposition, # 2 Declaration in Support, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying Without Prejudice 950 Plaintiff's Amended Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 954 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/8/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine Hathaway and Exhibits A through F thereto)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Docket entry # 947 modified. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 953 NOTICE/Request for Correction to Docket filed by S. Patrick Mendel re 947 Certificate of Service. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 952 OBJECTIONS to proposed settlement filed by Robert D. Belshaw. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 951 OBJECTIONS to Settlement filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 950 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether to Relate Cases to 19-cv-3244 JSW filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying Without Prejudice 946 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 948 OBJECTION to Proposed Class Settlement filed by El Hassane Tadli. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 947 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Price re 946 MOTION to Relate Case (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 946 MOTION to Relate Case to 4:19-cv-03244-JSW Mendel v. Chao by S. Patrick Mendel. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (935 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (335 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Fairness Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (935 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (335 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION for Attorney Fees . Fairness Hearing set for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 945 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 944 335 Joint Stipulation to Reschedule Final Approval Hearing and to Extend Deadlines. The Final Approval Hearing previously set for July 18, 2019 is now RESCHEDULED for AUGUST 29, 2019 at 1:30pm, Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco, CA before Judge Edward M. Chen. The deadline for filing a request for exclusion from the settlement remains unchanged. The deadline for filing a claim is now August 17, 2019.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-03826-EMC, 3:15-cv-00262-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 944 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 934 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 942 Declaration of Pedro Sanchez in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 941 Declaration of Antonio Oliveira in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 940 Declaration of Mohktar Talha in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 939 Declaration of Aaron Dulles in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 938 Declaration of Matthew Manahan in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 937 Declaration of Elie Gurfinkel in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 936 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 935 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 935 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 934 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit P - Unredacted, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit Q - Unredacted)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 933 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/21/19, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold, telephone number 218-355-8781. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2019. (veS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 932 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed by Matthew Manahan, Elie Gurfinkel. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/19/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2019 Filing 931 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/2019 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
March 29, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 915 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 929 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2019 re (915 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, (321 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Pedro Sanchez, Aaron Dulles, Antonio Oliveira, Mokhtar Talha. Court grants preliminary approval. Written Order to issue. Fairness hearing to be set in July. Pretrial deadlines vacated. Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. Plaintiff Attorneys: Shannon Liss-Riordan, Ann Kramer. Defendant Attorneys: Sophia Behnia, Dhananjay Manthripradgada, Theane Evangelis. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 928 Joint NOTICE by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan re 925 Order ATTACHING REVISED PROPOSED LONG-FORM NOTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 927 Supplemental Brief re 924 Order filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan)(Related document(s) 924 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 926 EXHIBITS re 916 Declaration in Support, 921 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 916 , 921 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER Re Proposed Notice of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 924 AMENDED ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 922 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 921 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 913 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 920 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 914 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 919 Statement in Support re 915 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 918 Declaration of Dhananjay Manthripragada in Support of 913 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 913 ) (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 917 Proposed Order and Joint Request to Vacate Deadlines by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 916 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 915 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byElie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 915 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 915 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 914 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation & Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 913 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Version, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Version)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 912 Sealed document (afm, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (296 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint., Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 3/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
January 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/7/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 910 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's unavailability, the TIME for Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled from 9:30 a.m. to 2/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
December 12, 2018 Filing 909 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 906 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. Case 18-cv-7343-RS related. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 908 Request for Judicial Notice re 907 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 907 ) (Behnia, Sophia) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 907 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 906 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE WITH CASE NO. 4:18-cv-07343-KAW ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Behnia, Sophia) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 906 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE WITH CASE NO. 4:18-cv-07343-KAW filed by Marciano Abadilla. Responses due by 12/10/2018. (Larson, Stephen) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 905 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 12/12/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 2/7/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 904 MANDATE of USCA as to (143 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (43 in 3:15-cv-03667-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC, (437 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (165 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (465 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (108 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (151 in 3:14-cv-05200-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Ronald Gillette, Shannon Wise, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, (442 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, (404 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (169 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Hakan Yucesoy, (139 in 3:14-cv-05200-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 903 USCA Opinion as to (143 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (43 in 3:15-cv-03667-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC, (437 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (165 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (465 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (108 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (151 in 3:14-cv-05200-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Ronald Gillette, Shannon Wise, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, (442 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, (404 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., (169 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Hakan Yucesoy, (139 in 3:14-cv-05200-EMC) Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.; Reversed and Remanded. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 902 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS as to (296 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint FOR 12/12/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 901 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Court is specially setting Case Management Conference in lead and related cases for 12/12/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 4:18-cv-5546-YGR related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 899 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; granting (307) Modified Stipulation in case 3:15-cv-00262-EMC. Case Management Conference and Motion to Compel Arbitration and/or Dismiss reset from 11/8 to 11/20/2018 at 1:30 p.m.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-00262-EMC, 3:13-cv-03826-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (296 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint, Set Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 10/11/2018. Replies due by 10/25/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 898 (DISREGARD - TO REISSUE) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (897) Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing and Adjust Briefing Schedule (also in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC). Motion to Compel Arbitration and/or Dismiss and Case Management Conference reset from 10/25/2018 to 11/8/2018 at 1:30 p.m.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-03826-EMC, 3:15-cv-00262-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) Modified on 9/26/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2018 Filing 897 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Hearing and Adjust Briefing Schedule filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 896 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 894 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Squeri, Peter) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 895 Declaration of Michael A. Geibelson in Support of 894 MOTION to Relate Case filed byDiva Limousine, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Class Action Complaint for Violation of the California Unfair Competition Law and the California Unfair Practices Act)(Related document(s) 894 ) (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 894 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Diva Limousine, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Relating Cases)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 893 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING AND ADJUST BRIEFING SCHEDULE re (303 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Stipulation, (892 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Stipulation. Responses due by 8/30/2018. Replies due by 9/17/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 892 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING AND ADJUST BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 891 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to (296 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 8/2/2018. Replies due by 8/20/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 890 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING AND ADJUST BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 889 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further Case Management Conference from 7/19/2018 to Friday 7/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 883 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER GRANTING 886 Stipulation. Case Management Conference re-scheduled to July 19, 2018 at 1:30pm in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave. Joint STatement to be filed by July 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 8, 2018. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 886 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CMC AND HEARING AND ADJUST BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 885 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Myron Milton Cherry and Jacie C. Zolna (Cherry, Myron) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 884 Mail sent to Kathy Robinson returned as undeliverable re 880 Order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 883 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Matthew Carlson) filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/11/2018. (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 882 CLERK'S NOTICE Due to counsel's unavailability, Further Case Management Conference in both the O'Connor and Yucesoy cases and motion to dismiss hearing in the Yocesoy case is reset from 5/31/2018 for 6/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Management Statement due by 6/7/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 881 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Squeri (Squeri, Peter) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend PAGA Claim Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 874 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 878 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/1/2018, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (875 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order, (876 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 877 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion to Amend Hearing held on 3/1/2018. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2018. Further Case Management Conference/Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for 5/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Total Time in Court: 54 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 876 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 875 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/01/2018 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 874 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Kevin Ring-Dowell) filed by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 3/15/2018. Replies due by 3/22/2018. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 873 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 872 Supplemental Brief re 870 Supplemental Brief, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Memorandum re Their Motions to Amend The Complaint to add PAGA Claims filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 870 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 871 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Plaintiff to file a reply to Uber's supplemental brief (DN 870) by Tuesday 2/13/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 870 Supplemental Brief re 865 Supplemental Brief, 863 Clerk's Notice, filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Ring-Dowell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 865 , 863 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 869 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Electronic filing error Re: 868 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all association of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, or other entities that have a financial interest or could be substantially affected by the outcome of the proceeding. [err800] (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 868 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 867 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/1/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/29/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 866 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 865 Supplemental Brief re 863 Clerk's Notice, Regarding Their Motions To Amend The Complaint To Add PAGA Claims (Dkt. 253 & 355) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 863 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 864 CLERK'S NOTICE setting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend for 3/1/18 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. As stated in the Clerk's Notice dated 1/18/18, Plaintiff's supplemental briefing shall be filed by 1/25/18. Defendant's response due 2/1/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 863 CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff shall file supplemental brief re: Plaintiff's pending motion to amend within 7 days. Defendants to reply 7 days thereafter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 862 NOTICE by William Anderson, Thomas Colopy, Ronald Gillette, Elie Gurfinkel, David Kahn, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, Wilson Rolle, Jr of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
December 27, 2017 Filing 861 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/14/2017, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 11:38 a.m. - 12:09 p.m. = 31 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (860 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order, (859 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2018. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 860 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 859 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 858 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2017. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time: 11:38-12:08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2017) Modified on 12/18/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2017 Filing 857 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 856 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 855 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation To Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 854 Mail sent to Kathy Robinson returned as undeliverable re 852 USCA Order, 853 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 853 CLERK'S Letter Spreading 852 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 852 ORDER of USCA granting motion for voluntary dismissal as to 835 Notice of Appeal and 838 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 851 Mail sent to Kathy Robinson returned as undeliverable re 834 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER of USCA as to 437 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., 465 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., 108 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., 442 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, 404 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER Regarding 846 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion and 848 Uber's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on September 22, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 848 RESPONSE to re 847 Response ( Non Motion ), (Reply Re: Request for Authorization to Communicate with Class Members and Opposition to Defendant's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 847 MOTION for Attorney Fees; RESPONSE (re 840 Emergency MOTION for Authorization to Communicate with Class Members by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 9/22/2017) Modified on 9/25/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2017 Filing 846 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Requesting Emergency Authorization to Communicate With Class Members (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 845 Mail sent to Kathy Robinson returned as undeliverable re 821 Order. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER of USCA as to 835 Notice of Appeal and 838 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 843 USCA Case Number 17-16863 for 838 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 842 USCA Case Number 17-16859 for 835 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER Directing Defendant to Respond to 840 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Communicate with Class Members by September 22, 2017 at 4pm. Class Counsel to await further order before issuing e-mail. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 840 Emergency MOTION for Authorization to Communicate with Class Members filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER Regarding Subject Line for Corrective Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 838 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Appeal of Order on Motion to Stay 837 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11718295 paid) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/14/2017) (USCA Case No. 17-16863)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 836 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Stay Issuance of Corrective Notice Pending Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 836 Emergency MOTION to Stay Issuance of Corrective Notice Pending Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2017 12:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 835 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Appeal of Order on Motion for Sanctions 825 , Order, 829 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11713896 paid.) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/13/2017) (USCA Case No. 17-16859)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 830 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Postponement of Issuance of Corrective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 833 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 9/11/17 motion hearing. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 10, 2017 Filing 832 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 830 Emergency MOTION for Postponement of Issuance of Corrective Notice to Allow for Briefing on a Motion to Stay the Issuance of Notice Pending Appeal ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 831 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Response re 825 Order by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/11/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2017 Filing 830 Emergency MOTION for Postponement of Issuance of Corrective Notice to Allow for Briefing on a Motion to Stay the Issuance of Notice Pending Appeal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/11/2017. Replies due by 9/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER REGARDING 826 CORRECTIVE NOTICE TO CLASS AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 828 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/06/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Corrective Notice)(emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 828 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Redacted Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Response to Court Order, # 4 Declaration Unredacted Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Response to Court Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 827 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 826 Statement in Support of Plaintiffs' Position Regarding Corrective Notice filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 826 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 826 Joint Statement re Proposed Corrected Class Notice; re 825 Order on Motion for Sanctions Filed on Behalf of Both Parties by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 9/5/2017) Modified on 9/6/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 811 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 824 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riorday in Response re 821 Court Order by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/30/2017) Modified on 8/31/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Filing 823 CLERK'S NOTICE. At the 8/24/17, the Court set a Further Case Management Conference for 12/7/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 822 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion hearing held on 8/24/2017 re (811 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) MOTION for Sanctions filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Court to issue order. CMC held. Case remains stayed. Total Time in Court 1 hour 22 minutes. Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER Directing Class Counsel to Explain Solicitation E-mail. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 820 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/17 before Edward M. Chen by Ricardo Del Rio, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 819 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/17, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (815 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2017. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 818 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/24/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Steven Price, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 817 Supplemental Notice in Support re 811 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua S. Lipshutz, # 2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 811 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Filing 816 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 815 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/24/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 814 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 813 REPLY (re 811 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Joshua Lipshutz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration Sophia Behnia, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 812 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 811 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 811 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/3/2017. Replies due by 8/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 810 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/29/2017 to 8/24/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 809 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation to Reschedule Case Management Conference) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 808 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 807 Re: Briefing Schedule in Johnston v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (Case No. 3:16-cv-3134-EMC) filed by Todd Johnston. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 807 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule in Johnston v. Uber Technologies, Inc. (Case No. 3:16-cv-3134-EMC) filed by Todd Johnston. (Malloy, Brian) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 806 CLERK'S NOTICE terminating motions #757 and #758. Case is stayed. Further status is set for 6/29/17 at 11:00 a.m. Parties shall re-notice these motions at a later time, if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 805 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/22/17, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (802 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2017. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 804 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/22/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 803 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 3/22/2017. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Total Time in Court 54 minutes. Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 802 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/22/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 801 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/22/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying Robinson's Motion to Lift Stay - (793) in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; (213) in case 3:14-cv-05200-EMC; (126) in case 3:15-cv-03667-EMC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying (791) Administrative Motion ; denying (792) Motion to Expedite in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; denying (259) Administrative Motion ; denying (260) Motion to Expedite in case 3:15-cv-00262-EMC; denying (128) Motion to Expedite in case 3:15-cv-03667-EMC; denying (54) Ex Parte Application ; denying (55) Motion to Expedite; denying (55) Ex Parte Application in case 3:16-cv-03134-EMC. CMC remains set for 3/22/17 at 10:00 a.m.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 798 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 797 REPLY (re 791 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 796 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 791 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference ) Plaintiff Todd Johnstons Opposition to Defendant Uber Motion for Administrative Relief to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed byTodd Johnston. (Malloy, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 795 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 794 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 791 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 792 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 791 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 3/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 793 MOTION/Stipulation to Reopen Case filed by Kathy Robinson. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 8, 2017 Filing 790 NOTICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing Regarding Proposed Price Settlement and Request for Opinion of LWDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 16, 2017 Filing 789 NOTICE of Change of Address by Graciela Mora (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 788 JOINT REPORT re Pro Se Plaintiff Graciela Mora re [784 Order by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephanie Amin-Giwner in Support of Joint Report re Pro Se Plaintiff Graciela Mora)(Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 2/14/2017) Modified on 2/14/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2017 Filing 787 NOTICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan of Plaintiffs' Objection to Proposed Price Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 786 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/23/2017 to Wednesday 3/22/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 785 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER Re Pro Se Plaintiff Graciela Mora. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 783 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset from 2/2/2017 to 3/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 782 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying (779) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; denying (204) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:14-cv-05200-EMC; denying (119) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:15-cv-03667-EMC. No hearing is set for 1/23/17. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 780 EXHIBITS filed by Kathy Robinson. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 779 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Kathy Robinson. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 23, 2016 Filing 778 Letter dated 12/11/16; from Kathy June Robinson re Supplemental. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 12, 2016 Case Stayed (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER Re Stay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 776 RESPONSE re 772 Order Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Proposed Price Settlement by Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 775 RESPONSE to 772 Order; Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Brief Regarding the Non-Price Plaintiffs' Ability to Comment on the Tentative Settlement in Price by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/6/2016) Modified on 12/7/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Filing (Unopposed) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Ring-Dowell, # 2 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Supplemental Filing Regarding Proposed Price Settment (UNDER SEAL))(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER RE: PRICE v. UBER MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 771 Letter Brief re 769 Order Regarding Tentative Settlement in Price Case filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 769 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 770 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Pro Se parties John Doe, Graciela Mora Re 769 Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER Re Stays. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Case Temporarily Stayed until next CMC on 2/2/17 (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 768 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2016. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. 12/15/2016 Motions hearing vacated. Total Time in Court 1 hour 22 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 767 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 766 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/18/2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (765 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2017. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 765 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/18/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 764 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Response to Douglas O'Connor's Case Management Statement filed by Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 763 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 762 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 761 STIPULATION AND ORDER re STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (758) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, (757) MOTION to Expand Class Period Stipulation to Stay Pending Briefing filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 760 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 758 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, 757 MOTION to Expand Class Period Stipulation to Stay Pending Briefing filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 759 Declaration of Theane Evangelis in Support of 758 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 758 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 758 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/21/2016. Replies due by 11/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 757 MOTION to Expand Class Period filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/17/2016. Replies due by 11/25/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 756 Mail sent to John Doe returned as undeliverable re 750 Order on Motion to Intervene, 748 Order on Motion for Settlement. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 755 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 10/18/2016 to 11/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 754 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. as to 748 Order on Motion for Settlement, 464 Order, 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Preliminary Injunction Appeal. Appeal Record due by 10/17/2016. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 753 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Joseph Ring-Dowell (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 752 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE STATUS CONFERENCE DEADLINES filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for Tuesday 10/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 23, 2016 Filing 751 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE STATUS CONFERENCE DEADLINES filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 19, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2016 10:31 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2016. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 588 627 637 644 677 Motions to Intervene and Denying 591 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 749 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re 748 Order on Motion for Settlement Sent to Pro Se Parties (1) Graciela Mora and (2) John Doe. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 518 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (734) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; granting (236) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:15-cv-00262-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (676) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:13-cv-03826-EMC; granting (228) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:15-cv-00262-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 657 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 731 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 739 OBJECTIONS to preliminary approval of settlement filed by Graciela Mora. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 738 OBJECTIONS to preliminary approval of settlement - complementary evidences filed by SF BADA. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 737 OBJECTIONS to preliminary approval of settlement filed by SF BADA - Adham Shaheen, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 743 Additional facts filed by Graciela Mora. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 742 Statement of More Issue by Graciela Mora. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 741 Proof of emails filed by Graciela Mora (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 740 Letter of Objection filed by Graciela Mora. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 736 Letter from Labor & Workforce Development Agency John Cumming. (Cumming, John) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 735 Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 734 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Barnes, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [Redacted] Supplemental Brief (Joint) in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, # 4 [Unredacted] Supplemental Brief (Joint) in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Kapur, Theane) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 733 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 732 Supplemental Brief (Joint) in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 732 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 732 Supplemental Brief (Joint) in Further Support of 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/15/2016) Modified on 7/18/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2016 Filing 731 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER Extending Time for Comments on Proposed PAGA Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 729 Letter from Labor & Workforce Development Agency . (Jagard, Christopher) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 728 OBJECTION to Settlement filed by Brandon Marshall. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 727 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas O'Connor Proof of Service on PAGA Administrator (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 711 Administrative Motion to relate cases (C16-3134 JSC is related to this case). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER Inviting Comments on Proposed PAGA Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER Re 518 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/30/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 719 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 716 Administrative Motion to File Sur-Reply to Price Motion to Intervene. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 721 NOTICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement of New Authority in Support of Their Motion for Preliminary Approval (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 720 REPLY (re 677 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byMaksim Hancharuk, Alexander Kazakov, Uladzimir Tabola, Yahor Zgurski. (Kuchinsky, Alexei) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 719 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Supplement in support of Plaintiffs' Responses to Objections to Class Action Settlement)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 718 RESPONSE (re 711 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Johnston et al. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3134-JCS ) in Opposition filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 717 NOTICE of New Authority by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan in Support re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/24/2016) Modified on 6/27/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2016 Filing 716 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to file sur-reply in opposition to Steven Price's motion to intervene re 637 MOTION to Intervene filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Sur-reply, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 22, 2016 Filing 715 EXHIBITS re 613 Declaration in Support,,, Exhibit I to the Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan (Docket No. 613) in support of Plaintiff's Responses to Objections filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan (Docket No. 613) in support of Plaintiff's Responses to Objections)(Related document(s) 613 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting as modified 609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 658 Administrative Motion to File Overlength Brief. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 702 Administrative Motion to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Ghazi Motion to Disqualify Class Counsel. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 711 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Whether Cases Should Be Related Johnston et al. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., Case No. 3:16-cv-3134-JCS filed by Todd Johnston. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Johnston Complaint, # 2 Declaration ISO Motion to Relate, # 3 Proposed Order)(Malloy, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting as modified 704 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for leave to file response memorandum. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 628 Motion to Relate Case. Case C16-2499 MEJ is not related to this case.(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 701 Administrative Motion to vacate hearings on 6/30/16 and 7/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 707 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 706 REPLY (re 637 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySteven Price. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 705 RESPONSE (re 637 MOTION to Intervene , 701 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Vacate Hearings Set for June 30, 2016 and July 21, 2016 and to Decide the Pending Motions On the Papers re 637 MOTION to Intervene , 677 MOTION to Intervene , 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caiafa, Douglas) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 704 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Response to Motion to Intervene Instanter re 677 MOTION to Intervene filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 6/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 703 RESPONSE (re 677 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 702 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Sur-reply in Opposition re 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 6/17/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-reply, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 701 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Vacate Hearings Set for June 30, 2016 and July 21, 2016 and to Decide the Pending Motions On the Papers re 637 MOTION to Intervene , 677 MOTION to Intervene , 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 6/17/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 700 Response to Plaintiff's Amendment to Their Supplemental Briefing Regarding Attorneys' Fees byDouglas O'Connor. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 10, 2016 Filing 699 Amendment re 659 Supplemental Brief Regarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 659 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/10/2016) Modified on 6/13/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 692 Motion to Shorten Time. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 697 Request for Judicial Notice re 696 Opposition/Response to Motion to Intervene filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 696 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 696 RESPONSE (re 637 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 695 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe re 694 Declaration in Support, 693 Reply to Opposition/Response, 692 MOTION to Shorten Time (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 694 Declaration in Support of Reply to Response re 644 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe. (Related document(s) 644 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 693 REPLY to Opposition (re 644 MOTION to Intervene); Administrative MOTION for Consent to Amend Complaint filed by John Doe. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 692 MOTION to Shorten Time, for Attendance at Hearing on June 21, and for 30 days to Amend 644 Motion to Intervene filed by John Doe. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 691 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-2-2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 681 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2016. (Related documents(s) 681 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Douglas O'Connor. (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 686 Declaration of DOUGLAS OCONNOR in Support of 685 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byAbdo Ghazi. (Related document(s) 685 ) (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 685 REPLY (re 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed byAbdo Ghazi. (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 684 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/02/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Chuck Congdon, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 683 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting 677 MOTION to Intervene from 7/14/2016 to. 7/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 682 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/2/16 before Edward M. Chen by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 681 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/2/16 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 680 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: (1) Motion Hearing for Preliminary Approval of Settlement held on 6/2/2016 (under submission). Motion to Stay (C15-3667 EMC Del Rio) held on 6/2/2016. Granted. Total Time in Court 3 hours 16 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 690 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Graciela Mora. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 679 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. of Filing of Stipulation in Re Uber FCRA Litigation (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2016) Modified on 6/2/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2016 Filing 678 Response Plaintiffs' Responses to Further Late-Filed Objections byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 677 MOTION to Intervene filed by Maksim Hancharuk, Alexander Kazakov, Uladzimir Tabola, Yahor Zgurski. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/15/2016. Replies due by 6/22/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexei Kuchinsky, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kuchinsky, Alexei) (Filed on 6/1/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 - response and reply dates updated (bpfS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2016 Filing 676 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to File Portions of Document (Unopposed) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Administrative Motion, # 2 Exhibit Supplemental Brief re 669 Order re for Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval (Confidential), # 3 Exhibit Supplemental Brief re 669 Order re for Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval (Redacted), # 4 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 675 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by National Taxi Workers Alliance. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 674 Response re 669 Order on Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 669 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2016) Modified on 6/2/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2016 Filing 673 NOTICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan re 669 Order Plaintiffs' Notice Pursuant to Court's Order of May 31, 2016, Regarding Private Attorney General Act (PAGA) Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - PAGA Letter)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 689 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 688 Objection (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 688 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by John Doe. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 672 Brief Supplemental re: Objection to MOTION for Preliminary Approval filed by Omar Zine. (Gansen, Christopher) (Filed on 5/31/2016) Modified on 6/1/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Filing 671 RESPONSE (re 644 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 670 RESPONSE (re 628 First MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing on 518 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 636 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Baise). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 634 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Crabtree). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 633 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Auslander). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 632 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Tackenberg). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 664 RESPONSE (re 627 First MOTION to Intervene ) filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 663 RESPONSE (re 644 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 662 OBJECTION to Motion for preliminary approval of settlement filed by Alula Hailu.(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 643 Motion to Shorten Time. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 660 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 659 Supplemental Brief filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) 659 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 659 Supplemental Brief re 596 Order regarding Attorneys' Fees filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Related document(s) 596 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 658 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To File Overlength Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 5/31/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 657 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit S)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 656 REPLY (re 588 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAbdo Ghazi. (Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 655 RESPONSE (re 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 654 OBJECTION to MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Manpreet Goraya. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 653 Declaration of Veena Dubal in Support of 652 Objection To Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement filed byEdward Escobar, Mahmood Noori, Gladys Quinones, Adham Shaheen, Mohammad Zadran. (Related document(s) 652 ) (Dubal, Veena) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 652 OBJECTIONS to Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement by Edward Escobar, Mahmood Noori, Gladys Quinones, Adham Shaheen, Mohammad Zadran. (Dubal, Veena) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 651 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe re 647 Received Document (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe re 643 MOTION to Shorten Time, 646 Received Document, 648 Request for Judicial Notice, 644 MOTION to Intervene, 645 Declaration in Support, 647 Received Document (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe re 643 MOTION to Shorten Time, 646 Received Document, 648 Request for Judicial Notice, 644 MOTION to Intervene, 645 Declaration in Support, 647 Received Document (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 648 Request for Judicial Notice filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 647 Received Document: Proposed Complaint in Intervention - Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by John Doe. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 646 Received Document: Proposed Complaint in Intervention by John Doe. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 645 Declaration in Support of 644 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe. (Related document(s) 644 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 644 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Doe. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/10/2016. Replies due by 6/17/2016. (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Attachment(s) : # 1 Proposed Order) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2016 Filing 643 Administrative MOTION to Shorten Time filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 642 NOTICE of Appearance by Veena Bharat Dubal (Dubal, Veena) (Filed on 5/27/2016) Modified on 6/1/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2016 Filing 641 RESPONSE (re 627 First MOTION to Intervene , 637 MOTION to Intervene ) and to Untimely Objections to Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 640 RESPONSE to FURTHER COMMENTS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 639 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 638 RESPONSE (re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF OBJECTION IN REPLY filed byLeticia Alcala, Marc Borgen, Ricardo Del Rio, Abdo Ghazi, Alexander Kazakov, Douglas O'Connor, Rosario Richardson, Uladzimir Tabola, Yahor Zgurski, Omar Zine. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 637 MOTION to Intervene filed by Steven Price. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/9/2016. Replies due by 6/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Complaint In Intervention, # 2 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, # 3 Proposed Order)(Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 636 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice George R. Baise ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10481724.) filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 629 Motion to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene. Any response to the motion for leave to intervene must be filed by Tuesday, May 31, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. The Court will then take the matter under submission. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 634 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John G. Crabtree ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10481640.) filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 633 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Charles M. Auslander ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10481497.) filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 632 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian C. Tackenberg ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10481310.) filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 631 Proposed Order re 628 First MOTION to Relate Case by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 630 EXHIBITS re 629 First MOTION to Shorten Time filed byChuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Related document(s) 629 ) (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 629 First MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark A. Morrison, # 2 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016) Modified on 5/26/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2016 Filing 628 First MOTION to Relate Case filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 627 First MOTION to Intervene filed by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/8/2016. Replies due by 6/15/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 626 OBJECTIONS to 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Chuck Congdon, Ryan Cowden, Anthony Martinez, Jason Rosenberg, Jorge Zunigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016) Modified on 5/26/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2016 Filing 625 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Morrison (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 624 RESPONSE (re 609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell Pursuantn to Local Rule 79-5(E) in Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 621 Administrative Motion for leave to file consolidated reply brief. Any consolidated reply brief must be filed by Thursday, May 26, 2016 at 4:00 P.M. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 616 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 621 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief re 611 Response filed by Rosario Richardson. Responses due by 5/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(James, Carey) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 620 ERRATA re 617 Supplemental Brief, 615 Response ( Non Motion ) Combined Notice of Errata by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 619 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Mark J. Geragos for Plaintiff Douglas O'Connor (Geragos, Mark) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 618 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Brian Stephen Kabateck for Plaintiff Douglas O'Connor (Kabateck, Brian) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 617 Supplemental Brief (Joint) in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 616 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Supplemental Briefing filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 615 RESPONSE to Objections to Class Action Settlement by Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 614 RESPONSE (re 588 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 613 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 611 Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sarah Mason, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Elizabeth Lopez Beltran, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R (Filed Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit S - Declaration of Adelaide Pagano (Filed Under Seal))(Related document(s) 611 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 610 Administrative Motion to file overlength brief. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 611 Response to Objections to Class Action Settlement byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 610 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 5/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Anderson, Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Shannon Liss-Riordan Declaration, # 4 Unredacted Version of Shannon Liss-Riordan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit I Liss-Riordan Declaration to be Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit J Liss-Riordan Declaration to be Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit R Liss-Riordan Declaration to be Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit S Liss-Riordan Declaration to be Filed Under Seal)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 608 Request for Judicial Notice re 607 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 607 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 607 RESPONSE (re 588 MOTION to Intervene ) Opposition to Motion for Leave to Intervene filed byTravis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Colman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 605 Administrative Motion to Defer Filing of Supplemental Briefing Regarding Lodestar. Plaintiffs' supplemental filing regarding the lodestar is due by May 27, 2016 at 4:00 P.M. PST. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 605 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Defer Supplemental Briefing Regarding Lodestar filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan. Responses due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 604 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Preliminary Approval by Nahabet Narsis. (Barnes, Kevin) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 603 OBJECTIONS to motion for preliminary approval of settlement filed by M.P. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 602 OBJECTIONS to motion for preliminary approval of settlement filed by M.P. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 601 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Preliminary Approval by Omar Zine. (Gansen, Christopher) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 600 DECLARATION of Douglas O'Connor in Opposition to 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 518 ) (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 599 OBJECTIONS to 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Steven Price. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 598 AFFIDAVIT re 597 Objection to Motion for Preliminary Approval by Ronald Gillette. (Jhaveri-Weeks, William) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 597 OBJECTIONS re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by In re Uber FCRA Plaintiffs by Ronald Gillette. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval 518 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 587 Motion to Shorten Time. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 594 OBJECTIONS to 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Maksim Hancharuk, Alexander Kazakov, Uladzimir Tabola, Yahor Zgurski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF Alexei Kuchinsky in Support of Objections to Proposed Settlement and Response to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Release by Uladzimir Tabola, Alexander Kazakov, Yahor Zgurski, and Maksim Hancharuk, Individually and on behalf of all Others Aggrieved Employees)(Kuchinsky, Alexei) (Filed on 5/13/2016) Modified on 5/16/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2016 Filing 593 RESPONSE to re 575 Declaration in Support, 530 Order by Rosario Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carey A. James, # 2 Exhibit A)(James, Carey) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 592 OBJECTIONS to re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Abdo Ghazi. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alec Segarich)(Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 591 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Abdo Ghazi. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/27/2016. Replies due by 6/3/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason Lohr, # 2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Proposed Order)(Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 590 NOTICE of Appearance by Conor Daniel Granahan (Granahan, Conor) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 589 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Shelton Lohr (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 588 MOTION to Intervene filed by Abdo Ghazi. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/27/2016. Replies due by 6/3/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Declaration of Alec Segarich, # 3 Proposed Order)(Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 587 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion to Intervene filed by Abdo Ghazi. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alec Segarich)(Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 586 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec Llewellyn Segarich (Segarich, Alec) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey A James (James, Carey) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 584 OBJECTIONS to re 575 Declaration in Support, 574 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND REQUEST TO REMOVE SHANNON LISS-RIORDAN AS CLASS COUNSEL by Leticia Alcala, Marc Borgen. (Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 583 OBJECTIONS to motion for preliminary approval of settlement filed by Harry Campbell. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 582 OBJECTIONS to motion for preliminary approval of settlement file by Jennifer Condie. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 581 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's 574 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Class Action Settlement by Ricardo Del Rio. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 5/11/2016) Modified on 5/12/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2016 Filing 580 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexei Kuchinsky (Kuchinsky, Alexei) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 579 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Craig Preston. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 578 NOTICE of Appearance by Shant Arthur Karnikian , Brian S. Kabateck, Mark J. Geragos, and Benjamin J. Meiselas. (Karnikian, Shant) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 577 File in error. Please disregard.
May 9, 2016 Filing 576 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Parton, III (Parton, James) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 575 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 574 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 574 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/10/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2016 Filing 574 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/13/2016. Replies due by 5/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/10/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 573 Request for Judicial Notice re 563 Objection, filed byRicardo Del Rio, Greg Fisher. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice Part 2)(Related document(s) 563 ) (Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 516 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 571 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Glenn R. Sylvester. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 570 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Samy Jumaan.(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 569 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Edward Hanania. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 568 DECLARATION of ANDRE E. JARDINI in Opposition to 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Knapp, Petersen & Clarke. (Related document(s) 518 ) (Jardini, Andre) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 567 OBJECTIONS to re 518 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL) by Knapp, Petersen & Clarke. (Jardini, Andre) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik representing objectors Leticia Alcala and Marc Borgens (Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Napoli representing objectors Leticia Alcala and Marc Borgens (Napoli, Paul) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 564 Declaration of Amy T. Wootton in Support of 563 Objection, DECLARATION OF AMY T. WOOTTON IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE BY RICARDO DEL RIO, JOSE VALDIVIA, JOSE PEREIRA, KIMBERLY BERGER, TONY MEHRDAD SAGHEBIAN, GREG FISHER, HAROLD BOWER, ADAM LAKE, ALISA JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER MACACHOR, DIANA PARISH, ERIC RAMMINGER, ILLANA PARKER, SERGIO SANABRIA, COLLIN REED, CHASE BRICKENDEN AND JENE JEANDRON filed byRicardo Del Rio, Greg Fisher. (Related document(s) 563 ) (Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 563 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement and Oppositin to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement And Release by Ricardo Del Rio, JOSE VALDIVIA, JOSE PEREIRA, KIMBERLY BERGER, TONY MEHRDAD SAGHEBIAN, GREG FISHER, HAROLD BOWER, ADAM LAKE, ALISA JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER MACACHOR, DIANA PARISH, ERIC RAMMINGER, ILLANA PARKER, SERGIO SANABRIA, COLLIN REED, CHASE BRICKENDEN AND JENE JEANDRON by Ricardo Del Rio, Greg Fisher. (Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 562 RESPONSE (re 518 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byLeticia Alcala, Marc Borgen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hunter J. Shkolnik, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Declaration of Marc Borgens, # 14 Declaration of Leticia Alcala)(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 561 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Darryl Granger. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 560 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Caiafa (Caiafa, Douglas) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 559 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Nick Guillermo. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 558 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re Dkt. 531. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 557 Response re 531 Order to Show Cause byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 556 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Vanilla. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 555 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/6/2015, 11/4/2015, 11/24/2015 before Judge Chen, Transcript due by 6/6/2016. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H. Haffner and Brian S. Kabateck (Haffner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 553 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by James Vandervoort. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 552 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Anthony Bonaccorso. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 551 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Michael Brockhoff. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION VACATING THE RULE 23(D) ORDERS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL DEADLINES. Status Conference set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 5/26/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 548 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Nymc111. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 547 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by ecrm4profits (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 546 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Rich H. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 535 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 534 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Napoli). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 29, 2016 Filing 543 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Gary Teiltelbaum (second objection). (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 542 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Travis Kalanick, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 530 Order (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/28/2016) Modified on 4/29/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2016 Filing 541 RESPONSE (re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 533 Opposition filed byLeticia Alcala. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 540 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Ruben C. Vazquez. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 539 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Daniel Valasquez. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 538 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Jumpy. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 537 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Brandon Marshall. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 536 OBJECTION to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Gary Teitelbaum. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 535 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Hunter Shkolnik ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10408573.) filed by Leticia Alcala. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 534 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Paul Napoli ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10408189.) filed by Leticia Alcala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Napoli, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 533 RESPONSE (re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 532 Opposition filed byLeticia Alcala. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 532 RESPONSE (re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Opposition filed byLeticia Alcala. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shkolnik, Hunter) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER RE SERVICE ON COUNSEL OF RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 Filing 529 OBJECTIONS to motion for preliminary approval of settlement filed by Robert Schwartz. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 528 RESPONSE (re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) OPPOSITION filed byRonald Gillette. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 527 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Tai Wootton (Wootton, Amy) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER re Objections to Proposed Class Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2016. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 517 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 524 OBJECTIONS to re 522 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Rule 23(d) Orders by Ronald Gillette. (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 523 Brief re 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theane Evangelis, # 2 Exhibit A in Support of Evangelis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B in Support of Evangelis Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C in Support of Evangelis Declaration, # 5 Declaration of William Barnes, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal)(Related document(s) 516 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 522 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Rule 23(d) Orders filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 521 Proposed Order and Joint Request to Vacate Deadlines by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 520 Statement re 518 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement , Statement in Support by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 519 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 518 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 518 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 518 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/5/2016. Replies due by 5/12/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 517 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Redacted Version of Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Unredacted Version of Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Redacted Version of Class Action Settlement and Release, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Unredacted Version of Class Settlement and Release)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 514 to Continue Deadline For Plaintiffs to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay [Dkt. 506] filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 514 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline For Plaintiffs to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay [Dkt. 506] filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 513 Document filed UNDER SEAL(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2016) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER of USCA as to 437 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 511 USCA Appeal Fees received: $ 505, receipt number 34611114326 re 465 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 510 USCA Case Number 16-15595 for 465 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 509 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 4/12/16 hearing on (506) Defendant's motion to stay. Court to issue order on papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 507 Administrative Motion to Expedite the Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's Opposition due April 13, 2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 507 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXPEDITE re 506 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 506 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/20/2016. Replies due by 4/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theane Evangelis in Support of Expedited Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit A, Evangelis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B, Evangelis Declaration, # 4 Errata C, Evangelis Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D, Evangelis Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E, Evangelis Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F, Evangelis Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 505 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew David Carlson (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 502 Stipulation to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 503 Supplemental Brief Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Brief Regarding Trial of PAGA Claims filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 502 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Certain Pretrial Deadlines filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 501 Supplemental Brief Regarding PAGA Claims filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 494 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Pretrial filings due May 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 479 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or Decertification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 498 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/24/2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 496 Transcript Order, 497 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (Related documents(s) 496 , 497 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/16 before Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/16 before Edward M. Chen by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 495 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2016 re 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Denied. Total Time in Court 2 hours 36 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 494 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 493 Administrative MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim [Dkt. 479] filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/18/2016) Modified on 3/21/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2016 Filing 492 Statement filed jointly re Trial Plans by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 491 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 490 REPLY (re 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell in Support, # 2 Exhibit A in Support of Supplemental Ring-Dowell Declaration)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 489 CLERK'S NOTICE. Jury trial remains scheduled to begin on 6/20/2016 at 8:30 a.m. before District Judge Edward M. Chen. Parties shall make themselves available the week of 7/25/2016 should additional trial time is necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 486 Stipulation to extend time to file trial plan. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 487 CLERK'S NOTICE clarifying that the jury trial remains scheduled to begin on 6/20/16 at 8:30 a.m. for a maximum of 5 weeks (until 7/22/16). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 486 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Deadline to File Trial Plan(s) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 4, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 08:30 AM through 7/22/2016 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 485 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 484 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 484 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 484 RESPONSE (re 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 482 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Opposition and Reply Briefs Regarding Uber's Motion for Summary Adjudication Or, In the Alternative, Decertification [Dkt 479] filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 482 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Opposition and Reply Briefs Regarding Uber's Motion for Summary Adjudication Or, In the Alternative, Decertification [Dkt 479] filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 481 Declaration of MICHAEL COLMAN in Support of 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Colman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Colman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C, Colman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Colman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Colman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F, Colman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G, Colman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H, Colman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I, Colman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J, Colman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit K, Colman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit L, Colman Declaration, # 13 Exhibit M, Colman Declaration, # 14 Exhibit N, Colman Declaration, # 15 Errata O, Colman Declaration, # 16 Exhibit P, Colman Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Q, Colman Declaration, # 18 Errata R, Colman Declaration, # 19 Exhibit S, Colman Declaration)(Related document(s) 479 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 480 Declaration of KEVIN J. RING-DOWELL in Support of 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Ring-Dowell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Ring-Dowell Declaration)(Related document(s) 479 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 479 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs' Gratuities Law Class filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/25/2016. Replies due by 3/3/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 478 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 467 Stipulated Protective Order.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 477 Statement filed jointly, regarding the SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 476 Transcript Designation Form (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 475 CLERK'S NOTICE. Trial plan due 3/10/2016. Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2016. Status Conference set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Re First-Filed Rule and Uber's Request for Stay/Dismissal Pursuant to Colorado River Abstention Doctrine. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER by MDL Panel DENYING TRANSFER re MDL No. 2686. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER of USCA as to 404 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER re 467 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/03/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendant's Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 466 Motion for Leave to File dispositive motion. Motion hearing set for 3/24/16 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 469 RESPONSE (re 466 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to File Dispositive Motion ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 468 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/27/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 467 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 466 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to File Dispositive Motion filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ring-Dowell in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Leave to FIle Dispositive Motion)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 20, 2016 Filing 465 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. as to 464 Order, 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, . Appeal Record due by 2/19/2016. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER re Revised Arbitration Provision and Corrective Cover Letter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 463 Declaration of Dhananjay S. Manthripragada in Support of 462 Statement filed jointly, regarding a FURTHER REVISED ARBITRATION PROVISION AND CORRECTIVE COVER LETTER filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 462 ) (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 462 Statement filed jointly, regarding a FURTHER REVISED ARBITRATION PROVISION AND CORRECTIVE COVER LETTER by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 13, 2016 Filing 461 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER RE FINAL CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 459 Letter (e-mail) from Tom Paluda to the Court. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 364 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 457 USCA Case Number 16-15000 for 442 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 456 USCA Case Number 15-17532 for 437 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 455 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 12/17/15, before Magistrate Judge Donna Ryu. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:07 - 11:31. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 452 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2016. (Related documents(s) 452 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 439 Motion to Stay. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 7, 2016 Filing 453 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. of Further Revised Draft Class and Non-Class Notices, filed jointly (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 7, 2016 Filing 452 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 451 RESPONSE (re 448 MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proposed Corrective Notices and Procedures (Administrative)) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/6/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 448 Motion to Continue. The deadline to submit proposed corrective notices and procedures is continued until January 13, 2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 449 Brief re 443 Opposition/Response to Motion Opposition to The O'Connor And Yucesoy Plaintiffs' Request To Stay Issuance of A Corrective Notice filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 443 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 448 MOTION to Continue Deadline to Submit Proposed Corrective Notices and Procedures (Administrative) filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER RE 446 CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 446 Statement filed jointly re class notice schedule by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 440 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to stay is due January 6, 2016 at 5:00 P.M. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 444 REPLY (re 439 MOTION to Stay re 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 443 RESPONSE (re 439 MOTION to Stay re 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 442 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10102126 paid.) Appeal Record due by 2/3/2016. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/4/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-15000)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER re 440 Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to expedite is due January 4, 2016 by 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/31/2015. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2015)
December 30, 2015 Filing 440 MOTION for Administrative Relief filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2016. Replies due by 1/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 30, 2015 Filing 439 MOTION to Stay re 435 Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2016. Replies due by 1/20/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 29, 2015 Filing 438 USCA Case Number 15-80220 for 437 Notice of Appeal, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 28, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion for Protective Order, 435 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10093454 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2015: # 2 USCA Number: 15-80220) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER Re 418 434 Class Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits).(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 405 Plaintiffs' Motions to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class and Putative Class Members and Enforcement of December 11, 2015 Arbitration Agreement. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 434 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Joint Notice of Revised Proposed Class Notice (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 423 Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability; and Denying 430 Defendant's Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 432 Brief re 427 Brief,, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS BRIEF (DKT. 427) REGARDING FIRST-FILED RULE AS APPLIED TO CONCURRENT, OVERLAPPING PAGA CLAIMS AND REQUEST FOR STAY/DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO COLORADO RIVER ABSTENTION DOCTRINE filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 427 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 431 MOTION to Expedite Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to Expedite the Briefing Schedule And Forego A Hearing for Defendant's Expedited Motion to Strike (re Dkts 423 & 430) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 430 MOTION to Strike 423 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability, or Alternatively, for a Bench Trial Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc's Expedited Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability Or, In the Alternative, For A Bench Trial filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 12/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Conditionally Granting in Part and Denying in Part 411 Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 428 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/17/15, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (424 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 427 Brief Regarding First-Filed Rule as Applied to Concurrent, Overlapping PAGA Claims and Request for Stay/Dismissal Pursuant to "Colorado River" Abstention Doctrine filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sophia Behnia, # 2 Exhibit A to Behnia Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Behnia Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Behnia Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Behnia Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Behnia Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Behnia Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Behnia Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Behnia Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Behnia Declaration)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 426 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 re: (1) Plaintiffs' motion for protective order (#405 for O'Connor case); (#145 for Yucesoy case) - (2) Defendants' motion to stay pending appeal #411- (3) Motion to enjoin Defendant's communications with punitive class members (#127 FCRA case)- (4) Status ConferenceCourt Reporter Name Pam Batalo. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 425 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 424 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 423 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability, or Alternatively, for a Bench Trial filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 422 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Cal. Labor Code Section 2802 Claim (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 421 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 re 364 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, motion is taken under submission. Court's written Order to follow. FTR Time 11:07-11:31. Attachment Civil Law and Motion Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 420 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 420 , SEE DOCKET ENTRY 421 INSTEAD. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 re 364 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, motion is taken under submission. Court's written Order to follow. FTR Time 11:07-11:31. Attachment Civil Law and Motion Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2015) Modified on 12/18/2015 (ig, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2015 Filing 419 MOTION to Dismiss CAL. LABOR CODE § 2802 CLAIM AND PURSUE THE CLAIM THROUGH THE CA. BUS. PROF. CODE §§ 17200 AND TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY AND DAMAGES PROCEEDINGS filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/31/2015. Replies due by 1/7/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 418 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 417 USCA Case Number 15-17420 for 396 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., 404 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 416 RESPONSE (re 411 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 415 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 414 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 414 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 414 REPLY (re 405 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 411 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 412 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by December 16, 2015 at 12:00 p.m.(emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 412 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brandon J. Stoker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stoker, Brandon) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 410 RESPONSE (re 405 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support, # 2 Exhibit B in Support, # 3 Exhibit C in Support, # 4 Exhibit D in Support, # 5 Exhibit E in Support, # 6 Exhibit F in Support, # 7 Exhibit G in Support)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 407 Motion to Shorten Time--Opposition due December 14, 2015, Reply due December 15, 2015. Hearing set for December 17, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 408 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 405 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement, 406 Declaration in Support, Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Communications With Plaintiffs' Counsel And Request for Withdrawal of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support, # 2 Exhibit B in Support, # 3 Exhibit C in Support)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 407 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Their Emergency Motion to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 406 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 405 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 405 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 405 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order to Enjoin Uber's Communications with Class Members that may Affect or Undermine Their Rights in This Case, Including Any Attempts to Enforce Uber's New Arbitration Agreement filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/14/2015. Replies due by 12/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 404 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. as to 400 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Ex Parte Application, 395 Order . Appeal Record due by 1/11/2016. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/10/2015) (USCA Case No. 15-17420)
December 10, 2015 Filing 403 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 398 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying In Part 253 355 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Third and Fourth Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 346 397 Defendants' Motions to Compel Arbitration. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 399 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting status conference from 10:30 a.m. to 1:30 p.m. on 12/17/15 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 398 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference Scheduled for December 17, 2015 filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 397 Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion to Compel Arbitration as to Absent Class Members; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Compel Arbitration as to Absent Class Members)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Appeal of Order 395 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10053891 paid.) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl E Meyer on behalf of the City of Cleveland, Ohio (Meyer, Carl) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 28, 2015 Filing 392 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/24/15, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Shainline, Bryce Reporting Services, telephone number (510)828-9404, Email: Info@brycereporting.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 391 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2016. (Related documents(s) 391 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 11/28/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 391 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Kelly Shainline. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing re: further briefing on class certification held on 11/24/2015. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Parties may submit stipulation to modify discovery deadlines. The Court will not change the 6/20/2016 trial date, pretrial conference and the deadline to hear dispositive motions as stated in the CMC and pretrial order.) Court Reporter Name Kelly Shainline. Plaintiff Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan and Matthew Carlson. Defendant Attorney Theodore Boutrous, Jr., Joshua Lipshutz, Theane Evangelis and Kevin Ring-Dowell. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/24/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER of USCA as to 108 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 388 Supplemental Brief re 380 Supplemental Brief Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support)(Related document(s) 380 ) (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 387 Supplemental Brief re 381 Supplemental Brief, in Response to Uber's Supplemental Brief Regarding 2014 and 2015 Arbitration Agreements filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 381 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 386 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 384 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 383 Order to Extend the Deadline for Parties to File Responses Addressing Arguments Raised in Supplemental Briefs filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 384 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 383 Order to Extend the Deadline for Parties to File Responses Addressing Arguments Raised in Supplemental Briefs filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 383 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER--RESPONSE DUE NOVEMBER 16, 2015. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE of Filing by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 381 Supplemental Brief Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Brief Regarding 2014 and 2015 Arbitration Agreements filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support, # 2 Exhibit B in Support, # 3 Exhibit C in Support)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 380 Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's Order of November 4, 2015 filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 7, 2015 Filing 379 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/4/15, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (377 in 3:13-cv-03826-EMC) Transcript Order, (118 in 3:14-cv-05200-EMC) Transcript Order, (127 in 3:15-cv-00262-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2016. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 11/7/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/22/2016. Maximum of 5 weeks Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/21/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/24/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/5/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/22/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Selection set for 6/20/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 377 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Status Conference set for 11/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2015 re 355 MOTION For Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Status Report due by 11/17/2015. Status Conference set for 11/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2015)
November 4, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 370 Motion for Leave to File. Hearing set for 11/24/15 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 372 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. of Additional Authorities in Connection With Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 371 Clerk's Notice re Proposed Video Recording (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 370 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Response To Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Support of Class Certification filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 369 Clerk's Notice of Request for Video Recording. Party responses are due by 5pm on Monday, November 2, 2015. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Notice) (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 368 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 367 CLERK'S NOTICE - REMINDER: Further CMC is scheduled for 11/4/15 at 10:00 a.m. An updated joint CMC statement shall be filed by 10/28/15.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 366 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Ryu will hold a hearing on the parties' joint discovery letter # 364 on 12/17/15 at 11:00 a.m., Courtroom 4, 3rd floor, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 364 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 365 RESPONSE to re 357 Supplemental Brief Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Class Certification by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Lipshutz in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit A in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K in Support of Lipshutz Declaration, # 13 Declaration of Dr. Justin McCrary in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Class Certification, # 14 Appendix A to McCrary Declaration, # 15 Appendix B to McCrary Declaration)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 364 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 363 REPLY (re 355 MOTION For Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 362 RESPONSE (re 355 MOTION For Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 13, 2015 Set Motions Hearing as to 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members, 355 MOTION For Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 360 Regarding Hearing Schedule For Case Management Conference, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 12, 2015 Filing 360 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing Schedule For Case Management Conference, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 10/12/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 359 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 357 filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 358 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 357 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 357 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 357 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 356 REPLY (re 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Colman)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 355 MOTION For Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/15/2015. Replies due by 10/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 354 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 353 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 353 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 353 RESPONSE (re 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 22, 2015 Electronic filing error Re: 351 Amended Complaint, filed by Ricardo Del Rio. Document filed in wrong case [err401]. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 352 Appeal Remark: case no. 15-80169 in re Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 351 **ERRONEOUS ENTRY - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD** AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed byRicardo Del Rio. (Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 9/21/2015) Modified on 9/22/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 349 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members to Continue Hearing to October 21, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Motion Hearing reset for 10/21/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 15, 2015 Filing 349 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members to Continue Hearing to October 21, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Stoker, Brandon) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 348 Request for Judicial Notice re 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 346 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 347 Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 346 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 346 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Certain Absent Class Members filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/24/2015. Replies due by 10/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 343 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Change Date of Upcoming Status Conference filed by Douglas O'Connor, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 343 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Change Date of Upcoming Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/21/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 340 Motion to Relate Case (C15-3774) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 Filing 343 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Change Date of Upcoming Status Conference filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 1, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2015. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 276 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015) (Entered 9/1/2015).
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 276 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 340 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Greg Fisher. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 337 Motion to Relate Case (C15-3667 MEJ) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 338 RESPONSE (re 337 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion Pursuant to L.R. 7-4(a)(3)) ) OPPOSITION filed byUber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. (Spurchise, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 337 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion Pursuant to L.R. 7-4(a)(3)) filed by Ricardo Del Rio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hamner, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 336 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 6, 2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 332 Transcript Order, 333 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (Related documents(s) 332 , 333 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 335 Response to Plaintiffs' Class Certification Proposals re 334 by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/14/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 334 Statement Trial Plan by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2015 re 276 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Douglas O'Connor. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' trial plan shall be filed by 8/12/15. Court will then take Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class under submission and to issue order. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 330 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed by Elie Gurfinkel, Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/5/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 326 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 328 RESPONSE (re 323 MOTION to Strike) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 8/5/2015) Modified on 8/6/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2015 Filing 327 RESPONSE (re 326 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification scheduled for August 6, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. ) filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 326 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification scheduled for August 6, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. filed by Steven Price. (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Morosoff attorney for Interested Party Steven Price (Morosoff, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 323 Motion for Leave to File--Response Due by 10:00 AM PDT, Wednesday, August 5, 2015 (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 323 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Relief to file Motion to Strike filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan with exhibits, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 322 Declaration of Theane Evangelis ISO Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 41, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 42, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 43, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 44, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 45, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 46, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 47, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 48, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 49, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 50, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 51, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 52, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 53, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 54, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 55, Supplemental Evangelis Declaration)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 319 Motion to file sur-reply (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 319 MOTION Administrative Relief To File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification re 312 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/13/2015. Replies due by 8/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit A in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 4 Exhibit B in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 5 Exhibit C in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 6 Exhibit D in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 7 Exhibit E in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 8 Exhibit F in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 9 Exhibit G in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 10 Exhibit H in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 11 Exhibit I in Support of Exhibit 2 (Evangelis Declaration), # 12 Exhibit 3 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 13 Exhibit 4 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 14 Exhibit 5 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 15 Exhibit 6 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 16 Exhibit 7 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification, # 17 Exhibit 8 in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion For Class Certification)(Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER REGARDING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 317 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by William Anderson, Thomas Colopy, Ronald Gillette, Elie Gurfinkel, David Kahn, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, Wilson Rolle, Jr. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORAL ARGUMENT PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/15. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 315 Declaration of Adelaide Pagano in Support of 312 Reply to Opposition/Response to Class Certification filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 314 Declaration of Elizabeth Lopez Beltran in Support of 312 Reply to Opposition/Response to Class Certification filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 312 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 313 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 312 Reply to Opposition/Response to Class Certification filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) 312 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 312 REPLY (re 276 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 311 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 16, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 309 Transcript Order, 310 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2015. (Related documents(s) 309 , 310 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Caren Ehret, Ronald Gillette, Elie Gurfinkel, David Kahn, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor, Wilson Rolle, Jr for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2015 re 294 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. See minute Order for all particulars. ***Motions terminated: 294 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Attachment Civil Law and Motion Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 307 Declaration of PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 01 (pp. 1-102), # 2 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 02 (pp. 103-207), # 3 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 03 (pp. 208-315), # 4 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 04 (pp. 316-419), # 5 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 05 (pp. 420-513), # 6 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 06 (pp. 514-609), # 7 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 07 (pp. 610-702), # 8 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 08 (pp. 703-799), # 9 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 09 (pp. 800-898), # 10 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 10 (pp. 899-985), # 11 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 11 (pp. 986-1081), # 12 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 12 (pp. 1082-1183), # 13 Declaration of Putative Class Members, Vol. 13 (pp. 1184-1270))(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 306 Declaration of BRAD ROSENTHAL in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 305 Declaration of SWATHY PRITHIVI in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 304 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER BALLARD in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Ballard Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 303 Declaration of MATTHEW SAWCHUK in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Sawchuk Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Sawchuk Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 302 Declaration of MICHAEL COLMAN in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Colman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Colman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C, Colman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Colman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Colman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F, Colman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G, Colman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H, Colman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I, Colman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J, Colman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit K, Colman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit L, Colman Declaration, # 13 Exhibit M, Colman Declaration, # 14 Exhibit N, Colman Declaration, # 15 Exhibit O, Colman Declaration, # 16 Exhibit P, Colman Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Q, Colman Declaration, # 18 Exhibit R, Colman Declaration, # 19 Exhibit S, Colman Declaration, # 20 Exhibit T, Colman Declaration, # 21 Exhibit U, Colman Declaration, # 22 Exhibit V, Colman Declaration, # 23 Exhibit W, Colman Declaration, # 24 Exhibit X, Colman Declaration, # 25 Exhibit Y, Colman Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Z, Colman Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 301 Declaration of DR. JUSTIN McCRARY in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix McCrary Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 300 Declaration of JOSHUA S. LIPSHUTZ in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Lipshutz Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B, Lipshutz Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C, Lipshutz Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Lipshutz Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Lipshutz Declaration, # 6 Errata F, Lipshutz Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G, Lipshutz Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H, Lipshutz Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I, Lipshutz Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J, Lipshutz Declaration, # 11 Exhibit K, Lipshutz Declaration, # 12 Exhibit L, Lipshutz Declaration, # 13 Exhibit M, Lipshutz Declaration, # 14 Exhibit N, Lipshutz Declaration, # 15 Exhibit O, Lipshutz Declaration, # 16 Exhibit P, Lipshutz Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Q, Lipshutz Declaration, # 18 Exhibit R, Lipshutz Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 299 Declaration of THEANE EVANGELIS in Support of 298 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Evangelis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2, Evangelis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3, Evangelis Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4, Evangelis Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5, Evangelis Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6, Evangelis Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7, Evangelis Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8, Evangelis Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9, Evangelis Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10, Evangelis Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11, Evangelis Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12, Evangelis Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 13, Evangelis Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14, Evangelis Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15, Evangelis Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16, Evangelis Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 17, Evangelis Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 18, Evangelis Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 19, Evangelis Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 20, Evangelis Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 21, Evangelis Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 22, Evangelis Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 23, Evangelis Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 24, Evangelis Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 25, Evangelis Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 26, Evangelis Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 27, Evangelis Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 28, Evangelis Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 29, Evangelis Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 30, Evangelis Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 31, Evangelis Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 32, Evangelis Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 33, Evangelis Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 34, Evangelis Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 35, Evangelis Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 36, Evangelis Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 37, Evangelis Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 38, Evangelis Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 39, Evangelis Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 40, Evangelis Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 41, Evangelis Declaration, # 42 Exhibit 42, Evangelis Declaration, # 43 Exhibit 43, Evangelis Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 44, Evangelis Declaration, # 45 Exhibit 45, Evangelis Declaration, # 46 Exhibit 46, Evangelis Declaration, # 47 Exhibit 47, Evangelis Declaration, # 48 Exhibit 48, Evangelis Declaration, # 49 Exhibit 49, Evangelis Declaration, # 50 Exhibit 50, Evangelis Declaration, # 51 Exhibit 51, Evangelis Declaration, # 52 Exhibit 52, Evangelis Declaration, # 53 Exhibit 53, Evangelis Declaration, # 54 Exhibit 54, Evangelis Declaration, # 55 Exhibit 55, Evangelis Declaration)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 298 RESPONSE (re 276 MOTION to Certify Class ) In Opposition filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 296 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone on 7/16/2015 Discovery Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Notice re Telephonic Appearance Procedures) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 296 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing Scheduled for July 16, 2015 filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 295 CLERK'S NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will hold a hearing as to the parties' 294 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on 7/16/2015 11:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 294 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 292 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Administrative Motion for Enlargement of the Page Limit for Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Memorandum Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Plaintiffs' Reply filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation & [Proposed] Order to Extend Page Limits for Uber's Opposition to Class Certification Motion and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of the Motion)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J. Stoker (Stoker, Brandon) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Filing of Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 289 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2015. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2015)
May 16, 2015 Filing 288 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/14/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 287 Transcript Order, 285 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2015. (Related documents(s) 287 , 285 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/16/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 286 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2015 re 253 MOTION for leave to file a third amended complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 284 ** ORDER CANCELLED - NEW ORDER WILL BE EFILED FOR COURT REPORTER LYDIA ZINN. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/15/2015) Modified on 5/15/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2015 Filing 283 ** ORDER CANCELLED - NEW ORDER WILL BE EFILED FOR COURT REPORTER LYDIA ZINN. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/15/2015) Modified on 5/15/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2015 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Dhananjay Saikrishna Manthripragada for Deft Uber Technologies, Inc. (Manthripragada, Dhananjay) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 281 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 280 **DOCKETED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD**JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/7/2015) Modified on 5/7/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2015 Filing 279 CLERK'S NOTICE - CMC set for 5/14/15 at 1:30 p.m. An updated joint CMC statement shall be filed by 5/7/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 24, 2015 Filing 278 CLERK'S NOTICE clarifying briefing schedule. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 276 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 7/9/2015. Replies due by 7/23/2015. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 277 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 276 MOTION to Certify Class filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 276 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 276 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/7/2015. Replies due by 5/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/23/2015) Modified on 4/24/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF). - - Please see #278 for correct briefing schedule
April 21, 2015 Filing 275 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-14-2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 273 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (Related documents(s) 273 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 273 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ryan Graves, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph Ring-Dowell (Ring-Dowell, Kevin) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER re 267 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 270 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2015 re 253 MOTION for leave to file a third amended complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor Motion Hearing continued to 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Debra Pas. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE OF STATE COURT CASE (LASC BC554512 Price v. Uber) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz Notice of Appearances of Counsel for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joshua Seth Lipshutz Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel; [Proposed] Order (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 7, 2015 Filing 265 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/02/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:43 a.m. - 11:04 a.m. = 21 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 264 ** DUPLICATE of #263 - DISREGARD. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 4/3/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2015 Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/2/2015. Motion to file third amended complaint hearing reset from 4/30/15 to 4/14/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Further Case Management Conference/Class Certification Motion set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 10:43-11:04. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 261 REPLY (re 253 MOTION for leave to file a third amended complaint ) filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 260 Declaration of Caitlin V. May in Support of 259 Opposition/Response to Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 259 ) (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 259 RESPONSE (re 253 MOTION for leave to file a third amended complaint ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 258 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 257 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Joanne Farrell. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 255 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sacha Marie Steenhoek (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 253 MOTION for leave to file a third amended complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 252 CLERK'S NOTICE setting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 211 Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 249 Administrative Motion to File Statement of New Decision, etc. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/18/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Administrative MOTION to File Statement of New Decision and to Submit Limited Supplemental Briefing on Impact of New Authority filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 2/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/6/2015) Modified on 2/9/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2015 Filing 248 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/30/15, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 244 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2015. (Related documents(s) 244 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) [Notice of New Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment] (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 245 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Amendment to 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version), 212 Declaration in Support,, UNREDACTED Versions of MSJ and Dec of Robert Jon Hendricks - Exhibit 6. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert Jon Hendricks - Exh 6 - Unredacted)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Docket No. 210). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 235 Motion to Relate Case (15-0262) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2015 re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Under submission.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Kathy Sullivan. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 236 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Pagano) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 239 RESPONSE (re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) ) Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 238 EXHIBITS re 223 Declaration in Support,,,,, filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 22 to Dkt. 223, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 23 to Dkt. 223, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to Dkt. 223, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 26 to Dkt. 223, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to Dkt. 223, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 30 to Dkt. 223, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 32 to Dkt. 223, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 33 to Dkt. 223)(Related document(s) 223 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 236 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9240811) filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pagano, Adelaide) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 235 Joint MOTION to Relate Case filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Yucesoy Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 234 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/04/2014, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter Joanne M. Farrell, Telephone number 415-302-1781, jsanrafael@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 231 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Related documents(s) 231 ) (Farrell, Joanne) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 233 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Supplemental] filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 232 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 230 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Related document(s) 230 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter Joanne Farrell. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 229 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 228 Request for Judicial Notice re 227 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 227 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 227 REPLY (re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 226 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION/FURTHER CMC FROM 1/29/15 AT 1:30 P.M. TO 1/30/15 AT 2:30 P.M. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 1/30/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 1/30/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 225 Declaration of Stephen L. Taeusch in Response to 221 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal and Establishing that the Documents Filed Under Seal Are Sealable filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 1/5/2015) Modified on 1/6/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2015 Filing 224 Declaration of Mark Forester in Support re 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by 7x7 Executive Transportation LLC. (Parton, James) (Filed on 1/5/2015) Modified on 1/6/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2014 Filing 223 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of 222 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48a, # 49 Exhibit 48b, # 50 Exhibit 48c, # 51 Exhibit 48d, # 52 Exhibit 48e, # 53 Exhibit 48f, # 54 Exhibit 48g, # 55 Exhibit 48h, # 56 Exhibit 48i, # 57 Exhibit 48j, # 58 Exhibit 48k, # 59 Exhibit 48l, # 60 Exhibit 48m, # 61 Exhibit 48n, # 62 Exhibit 49)(Related document(s) 222 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 222 RESPONSE (re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) ) Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, # 11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, # 13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, # 14 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 216 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 219 RESPONSE (re 216 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fish, John) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend The Deadline To File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Reply Brief by One Day filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend The Deadline To File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Reply Brief by One Day filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 216 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Ronald Gillette. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exs. A - C, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER of USCA denying appellees' motion to dismiss as to 108 Notice of Appeal filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 214 Appendix re 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) [Compendium of Putative Class Member Declarations in Support of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment] filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tab A, # 2 Tab B, # 3 Tab C, # 4 Tab D, # 5 Tab E, # 6 Tab F, # 7 Tab G, # 8 Tab H, # 9 Tab I, # 10 Tab J, # 11 Tab K, # 12 Tab L, # 13 Tab M, # 14 Tab N, # 15 Tab O, # 16 Tab P, # 17 Tab Q, # 18 Tab R, # 19 Tab S, # 20 Tab T, # 21 Tab U, # 22 Tab V)(Related document(s) 211 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 213 Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 211 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 212 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted Version), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted Version), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Redacted Version), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Redacted Version), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Redacted Version), # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 211 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Version) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/29/2014. Replies due by 1/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Undredacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Undredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Hendricks Declaration ISO Summary Judgment, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Hendricks Declaration ISO Summary Judgment, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Hendricks Declaration ISO Summary Judgment, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 ISO Summary Judgment, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Hendricks Declaration ISO Summary Judgment, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service of Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File A Revised Second Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 206 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 202 Defendant's Motion to File Excess Pages. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 204 REPLY (re 202 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 203 Response re 202 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Request for Leave to File a Sur-reply byThomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 202 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen L. Taeusch in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief Seeking Additional Pages, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Administrative Relief)(Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File A Revised Second Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Elie Gurfinkel, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Revised Second Amended Complaint)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 200 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 198 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 12, 2014 Filing 199 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed byThomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Filing 198 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 197 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 195 Stipulation.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 196 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 187 Terminate Hearings, Motion Hearing,, Continuing Discovery Deadline filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 195 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 187 Terminate Hearings, Motion Hearing,, Continuing Discovery Deadline filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery Deadline)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 194 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 193 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen re 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion (Def's MSJ) Hearing set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Court Reporter Joanne Farrell.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Filing 191 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/30/14, before Magistrate Judge Donna Ryu. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:54 - 11:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 189 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2015. (Related documents(s) 189 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 188 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 188 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing Scheduled for November 4, 2014 on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 187 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held re 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor on 10/30/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Motion Granted in part, Denied in part. Court's written Order to follow. (FTR Recording 10:54-11:44) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 186 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset from 12/18/14 to 1/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco (same time as Defendant's MSJ.) THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 185 OBJECTIONS to New Evidence re 177 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 10/28/2014) Modified on 10/29/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2014 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Douglas O'Connor for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 183 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Hearing on Joint Discovery Letter Brief 157 previously set on 10/30/2014 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to 10/30/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 180 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 10/30/2014 Discovery Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Notice re Telephone Appearance Procedures) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 180 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Discovery Hearing Scheduled for October 30, 2014 filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 179 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/09/14, before Magistrate Judge Donna Ryu. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:23 - 11:57. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 175 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Related documents(s) 175 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 177 REPLY (re 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint ) filed byThomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Re Summary Judgment Briefing and Schedule signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 174 RESPONSE to re 166 MOTION Request for Clarification of The Court's Amended Scheduling Order re 154 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 173 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 141 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Defendant's Motion to Compel GRANTED IN PART. See Minute Order for more particulars. ***Motions terminated: 141 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (FTR Recording 11:23-11:57) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 172 Declaration of Caitlin V. May in Support of 170 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration Of Caitlin V. May In Support Of Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 170 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 171 Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of 170 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Michael Colman in Support of Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 170 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 170 RESPONSE (re 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint ) Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File A Second Amended Complaint filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE by Thomas Colopy Plaintiffs' Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 168 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 164 Motion re Hearing Date of Joint Discovery Letter.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 166 MOTION Request for Clarification of The Court's Amended Scheduling Order re 154 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Defendant's Notice of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's Request for "Clarification" (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION Request for Clarification of The Court's Amended Scheduling Order re 154 Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Responses due by 10/22/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 165 RESPONSE (re 164 MOTION Request That The Parties' Joint Discovery Letter Be Heard at the Currently Scheduled Hearing on October 9, 2014 re 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stephen L. Taeusch, # 2 Proposed Order)(Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION Request That The Parties' Joint Discovery Letter Be Heard at the Currently Scheduled Hearing on October 9, 2014 re 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Responses due by 10/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 161 Plaintiffs' Counsel's request to appear telephonically on 10/9/2014 11:00 AM Discovery hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Notice re Telephonic Appearance Procedures) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Setting Hearing on 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Hearing set for 10/30/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Upcoming Discovery Hearing Scheduled for October 9, 2014 filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Responses due by 10/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 138 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 10/9/14 hearing on Motion to certify order for interlocutory review (Docket #38). Court to issue order. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shannon Liss-Riordan for Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 157 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Carlson (Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 155 REPLY (re 138 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review ) filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 141 Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 138 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review (set for 10/9/14 at 1:30 p.m.), 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint (set for 11/4/14 at 2:30 p.m.). Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. Motion for MSJ Hearing set for 1/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 AMENDED ORDER granting plaintiff's motion to alter summary judgment briefing schedule. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint . Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. Motion for leave to file a second amended complaint Hearing set for 11/4/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. MSJ Hearing set for 1/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 152 RESPONSE (re 149 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Alter Briefing Schedule and Summary Judgment Hearing, Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11, as well as to Consider Plaintiffs Motion to Amend at Hearing Currently Schedule for October 9, 2014 ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Taeusch ISO Response to Plaitniff's Motion for Administrative Relief)(Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 149 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Alter Briefing Schedule and Summary Judgment Hearing, Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11, as well as to Consider Plaintiffs Motion to Amend at Hearing Currently Schedule for October 9, 2014 Notice of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION for leave to file a second amended complaint filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 149 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Alter Briefing Schedule and Summary Judgment Hearing, Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11, as well as to Consider Plaintiffs Motion to Amend at Hearing Currently Schedule for October 9, 2014 filed by Thomas Colopy, Matthew Manahan, Douglas O'Connor. Responses due by 9/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Filing 148 RESPONSE (re 138 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review ) [Defendant' filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 22, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 141 Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 147 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 145 Motion to Shorten Time.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 146 RESPONSE (re 145 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Discovery Motion ) filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 145 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Discovery Motion filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen L. Taeusch in Support of Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Discovery Motion)(Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Hearing on 141 Discovery Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/18/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 to Dismiss Plaintiff David Khan filed by Thomas Colopy, Douglas O'Connor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 141 Letter from Joint Discovery Letter Brief . (Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Modified on 9/18/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 Filing 140 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/28/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 137 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2014. (Related documents(s) 137 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff David Khan filed by Thomas Colopy, Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Review filed by Thomas Colopy, Douglas O'Connor. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/24/2014. Replies due by 10/1/2014. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Uber Technologies, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (May, Caitlin) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 116 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 135 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2014 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/28/2014) re 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 134 RESPONSE to re 129 Statement of Recent Decision by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 132 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE OCT 9 DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE MOTION(S) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. Responses due by 11/6/2014. Replies due by 11/26/2014. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward Chen on 8/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (knm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2014 Filing 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE OCT 9 DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE MOTION(S) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taeusch, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 130 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ben Weber) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8836592.) filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Weber, Ben) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 116 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 128 REPLY (re 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 127 Proposed Order re 116 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 Filing 126 RESPONSE (re 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byDouglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 125 Transcript of Official Electronic Sound Recording for the Proceedings held on 7/10/14 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com, Telephone number 415-994-5619. Tape Number: FTR time: 10:50-11:18 = 28 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 120 Transcript Order, 118 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2014. (Related documents(s) 120 , 118 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Responses due by 7/30/2014. Replies due by 8/6/2014. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 123 Proposed Order re 122 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 116 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Douglas O'Connor. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 16, 2014