Broffman, M.D. v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Broffman, M.D.
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and Unum Group
Case Number: 4:2013cv04922
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2015 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/11/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
May 6, 2015 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MISTRIAL AND STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/6/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 5, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/5/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 4, 2015 218 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/4/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 23, 2015 182 Opinion or Order of the Court VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/23/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 15, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 149 Letter filed by Unum Group, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/15/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
February 20, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE LATE-DISCLOSED WITNESSES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/20/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
January 27, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 90 Statement/ Application for Relief from Personal Attendance Requirement of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Jeffery Broffman, M.D.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
May 23, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broffman, M.D. v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Broffman, M.D.
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?