Unwired Planet, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv04134
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 467 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $103,264.99 against Unwired Planet, LLC.; granting 469 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 471 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 469 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 469 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 470 REPLY (re 467 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byApple Inc. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 469 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin P. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Response to Apple's Motion for Review of Taxation, # 4 Unredacted Response to Apple's Motion for Review of Taxation)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 468 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 442 Motion for Attorney Fees.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 467 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2015. Replies due by 9/17/2015. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 466 Costs Taxed in amount of $54,673.74, Re: ECF No. 439, against Unwired Planet. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 465 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 464 REPLY (re 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byApple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 463 REPLY (re 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs ) filed byApple Inc. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in support of its Bill of Costs filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's Reply In Support of its Bill of Costs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's Reply In Support of its Bill of Costs)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 7, 2015 Reset Ripe Deadlines as to 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs , 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 461 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 454 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 460 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs , 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Replies due by 8/14/2015. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 459 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 456 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 458 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 454 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Unwired Planet's Response to Apple's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285, and Exhibits 13, 14, and 15 to the Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 454 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 457 Declaration in Support of 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Objections to Apple's Bill of Cost filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 452 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 456 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 455 RESPONSE (re 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 454 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Unwired Planet's Response to Apple's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285, and Exhibits 13, 14, and 15 to the Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Response to Apple's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 4 Unredacted Response to Apple's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, # 5 Exhibit 13 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 13 Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 14 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 14 Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 15 Redacted, # 10 Exhibit 15 Unredacted)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 453 RESPONSE (re 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Objections to Apple's Bill of Cost filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Objections to Apple's Bill of Cost, # 4 Unredacted Objections to Apple's Bill of Cost)(Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 451 USCA Case Number 15-1795 Federal Circuit for 433 Notice of Appeal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 450 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Lyon Declaration ISO Apple's Motion for Fees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unredacted Lyon Declaration ISO Apple's Motion for Fees)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 449 Transmission of 437 Notice of Cross-Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 8/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 448 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 446 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 447 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 446 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 446 ) (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 446 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 445 USCA Case Number 15-1725 Fed Cir. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 444 Order Re Apple's Motions to Seal, by Hon. Vince Chhabria- granting 438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and ordering briefing re 441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal which is due by 7/10/2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/29/2015 (knm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2015 Filing 443 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Lyon Declaration ISO Motion for Fees (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 442 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2015. Replies due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Lyon Declaration ISO Motion for Fees filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Lyon Declaration ISO Motion for Fees, # 4 Redacted Lyon Declaration ISO Motion for Fees)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 440 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit E and Schedule E to Apple's Bill of Costs (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 439 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2015. Replies due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Schedule A, # 3 Schedule B, # 4 Schedule C, # 5 Schedule D, # 6 Schedule E, # 7 Exhibit A - part 1, # 8 Exhibit A - part 2, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 438 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit E and Schedule E to Apple's Bill of Costs filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 4 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # 5 Unredacted Version of Schedule E, # 6 Redacted Version of Schedule E)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 252 Discovery Order, 345 Order, 344 Order, 269 Order, 400 Order, 414 Order, Terminate Motions by Apple Inc. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9614223. Appeal Record due by 7/20/2015. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 436 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 435 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs to June 19, 2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 435 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 434 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 433 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. Appeal Record due by 7/10/2015. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2015: # 1 Docket Sheet) (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 418 Judgment, 290 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 151 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 269 Order, 348 Order, 261 Order, 186 Order, 414 Order, Terminate Motions by Unwired Planet, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9576420. Appeal Record due by 7/6/2015. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 432 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 431 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 430 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 429 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 382 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 428 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 427 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 426 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 425 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 424 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 423 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 422 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 421 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 420 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 419 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/29/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 416 STIPULATION Revised Joint Stipulation Seeking Final Judgment filed by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 27, 2015 Filing 417 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Telephone Conference in chambers held on 5/27/2015. Not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Ted Stevenson. Defendant Attorney Mark Lyon, Ernest Hsin, and Stuart Rosenberg. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 415 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Seeking Final Judgment filed by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/22/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 413 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Dudley Rounds (Rounds, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 412 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 6/3/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2015 through 6/19/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney David Sochia, Ted Stenvenson, Douglas Cawley. Defendant Attorney Ernest Hsin, Mark Lyon, Stuart Rosenberg, Brooke Wallace, Tracy Davies. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 411 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Apple Inc. (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Further Briefing Regarding On-Sale Bar (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 407 Brief re 400 Order Apple's Further Briefing Regarding On-Sale Bar filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 400 ) (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 406 Brief re 400 Order Regarding Further Briefing on '092 On-Sale Bar filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 400 ) (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Further Briefing Regarding On-Sale Bar filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration ISO Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Briefing Re On-Sale Bar, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Apple's Further Briefing Regarding On-Sale Bar, # 4 Redacted Version of Apple's Further Briefing Regarding On-Sale Bar)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 404 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unwired Planet's MIL #1 filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 393 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 403 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #4 filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 373 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 402 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 382 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL No. 1 and UP's Opposition Thereto filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 382 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 401 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The Court will reset the PTC and send notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER re further briefing on on-sale bar. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/7/2015. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 399 TRIAL BRIEF by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #2 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE by Apple Inc Section 282 Notice (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 396 Proposed Pretrial Order by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Trial Exhibit List)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 395 MOTION in Limine # 2 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #2 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Apple's MIL No. 2 with UP Opposition, # 4 UNREDACTED Apple's MIL No. 2 with UP Opposition)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unwired Planet's MIL #1 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of UP's Motion in Limine #1, # 4 Unredacted Version of UP's Motion in Limine #1)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 382 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL No. 1 and UP's Opposition Thereto (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 391 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 390 MOTION in Limine #5 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 389 MOTION in Limine #4 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 388 MOTION in Limine #3 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 387 MOTION in Limine #2 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #3 (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #4 (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 384 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Briefing on '446 Patent "Voice Channel" (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION in Limine #1 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 382 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL No. 1 and UP's Opposition Thereto filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit REDACTED version of Apple's MIL No. 1 and UP's Opposition Thereto, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Apple's MIL No. 1 and UP's Opposition Thereto)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION in Limine #5 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 380 Brief re 363 Order on Further Briefing on '446 Patent "Voice Channel" filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 363 ) (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Further Briefing on '446 Patent "Voice Channel" filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit REDACTED Brief re Further Briefing on '446 Patent "Voice Channel", # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED Brief re Further Briefing on '446 Patent "Voice Channel")(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 378 Brief re 363 Order for Further Briefing on '446 "Voice Channel" filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 363 ) (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 377 MOTION in Limine #3 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #3 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's MIL #3, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's MIL #3)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 375 Proposed Form of Verdict by Apple Inc and Unwired Planet LLC. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 374 MOTION in Limine #4 with Opp per Judge's Standing Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MIL #4 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's MIL #4, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's MIL #4)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 372 Proposed Voir Dire by Unwired Planet, LLC and Apple Inc.. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 371 Statement Joint Statement of the Case by Apple Inc. and Unwired Planet LLC by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 370 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 358 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 369 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 357 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 368 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 352 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 367 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MSJ Reply filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 351 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 366 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 356 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 365 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 353 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 364 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper in Support of 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Related document(s) 355 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER re further briefing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/29/2015. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 Apples Motion For Summary Judgment (D.I. 317) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MSJ Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment (D.I. 336) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 APPLES MOTION TO EXCLUDE (D.I. 319) (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 Apples Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Exclude (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted UP's Response in Opposition to Apple's MSJ, # 4 Unredacted UP's Response in Opposition to Apple's MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 2 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 2 Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 5 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 5 Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 6 Redacted, # 10 Exhibit 6 Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit 12 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 12 Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit 13 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 13 Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit 14 Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 14 Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit 17 Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 17 Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit 21 Redacted, # 20 Exhibit 21 Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit 23 Redacted, # 22 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit 28 Redacted, # 24 Exhibit 28 Unredacted, # 25 Exhibit 30 Redacted, # 26 Exhibit 30 Unredacted, # 27 Exhibit 31 Redacted, # 28 Exhibit 31 Unredacted, # 29 Exhibit 32 part 1 Redacted, # 30 Exhibit 32 part 2 Redacted, # 31 Exhibit 32 part 3 Redacted, # 32 Exhibit 32 part 1 Unredacted, # 33 Exhibit 32 part 2 Unredacted, # 34 Exhibit 32 part 3 Unredacted, # 35 Exhibit 34 Redacted, # 36 Exhibit 34 Unredacted, # 37 Exhibit 35 Redacted, # 38 Exhibit 35 Unredacted)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 357 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted UP's Response to Motion to Exclude Experts, # 4 UnRedacted UP's Response to Motion to Exclude Experts, # 5 Exhibit 7 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 7 Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 8 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 8 Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 9 Redacted, # 10 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit 20 part 1 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 20 part 2 Redacted, # 13 Exhibit 20 part 3 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 20 Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit 21 Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 21 Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit 22 Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 22 Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit 23 Redacted, # 20 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit 24 Redacted, # 22 Exhibit 24 Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit 25 Redacted, # 24 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, # 25 Exhibit 26 Redacted, # 26 Exhibit 26 Unredacted, # 27 Exhibit 27 Redacted, # 28 Exhibit 27 Unredacted, # 29 Exhibit 28 Redacted, # 30 Exhibit 28 Unredacted, # 31 Exhibit 29 Redacted, # 32 Exhibit 29 Unredacted)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's MSJ, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's MSJ, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 21, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, # 19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 29, # 24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, # 25 Redacted Version of Exhibit 33, # 26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, # 27 Redacted Version of Exhibit 35, # 28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, # 29 Redacted Version of Exhibit 36, # 30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, # 31 Redacted Version of Exhibit 37, # 32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, # 33 Redacted Version of Exhibit 38, # 34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38, # 35 Redacted Version of Exhibit 43, # 36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 43, # 37 Redacted Version of Exhibit 50, # 38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 50, # 39 Redacted Version of Exhibit 51, # 40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 51, # 41 Redacted Version of Exhibit 52, # 42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 52, # 43 Redacted Version of Exhibit 53, # 44 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 53, # 45 Redacted Version of Exhibit 54, # 46 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 54, # 47 Redacted Version of Exhibit 56, # 48 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 56, # 49 Redacted Version of Exhibit 57, # 50 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 57, # 51 Redacted Version of Exhibit 58, # 52 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 58)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration ISO Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Exclude, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's Motion to Exclude, # 4 Exhibit B Redacted, # 5 Exhibit E Redacted, # 6 Exhibit I Redacted, # 7 Exhibit J Redacted, # 8 Exhibit K Redacted, # 9 Exhibit L Redacted, # 10 Exhibit M Redacted, # 11 Exhibit N Redacted, # 12 Exhibit Q Redacted, # 13 Exhibit S Redacted, # 14 Unredacted Version of Apple's Motion to Exclude, # 15 Exhibit B Unredacted, # 16 Exhibit E Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit I Unredacted, # 18 Exhibit J Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit K Unredacted, # 20 Exhibit L Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit M Unredacted, # 22 Exhibit N Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit Q Unredacted, # 24 Exhibit S Unredacted)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 354 Brief re 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment refiled pursuant to Dkt 344 filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30 part 1, # 31 Exhibit 30 part 2, # 32 Exhibit 30 part 3, # 33 Exhibit 30 part 4, # 34 Exhibit 30 part 5, # 35 Exhibit 30 part 6, # 36 Exhibit 30 part 7, # 37 Exhibit 30 part 8, # 38 Exhibit 30 part 9, # 39 Exhibit 30 part 10, # 40 Exhibit 31, # 41 Exhibit 32, # 42 Exhibit 33, # 43 Exhibit 34, # 44 Exhibit 35, # 45 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) 311 ) (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to D.I. 344 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration ISO Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply ISO Its Motion to Exclude, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's Reply ISO Its Motion to Exclude, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's Reply ISO Its Motion to Exclude)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal pursuant to Dkt 344 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Unwired Planets's MSJ, # 4 Unredacted Version of Unwired Planets's MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 11 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 11 Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 12 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 12, part 1 Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 12, part 2 Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit 12, part 3 Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit 18 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 18 Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit 29 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 29 Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit 30, part 1 Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 30 part 2 Redacted, # 17 Exhibit 30 part 3 Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 30 part 4 Redacted, # 19 Exhibit 30 part 5 Redacted, # 20 Exhibit 30 part 6 Redacted, # 21 Exhibit 30 part 7 Redacted, # 22 Exhibit 30 part 8 Redacted, # 23 Exhibit 30 part 9 Redacted, # 24 Exhibit 30 part 10 Redacted, # 25 Exhibit 30 Unredacted, # 26 Exhibit 32 Redacted, # 27 Exhibit 32 Unredacted, # 28 Exhibit 33 Redacted, # 29 Exhibit 33 Unredacted)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's MSJ Reply filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Apple's MSJ Reply, # 4 Unredacted Version of Apple's MSJ Reply)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 350 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/22/15, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 346 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. (Related documents(s) 346 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/23/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 346 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Unwired Planet, LLC for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 347 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2015 re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc. and 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. The motion to seal the courtroom for the entire proceeding is denied. The Court takes the matter under submission and will issue a written order. Court Reporter Name Joann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys: David Sochia, Ted Stevenson, Douglas Cawley, John Campbell, Kevin Kneupper, Christopher Mierzejewski, Mario Apreotesi, Stephanie Adams Ryan. Plaintiff Clients: Daniel Mendez, Tim Robbins, and Amy Koestner. Defendant Attorney: Ernest Hsin, Mark Lyon, Stuart Rosenberg, Brooke Myers Wallace. Defendant Client: David Melaugh. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER RE Hearing on April 22, 2015. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/21/2015. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER denying motions to seal. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/21/205. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 343 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 341 Stipulation re Equipment and Materials for Hearing on April 22, 2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 342 ERRATA re 336 Reply to Opposition/Response In Support Of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Image for Dkt. No. 336)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Equipment and Materials for Hearings on April 22, 2015 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 340 MOTION to Seal Courtroom during April 22, 2015 Hearing On the Parties' Motions for Summary Judgment and Apple's Motion to Exclude Unwired Planet's Experts filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarita Venkat, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 339 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Partially Seal the Courtroom During Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Responses due by 4/28/2015. Replies due by 5/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 4/14/2015) Modified on 4/15/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2015 Filing 338 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 320 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 313 and 314 .(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 336 REPLY (re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byApple Inc. (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stuart M. Rosenberg, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion, # 3 Unredacted Version of Reply ISO MSJ)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 334 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Unwired Planets Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the Expert Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 333 REPLY (re 319 MOTION to Strike Unwired Planet's Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby's, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the "Expert" Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins ) filed byApple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Unwired Planets Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the Expert Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of B. Wallace, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Reply ISO Motion to Exclude, # 4 Unredacted Version of Reply ISO Motion to Exclude)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Adams Ryan (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 330 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 310 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 329 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 325 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 328 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 323 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 327 ERRATA re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Unwired Planet's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Image for Dkt. No. 317)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 326 RESPONSE (re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kevin Kneupper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, part 1, # 17 Exhibit 15, part 2, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Motion for Summary Jugment SEALED, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 9 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 10, # 20 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 11, # 22 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 23 Exhibit 12, # 24 Exhibit 12 SEALED, # 25 Exhibit 13, # 26 Exhibit 13 SEALED, # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 14 SEALED, # 29 Exhibit 16, # 30 Exhibit 16 SEALED, # 31 Exhibit 17, # 32 Exhibit 17 SEALED, # 33 Exhibit 21, # 34 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 35 Exhibit 23, # 36 Exhibit 23 SEALED, # 37 Exhibit 26, # 38 Exhibit 26 SEALED, # 39 Exhibit 27, # 40 Exhibit 27 SEALED, # 41 Exhibit 28, # 42 Exhibit 28 SEALED, # 43 Exhibit 29, # 44 Exhibit 29 SEALED, # 45 Exhibit 30, # 46 Exhibit 30 SEALED, # 47 Exhibit 31, # 48 Exhibit 31 SEALED, # 49 Exhibit 32, # 50 Exhibit 32 SEALED, # 51 Exhibit 34, # 52 Exhibit 34 SEALED, # 53 Exhibit 35, # 54 Exhibit 35 SEALED)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 324 RESPONSE (re 319 MOTION to Strike Unwired Planet's Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby's, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the "Expert" Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leah Buratti, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leah Buratti, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition to Motion to Exclude Experts, # 4 Opposition to Motion to Exclude Experts SEALED, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 15 Exhibit 6, # 16 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 17 Exhibit 7, # 18 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 9, # 22 Exhibit 9 SEALED, # 23 Exhibit 10, # 24 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 25 Exhibit 11, # 26 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 27 Exhibit 20, # 28 Exhibit 20 SEALED, # 29 Exhibit 21, # 30 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 31 Exhibit 22, # 32 Exhibit 22 SEALED, # 33 Exhibit 23, # 34 Exhibit 23 SEALED, # 35 Exhibit 24, # 36 Exhibit 24 SEALED, # 37 Exhibit 25, # 38 Exhibit 25 SEALED, # 39 Exhibit 26, # 40 Exhibit 26 SEALED, # 41 Exhibit 27, # 42 Exhibit 27 SEALED, # 43 Exhibit 28, # 44 Exhibit 28 SEALED, # 45 Exhibit 29, # 46 Exhibit 29 SEALED)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 322 ERRATA re 319 MOTION to Strike Unwired Planet's Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby's, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the "Expert" Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Image for Dkt No. 319)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Exclude (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 320 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document DI-313 and DI-314 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 319 MOTION to Strike Unwired Planet's Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby's, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the "Expert" Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brooke Wallace, # 2 Proposed Order Granting, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 318 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Exclude filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brooke Wallace, # 2 Proposed Order Granting, # 3 Non-Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit S)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29, # 29 Exhibit 31, # 30 Exhibit 33, # 31 Exhibit 35, # 32 Exhibit 36, # 33 Exhibit 37, # 34 Exhibit 38, # 35 Exhibit 43, # 36 Exhibit 45, # 37 Exhibit 46, # 38 Exhibit 47, # 39 Exhibit 50, # 40 Exhibit 51, # 41 Exhibit 52, # 42 Exhibit 53, # 43 Exhibit 54, # 44 Exhibit 56, # 45 Exhibit 57, # 46 Exhibit 58)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 315 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc re 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Exclude (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 314 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** MOTION to Strike Unwired Planet's Survey Expert Dr. Greg M. Allenby's, Damages Expert Mr. Robert Mills, and the "Expert" Disclosure of Mr. Tim Robbins filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brooke Wallace, # 2 Proposed Order Granting, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015) Modified on 3/17/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2015 Filing 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion to Exclude filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brooke Wallace, # 2 Proposed Order Granting, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit Q, # 15 Exhibit S)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 312 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Resolution of Objections to Printed Source Code Under Protective Order [Dkt 298] (Campbell, John) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2015. Replies due by 3/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted MSJ, # 4 Unredacted MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 2 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 2 Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit 3 Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 3 Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit 4 Redacted, # 10 Exhibit 4 Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit 5 Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 5 Unredacted, # 13 Exhibit 6 Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 6 Unredacted, # 15 Exhibit 8 Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 8 Unredacted, # 17 Exhibit 9 Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, # 19 Exhibit 10 Redacted, # 20 Exhibit 10 Unredacted, # 21 Exhibit 11 Redacted, # 22 Exhibit 11 Unredacted, # 23 Exhibit 12 Redacted, # 24 Exhibit 12, part 1 Unredacted, # 25 Exhibit 12, part 2 Unredacted, # 26 Exhibit 12, part 3 Unredacted, # 27 Exhibit 13 Redacted, # 28 Exhibit 13 Unredacted, # 29 Exhibit 14 Redacted, # 30 Exhibit 14 Unredacted, # 31 Exhibit 15 Redacted, # 32 Exhibit 15 Unredacted, # 33 Exhibit 16 Redacted, # 34 Exhibit 16 Unredacted, # 35 Exhibit 18 Redacted, # 36 Exhibit 18 Unredacted, # 37 Exhibit 19 Redacted, # 38 Exhibit 19 Unredacted, # 39 Exhibit 20 Redacted, # 40 Exhibit 20 Unredacted, # 41 Exhibit 25 Redacted, # 42 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, # 43 Exhibit 26 Redacted, # 44 Exhibit 26 Unredacted, # 45 Exhibit 27 Redacted, # 46 Exhibit 27 Unredacted, # 47 Exhibit 28 Redacted, # 48 Exhibit 28 Unredacted, # 49 Exhibit 29 Redacted, # 50 Exhibit 29 Unredacted, # 51 Exhibit 30 Redacted, # 52 Exhibit 30 Unredacted, # 53 Exhibit 31 Redacted, # 54 Exhibit 31 Unredacted, # 55 Exhibit 32 Redacted, # 56 Exhibit 32 Unredacted, # 57 Exhibit 33 Redacted, # 58 Exhibit 33 Unredacted, # 59 Exhibit 35 Redacted, # 60 Exhibit 35 Unredacted, # 61 Exhibit 36 Redacted, # 62 Exhibit 36 Unredacted)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 309 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Cawley.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 20, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 298 MOTION for Resolution of Objections to Printed Source Code Under Protective Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 308 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 307 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 17, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to SJ Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 306 REPLY (re 298 MOTION for Resolution of Objections to Printed Source Code Under Protective Order ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 305 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 302 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 304 RESPONSE (re 298 MOTION for Resolution of Objections to Printed Source Code Under Protective Order ) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 3 Redacted Exhibit 2, # 4 Redacted Exhibit 3, # 5 Redacted Exhibit 4, # 6 Redacted Exhibit 5, # 7 Redacted Exhibit 6)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6)(Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 302 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Experts filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 301 Declaration of Christina Kogan in Support of 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 297 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Quincy Lu of Counsel for Defendant Apple, Inc. (Lu, Quincy) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 299 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9254084.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 298 MOTION for Resolution of Objections to Printed Source Code Under Protective Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 2/10/2015. Replies due by 2/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Kneupper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Proposed Order)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Motion for Resolution of Printed Source Code Under Protective Order, # 4 Unredacted Motion for Resolution of Printed Source Code Under Protective Order, # 5 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 7 Redacted Exhibit 2, # 8 Unredacted Exhibit 2, # 9 Redacted Exhibit 3, # 10 Unredacted Exhibit 3, # 11 Redacted Exhibit 4, # 12 Unredacted Exhibit 4, # 13 Redacted Exhibit 5, # 14 Unredacted Exhibit 5)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 296 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 295 Stipulation Regarding Judgment of Non-Infringement of the '491 Patent.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 19, 2015 Filing 295 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Judgment of Non-Infringement of the '491 Patent filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 1/19/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 294 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time to File. This is a text only docket entry. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 293 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Time to Serve Rebuttal and Reply Damages and Survey Expert Reports filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Joint Motion to Extend Time to Serve Rebuttal and Reply Damages and Survey Expert Reports, # 2 Proposed Order ISO Joint Motion to Extend Time to Serve Rebuttal and Reply Damages and Survey Expert Reports)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
December 23, 2014 Filing 292 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 291 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 291 MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Protective Order Unopposed filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2015. Replies due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 290 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 266 Motion for leave to add new products to the patent infringement suit.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 289 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD NEW ACCUSED PRODUCTS. The Court will rule on the briefs filed. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 288 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 287 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 286 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF BROOKE WALLACE, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED version of Stipulation, # 4 UNREDACTED version of Stipulation)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 286 STIPULATION OF REPRESENTATIVENESS OF DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S SOURCE CODE filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 285 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 284 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. This is a text only docket entry.(vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 284 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 282 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 283 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 281 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to 12/8/2014.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 282 *** DOCUMENT REMOVED PER COURT ORDER. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Representativeness of Defendant Apple Inc.s Source Code filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/25/2014) Modified on 11/26/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 Filing 281 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 280 REPLY (re 266 MOTION for Leave to Add New Accused Products ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE by Unwired Planet, LLC re 274 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Asserted Claims (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 278 RESPONSE (re 266 MOTION for Leave to Add New Accused Products ) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wallace ISO Opp to Motion for Leave to Add New Products, # 2 Exhibit to Wallace Declaration)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 277 Order, signed 11/14/14, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 264 Unwired Planet's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A-C.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 276 Order, signed 11/14/14, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 263 Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lu Declaration, page 4. Exhibits A-D.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 275 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE MOTION HEARING RE NEW CLAIMS SET FOR NOVEMBER 20, 2014. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 267 Motion to file a motion to add claims. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REDACTED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESOLUTION OF re 262 Letter (Motion to Compel) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/7/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 272 Order, signed 11/7/14, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation of Resolution of Unwired Planet's Motion to Compel [dkt 262].(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation of Resolution of Unwired Planet's Motion to Compel [Dkt No. 262] filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mario Apreotesi, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Stipulation, # 4 Sealed Stipulation)(Apreotesi, Mario) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 270 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 11/5/2014 before Joseph C. Spero. Parties to e-file a stipulation by Thursday, 11/6/14. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/03/2014. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 268 Order To Meet and Confer. Discovery Hearing set for 11/5/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 267 MOTION REGARDING ASSERTED CLAIMS filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/10/2014. Replies due by 11/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration John Campbell, # 3 Exhibit A)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to Add New Accused Products filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/14/2014. Replies due by 11/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leah Buratti, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 265 EXHIBITS re 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A (Redacted) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit A (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit B (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit C (Sealed))(Related document(s) 264 ) (Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Fornorotto, # 2 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 263 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Quincy Lu In Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration (Redacted Version) Declaration of Quincy Lu In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 4 Declaration (Non-Redacted Version) Declaration of Quincy Lu In Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 262 Letter from Counsel to Judge Spero re Source Code . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mario Apreotesi, # 2 Declaration of Lauren Fornarotto, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Declaration of Quincy Lu, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER re 250 DENYING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/23/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 260 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 257 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Mierzejewski.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 259 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 258 Stipulation of Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 258 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 257 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Mierzejewski ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9006768.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Mierzejewski, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2014) Modified on 10/20/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2014 Filing 256 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/9/2014, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 254 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Related documents(s) 254 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/16/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Unwired Planet, LLC for Court Reporter James Pence. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 252 Discovery Order re 246 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/14/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 251 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/14/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 10/14/2014). Motion Hearing re New Claims set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Discovery due by 11/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2015. Cross Motions due by 3/16/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 6/1/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2015 through 6/19/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (Not reported or recorded.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick S. Chung (Chung, Frederick) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 249 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2014 before Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 10/10/2014) re 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Plaintiff counsel are to provide the Court and opposing counsel a conference line to use for the hearing by no later than Monday, October 13, 2014 at noon. (Court Reporter: James Pence.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 248 OBJECTIONS to re 244 Reply to Opposition/Response re 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Apple Inc. (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 247 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 246 Letter from Parties Addressing a Discovery Dispute . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Unwired Planet LLC, # 2 Proposed Order of Apple Inc.)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration MArio A. Apreotesi, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Reply, # 4 Unredacted Version of Reply)(Apreotesi, Mario) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 244 REPLY (re 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byUnwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Mario A. Apreotesi)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 243 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 242 RESPONSE (re 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Steven Kalogeras in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Kalogeras Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4-7 to Kalogeras Declaration)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 241 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Steve Kalogeras in Support of Admin Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 4 to Kalogeras Declaration In Support of Apple's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit 5 to Kalogeras Declaration In Support of Apple's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 6 to Kalogeras Declaration In Support of Apple's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit 7 to Kalogeras Declaration In Support of Apple's Opposition)(Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B Davies (Pro Hac Vice) (Davies, Tracey) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 239 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 237 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Davies.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 238 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/11/2014, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 233 Transcript Order, 234 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2014. (Related documents(s) 233 , 234 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 237 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Tracey B. Davies ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8902781.) filed by Apple Inc. (Davies, Tracey) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 236 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Priyanka Rajagopalan (Rajagopalan, Priyanka) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Unwired Planet, LLC for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 232 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/12/2014. Replies due by 9/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mario A. Apreotesi, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mario A. Apreotesi, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion, # 4 Unredacted Version of Motion, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 19 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 21 Redacted Version of Exhibit I, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Apreotesi, Mario) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 230 Minute Entry: Claims Construction held on 8/11/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 8/12/2014). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2014)
August 6, 2014 Filing 229 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 8/5/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 8/6/2014). (Not reported or recorded.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE by Unwired Planet, LLC of Withdrawal of Attorney for Plaintiff (Campbell, John) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE by Unwired Planet, LLC of Withdrawal of Attorney for Plaintiff (Campbell, John) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Prieb Estremera (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 225 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 223 Motion for Leave to File Certain Amended Contentions.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 224 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 222 Stipulation Regarding Use of Equipment.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 223 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Certain Amended Contentions filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 222 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Equipment at Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearings filed by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 221 CLERKS NOTICE CORRECTING THE LOCATION OF THE TUTORIAL: Tutorial Hearing set for 8/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 220 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/11/2014 09:00 AM. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 219 JOINT NOTICE OF AGREED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Unwired Planet, LLC (Campbell, John) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/29/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 Filing 218 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 217 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Burrati.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Leah B. Buratti ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8682365.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Buratti, Leah) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 216 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARINGS: Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/5/2014 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 215 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 214 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Fornarotto.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25FSIBL3.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/23/14 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Fornarotto, Lauren) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 through 3/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Markman hearing set for 6/24/2014 10:30 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/8/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 212 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 169 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 211 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2014 Filing 210 Brief re 203 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) 203 ) (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 209 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT - RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Campbell Jr., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Declaration of Mark R. Jones, Ph.D, # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 208 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 207 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Kalogeras.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Vince Chhabria, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 207 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8535621.) filed by Apple Inc. (Kalogeras, Steven) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 206 Declaration of Peter Rysavy in Support of 204 Claim Construction Statement Opening Claim Construction Brief per L.R. 4-5(a) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 204 ) (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 205 Declaration of Y. Ernest Hsin in Support of 204 Claim Construction Statement Opening Claim Construction Brief per L.R. 4-5(a) filed byApple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9-11, # 5 Exhibit 12-15, # 6 Exhibit 16-19, # 7 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 204 ) (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 204 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Opening Claim Construction Brief per L.R. 4-5(a) filed by Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 203 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Opening Claim Construction Brief per L.R. 4-5(a) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 201 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Parties' Opening Claim Construction Briefs filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hsin Declaration ISO Apple's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Enlargement of the Page Limit for the Parties' Opening Claim Construction Briefs to 35 Pages, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order ISO Apple's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Enlargement of the Page Limit for the Parties' Opening Claim Construction Briefs to 35 Pages)(Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Brooke Myers Wallace (Wallace, Brooke) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 199 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Unwired Planet, LLC, Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit E - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 194 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James Elroy Quigley representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 193 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Kneupper representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mario Aurel Apreotesi representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 191 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mitchell Reed Sibley representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 194 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8418879.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Quigley, James) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 193 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8418844.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Kneupper, Kevin) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 192 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8418817.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Apreotesi, Mario) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 191 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8418757.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Sibley, Mitchell) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 189 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Burgess representing plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 189 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8359930.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 188 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings (FTR) held on January 6, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR:2:54pm-3:37pm. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2014. (Related document(s) 179 , 180 ) (rhm) (Filed on 1/31/2014) Modified on 2/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 183 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore Stevenson III representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER re 118 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/21/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER re 182 Proposed Order filed by Unwired Planet, LLC, Apple Inc. Claims Construction Hearing set for Wednesday, 5/14/2014 02:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for Wednesday, 5/7/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 184 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE MONDAY, JANUARY 13, 2014 AT 2:00PM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 183 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8288025.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Stevenson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 182 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Unwired Planet, LLC, Apple Inc. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 1/10/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Unwired Planet, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 181 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 1/6/2014). Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. If counsel submit agreed upon proposed schedule by Friday 1/10/2014 then the CMC date of 1/13/2014 will be vacated.(Recording #FTR: 2:54pm-3:37pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 172 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John B. Campbell representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 31, 2013 Filing 177 Certificate of Interested Entities by Unwired Planet, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Unwired Planet IP Holdings, Inc. for Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 176 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Unwired Planet, LLC, Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2013 Filing 175 Certificate of Interested Entities by Unwired Planet, LLC (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 26, 2013 Filing 174 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kogan, Christina) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 26, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtland Lewis Reichman (Reichman, Courtland) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 26, 2013 Filing 172 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8241900.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/18/13 filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers DENYING without prejudice 168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 170 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 169 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/18/2013) Modified on 12/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2013 Filing 168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John B. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8241900.) filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 12/18/2013) Modified on 12/19/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2013 Filing 167 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 24, 2013 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Unwired Planet, LLC re 165 Clerks Notice, and Standing Order in Civil Cases (Campbell, John) (Filed on 11/24/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 165 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/6/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 164 ERRATA re 63 Reply Memorandum by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Image for Dkt #63)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 16, 2013. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 162 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 161 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Hsin, Yu-Chieh) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 14, 2013 Filing 160 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unwired Planet, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hubert, Pierre) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 158 Mail sent to Attorney Kevin L. Burgess returned as undeliverable re 154 Clerks Notice. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 157 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 143 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 156 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 140 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 155 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 154 CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from U.S.D.C. Nevada. Their Case No. 3:12-CV-505-RCJ-VPC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 153 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 152 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 3:12-cv-00505. File Electronically Transferred. Copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 9/11/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Transfer. Clerk shall transfer case to Northern District of CA, close case administratively, and terminate all other pending motions in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 30, 2013 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/30/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for the case management conference set before this Court on Friday, September 6, 2013 at 2:00 PM and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050906. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, September 3, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 19, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE OF ORDER by Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rounds, Michael)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER ON 147 STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Attorney Etai Lahav as counsel for Apple Inc., and removal from CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 15, 2013 Filing 147 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for the Withdrawal of Attorney Etai Lahav and for the Removal of Attorney Etai Lahav from the CM/ECF Service List by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
August 9, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (JC)
August 8, 2013 Filing 145 ANSWER to 137 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Unwired Planet, LLC.(Rounds, Michael)
August 8, 2013 Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/8/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Monthly Case Management Conferences are set as follows: 9/6/2013 at 02:00 PM, 10/4/2013 at 02:00 PM, 11/4/2013 at 02:00 PM, and 12/5/2013 at 09:00 AM all in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business three (3) court days prior to each conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 6, 2013 Filing 143 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas M. Mathews and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2914703) filed by Counter Defendants Unwired Planet, LLC, Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 8/6/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 141 Stipulation Vacating the August 9, 2013 Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 5, 2013 Filing 141 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Vacating the August 9, 2013 Case Management Conference by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
July 22, 2013 Filing 140 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell Sibley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2896079) filed by Counter Defendants Unwired Planet, LLC, Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 7/22/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
July 18, 2013 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 134 Miscellaneous Hearing, held on 7/11/13, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, 775-329-0132. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2013. (DD)
July 16, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (DRM)
July 15, 2013 Filing 137 ANSWER to 130 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Unwired Planet, LLC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Fountain, Jonathan)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 135 Stipulation Extending Time for Apple to Serve Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 11, 2013 Filing 135 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Extending the Time for Apple to Serve its Local Rule 16.1-8(b)-(e) Disclosures by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
July 11, 2013 Filing 134 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Michael Rounds, John Campbell, and (By telephone) Pierre Hubert; Def Counsel: Ernest Hsin, Jonathan Fountain, and (By telephone) Brooke Wallace; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:00:55 - 10:35:32; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court finds it is not convinced and that it is premature to order Apple to limit the number of asserted prior art references at this time. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 8, 2013 Filing 133 STATUS REPORT re July 2013 Case Management Conference by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Fountain, Jonathan)
July 8, 2013 Filing 132 STATEMENT UNWIRED PLANET'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rounds, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/1/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for the case management conference set before this Court on Thursday, July 11, 2013 at 10:00 AM and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050711. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, July 8, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
June 28, 2013 Filing 130 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 10/26/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SCHEDULING ORDER re 128 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 14, 2013 Filing 128 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC Amended [Joint Proposed] Scheduling Order. (Rounds, Michael)
June 10, 2013 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 126 Status Conference,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, held on 6-7-13, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website <a href=http://www.nvd.uscourts.gov target=_blank>www.nvd.uscourts.gov</a> before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2013. (KF)
June 7, 2013 Filing 126 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 6/7/2013 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: Heidi Jordan; Pla Counsel: Michael Rounds, Ryan Cudnik; Def Counsel: Ernest Hsin, Jonathan Fountain (By telephone); Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:04 - 11:00; Courtroom: 1; The Court addresses the parties regarding the purpose of this hearing and notes the parties have filed their Case Management Conference Reports 124 125 . Having heard from counsel and good cause appearing, the Court finds as follows: Markman hearing currently set December 16, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, January 21-22, 2014, at 9:00 a.m.Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference currently set for July 12, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to Thursday, September 19, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Settlement Statements due September 12, 2013. Regarding the remaining revised deadlines, counsel shall submit an amended Scheduling Order incorporating the new agreed upon deadlines on or before June 14, 2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 5, 2013 Filing 125 STATUS REPORT Case Management Conference Statement by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Rounds, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Filing 124 STATUS REPORT Case Management Conference Report [June 2013] by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fountain, Jonathan)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER APPROVING 116 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Sochia for Unwired Planet, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/04/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER APPROVING 115 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Kneupper for Unwired Planet, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/04/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 4, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael D Rounds on behalf of Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. of RYAN J. CUDNIK (Rounds, Michael)
June 4, 2013 Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 6/4/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of a calendar conflict with plaintiff's counsel and having no objection from defendant's counsel, the Case Management Conference currently set for 6/10/2013 at 09:00 AM is VACATED and ADVANCED to 6/7/2013 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for the case management conference and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050607. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 117 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 29, 2013 Filing 117 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
May 22, 2013 Filing 116 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Sochia and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2828079) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 5/22/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
May 22, 2013 Filing 115 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin M. Kneupper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2827583) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 5/22/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 98 motion for clarification to the extent that the court clarifies that its order 93 is clear on its face. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
May 16, 2013 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to 98 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF APRIL 11, 2013, ORDER re 93 Order, filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rounds, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint re 1 Complaint,,. by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, # 2 Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement)(Yowell, Adam)
May 9, 2013 Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/9/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of the parties' stipulation regarding the May 10, 2013 case management conference 110 , the case management conference set for Friday, May 10, 2013 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
May 9, 2013 Filing 110 STIPULATION REGARDING THE MAY 10, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, UNWIRED PLANET'S LOCAL PATENT RULE 16.1-7(B) DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, AND APPLE'S DUE DATE FOR IT'S INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rounds, Michael)
May 9, 2013 Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/9/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for the case management conference set before this Court on Friday, May 10, 2013 at 10:00 AM and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050510. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
May 8, 2013 Filing 108 STATEMENT of Unwired Planet Case Management Report by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael D. Rounds)(Rounds, Michael)
May 7, 2013 Filing 107 STATUS REPORT Case Management Conference Report [May 2013] by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence)(Fountain, Jonathan)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ON 104 STIPULATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 05/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 6, 2013 Filing 105 RESPONSE to 98 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF APRIL 11, 2013, ORDER re 93 Order, , filed by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. Replies due by 5/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fountain, Jonathan)
May 2, 2013 Filing 104 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 94 Miscellaneous Hearing,, 96 Order, ; for Apple to Serve its Local Rule 16.1-8 and 16.1-9 Disclosures and Document Production by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
April 25, 2013 Filing 103 (1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Josh A. Krevitt is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LG)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ON 99 STIPULATION. The parties will produce electronically-stored information according to the Federal Circuit Advisory Council's Model Order Regarding E-Discovery In Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 04/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 22, 2013 Filing 101 RESPONSE to 83 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Replies due by 5/2/2013. (Krieger, John)
April 19, 2013 Filing 100 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc. Proposed Protective Order. (Fountain, Jonathan)
April 19, 2013 Filing 99 STIPULATION TO PRODUCE ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION ACCORDING TO MODEL ORDER by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rounds, Michael)
April 19, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF APRIL 11, 2013, ORDER re 93 Order, by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
April 17, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 96 Order ( Original image was for an unrelated case, and has been replaced.) (Service of corrected image is attached). (DRM)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - UP shall limit its asserted claims to no more than 70. The parties shall meet and confer and shall submit an amended scheduling order that incorporates these rulings. ( See pdf order for specifics. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 96 replaced on 4/17/2013) (DRM).
April 15, 2013 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 94 Miscellaneous Hearing,, held on 4-11-13, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website <a href=http://www.nvd.uscourts.gov target=_blank>www.nvd.uscourts.gov</a> before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2013. (KF)
April 11, 2013 Filing 94 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 4/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Michael Rounds, John Campbell, and (By telephone) Pierre Hubert; Def Counsel: Ernest Hsin, Jonathan Fountain, and (By telephone) Brooke Wallace; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:0048 - 10:09:54 and 10:15:12 - 10:39:34; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court hears from counsel regarding their respective positions concerning discovery disputes. Counsel are directed to meet and confer and propose an amended scheduling order. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re protective order provisions. The parties shall submit a protective order consistent with the attached order no later than Friday, April 19, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
April 8, 2013 Filing 92 DECLARATION of MICHAEL D. ROUNDS re 91 Status Report ; including Exhibits A, B, and C In Support of Case Management Report by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
April 8, 2013 Filing 91 STATUS REPORT Case Management Report for April 11, 2013 Case Management Conference by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
April 8, 2013 Filing 90 STATUS REPORT for April 11, 2013 Case Management Conference by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Fountain, Jonathan)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER APPROVING 82 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Kalogeras for Apple, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountaion. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER APPROVING 80 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashley N. Moore for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER APPROVING 79 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Warren H. Lipschitz for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 4, 2013 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to 37 MOTION to Transfer filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Sur-Reply In Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue--REDACTED (Yowell, Adam)
April 4, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief Under Seal by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yowell, Adam)
April 4, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yowell, Adam)
March 29, 2013 Filing 82 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Steven Kalogeras and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2760163) by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/29/2013. (Fountain, Jonathan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to 37 MOTION to Transfer filed by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Thomas Bernard, # 2 Declaration Brooke Wallace, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Fountain, Jonathan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 80 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ashley N. Moore and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2752502) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 3/25/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
March 25, 2013 Filing 79 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Warren H. Lipschitz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2752493) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC . Motion ripe 3/25/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
March 20, 2013 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 73 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Miscellaneous Hearing,,,, held on 3-11-13, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website <a href=http://www.nvd.uscourts.gov target=_blank>www.nvd.uscourts.gov</a> before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2013. (KF)
March 16, 2013 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on March 16, 2013, by Carrie L. Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 74 Stipulation Extending the Time for Defendant Apple Inc. To File and Serve a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer (First Request) is GRANTED. Defendant Apple Inc. shall file a reply in support of its motion to transfer on or before March 25, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
March 12, 2013 Filing 75 ERRATA to 63 Response to 37 Motion ; Corrections to Confidential Brief (Doc. 69) and Non-Confidential Brief (Doc. 63) filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Yowell, Adam) Modified on 3/13/2013 add link to motion (WJ).
March 12, 2013 Filing 74 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 63 Response to Motion ; by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Unwired Planet's Motion for Leave to File Declaration, Deposition Transcript and Brief Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 11, 2013 Filing 73 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 3/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Michael Rounds, John Campbell, and Pierre Hubert; Def Counsel: Ernest Hsin and Jonathan Fountain; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:02:49 - 10:16:56; Time of Hearing: 9:02 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court approves and signs the order granting Unwired Planet's motion for leave to file declaration, deposition transcript and brief under seal 61 . The Court finds it shall take the issues concerning the protective order and number of claims under submission and enter an written order. Court adjourns. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 6, 2013 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Report by Defendant Apple, Inc., Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Rounds, Michael)
March 6, 2013 Filing 68 DECLARATION of ERIC VETTER re 63 Response to 37 Motion ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2013 link added.(BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 67 DECLARATION of TIMOTHY ROBBINS re 63 Response to 37 Motion ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2013 link added. (BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 66 DECLARATION of MIKE MULICA re 63 Response to 37 Motion ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2013 link added. (BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 65 DECLARATION of DANIEL MENDEZ re 63 Response to 37 Motion ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2013 link added. (BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 64 DECLARATION of JOHN F. GARVISH, II re 63 Response to 37 Motion ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20-26, # 2 Exhibit 27-32, # 3 Exhibit 33-37, # 4 Exhibit 38-52, # 5 Exhibit 53-57, # 6 Exhibit 58-61, # 7 Exhibit 62, # 8 Exhibit 63-68, # 9 Exhibit 69-75, # 10 Exhibit 76-81)(Rounds, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2013 link to motion added. (BLG).
March 6, 2013 Filing 63 RESPONSE to 37 MOTION to Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Non-Confidential / Public Version Replies due by 3/16/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
March 6, 2013 Filing 62 DECLARATION of MICHAEL D. ROUNDS re 61 MOTION for Leave to File Brief, Declaration and Exhibit Under Seal ; by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
March 6, 2013 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Brief, Declaration and Exhibit Under Seal by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 3/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order 1-(Proposed) Order Granting Motion to For Leave to File Under Seal)(Rounds, Michael)
March 5, 2013 Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/5/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-town counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically at the case management conference set for Monday, March 11, 2013 at 9:00 AM and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050311. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER APPROVING 58 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John B. Campbell for Unwired Planet, LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/01/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 28, 2013 Filing 58 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John B. Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2721753) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/28/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on February 21, 2013, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 49 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Ryan James Cudnik is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 48 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mario A. Apreotesi for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 47 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Garvish for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 46 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mieke Malmberg for Unwired Planet and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 45 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James E. Quigley for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 44 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Shumaker for Unwired Planet, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 42 Stipulation, GRANTING extention of time for serving asserted claims and infringement contentions. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER on Stipulation 41 re 37 MOTION to Transfer filed by Apple, Inc., ( Responses due by 3/6/2013.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
February 20, 2013 Filing 49 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan James Cudnik and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2711052) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/20/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 48 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mario A. Apreotesi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2710440) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 47 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Garvish and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2710438) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 46 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mieke Malmberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2710432) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 45 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James E. Quigley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2710423) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 44 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Shumaker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2710416) filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2013. (Rounds, Michael)
February 19, 2013 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 2/19/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. In light of a conflict with the Court's calendar, the case management conference currently set for 3/15/2013 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and ADVANCED to 3/11/2013 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, March 6, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 14, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR SERVING ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
February 14, 2013 Filing 41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 37 MOTION to Transfer ; TO FILE AND SERVE OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
February 11, 2013 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 39 Miscellaneous Hearing, held on 2/4/13, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, 775-329-0132. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2013. (DD)
February 4, 2013 Filing 39 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2013 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Adam Yowell and (By telephone) Michael Rounds, Pierre Hubert and John Shoemaker; Def Counsel: Ernest Hsin, Leif Reid, and Johnathan Fountain; Court Reporter/FTR #: 11:05:44 - 11:23:56; Time of Hearing: 11:05 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court recites the agreement of parties regarding certain protocol and procedures they intend to abide by as they proceed with litigation in this action. The first pre-claim settlement conference is set for Friday, July 12, 2013 at 9:00 AM. Monthly Case Management Conferences are scheduled as follows: 3/15/2013 at 10:00 AM, 4/11/2013 at 09:00 AM, 5/10/2013 at 10:00 AM, 6/10/2013 at 09:00 AM, 7/11/2013 at 10:00 AM, and 8/9/2013 at 09:00 AM all in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Counsel shall file a joint or separate case management report by no later than the close of business three (3) court days prior to each conference. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER Minute Order in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/4/13. Discovery due: 10/7/2013 Please see attached for other deadlines and details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 1, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION to Transfer by Counter Claimant Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 2/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Mark Buckley, # 2 Declaration Danielle Durkee, # 3 Declaration Brooke Wallace, # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit 1 (Part 4 of 4), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 17, # 24 Exhibit 18, # 25 Exhibit 19)(Fountain, Jonathan)
January 31, 2013 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/31/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel appearing telephonically for the case management conference set before this Court on Monday, February 4, 2013 at 11:00 AM shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The Access Code is 2809752 and the Security Code is 125050204. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
January 24, 2013 Filing 35 Joint STATUS REPORT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 17, 2013 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/17/2013. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Case Management Conference is set for 2/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Out-of-town and out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall advise Lisa Mann at (775)686-5653 at least two (2) days prior of the telephone number at which counsel can be reached for the conference. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Thursday, January 24, 2013. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
January 11, 2013 Filing 33 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Counter Defendant Unwired Planet, LLC, Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC Special Scheduling Review Requested. (Rounds, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Filing 32 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 29 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, with Certificate of Service filed by Unwired Planet, LLC.(Rounds, Michael)
December 10, 2012 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Apple, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 30, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (DRM)
November 29, 2012 Filing 29 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/9/2012., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/13/2013.), COUNTERCLAIM against Unwired Planet, LLC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Fountain, Jonathan)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING 20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Brooke Wallace and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Josh Krevitt and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING 21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Etai Lahav and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING 19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Y. Ernest Hsin and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Stuart Rosenberg and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Mark Lyon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan Fountain. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/28/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 15, 2012 Filing 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Josh A. Krevitt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604155) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Etai Lahav and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604141) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brooke Wallace and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604135) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 19 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Y. Ernest Hsin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604127) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stuart M. Rosenberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604116) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 17 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by H. Mark Lyon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan W. Fountain (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2604080) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/15/2012. (Fountain, Jonathan)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Kevin L. Burgess and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING 12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Pierre J. Hubert and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING 11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Theodore Stevenson, III, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Rounds. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 29, 2012 Filing 13 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Burgess and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2578233) filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 10/29/2012. (Rounds, Michael)
October 29, 2012 Filing 12 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Pierre Hubert and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2578224) filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 10/29/2012. (Rounds, Michael)
October 29, 2012 Filing 11 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Theodore Stevenson, III and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2578210) filed by Plaintiff Unwired Planet, LLC. Motion ripe 10/29/2012. (Rounds, Michael)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON STIPULATION re 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Apple, Inc. answer due 11/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 23, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Fountain, Jonathan)
October 12, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Unwired Planet, LLC served on 10/9/2012, answer due 10/30/2012. (Rounds, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Unwired Planet, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Unwired Planet, Inc., Corporate Parent Unwired Planet IP Holdings, Inc. for Unwired Planet, LLC added.. (Yowell, Adam)
September 20, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple, Inc. re 1 Complaint. (HJ)
September 20, 2012 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (HJ)
September 20, 2012 Case assigned to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (WJ)
September 20, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Pierre Hubert to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 11/4/2012.(no image attached) (WJ)
September 20, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Kevin Burgess to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 11/4/2012.(no image attached) (WJ)
September 20, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Theodore Stevenson III to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 11/4/2012.(no image attached) (WJ)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2527930), filed by Unwired Planet, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/29/2012. Proof of service due by 1/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons) (Rounds, Michael) Modified on 9/20/2012 to reflect that Summons was issued on 9/20/2012 (HJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unwired Planet, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet, LLC
Represented By: Mario A. Apreotesi
Represented By: Kevin L. Burgess
Represented By: John B Campbell
Represented By: Ryan James Cudnik
Represented By: John F. Garvish, III
Represented By: Pierre J. Hubert
Represented By: Kevin Kneupper
Represented By: Warren Lipschitz
Represented By: Mieke K Malmberg
Represented By: Nicholas Mathews
Represented By: Ashley N. Moore
Represented By: James E. Quigley
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: John Shumaker
Represented By: Mitchell Sibley
Represented By: David Sochia
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Adam K Yowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Jonathan W. Fountain
Represented By: Yu-Chieh E Hsin
Represented By: Steven Kalogeras
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: H. Mark Lyon
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Stuart M Rosenberg
Represented By: Brooke M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?