Adamson v. City of San Francisco et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Lorenzo Adamson, an off-duty, African-American police officer for the City of San Francisco, alleged that Defendants SF Police Officers Brian Stansbury, Daniel Dudley and Christopher O'Brien violated his civil rights by unlawfully choking and arresting him. When the three officers stopped plaintiff for a traffic violation, Officer Stansbury asked plaintiff if he was on parole, instead of asking for his license and insurance. Officer Dudley then asked plaintiff to exit the car and lead him to the curb. Even though plaintiff identified himself as a police officer, Officer Dudley applied a carotid chokehold on plaintiff, causing him to fall to the ground.

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Adamson
Defendant: City of San Francisco, Greg Suhr, Christopher O'Brien, Daniel Dudley and Brian Stansbury
Case Number: 4:2013cv05233
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lorenzo Adamson (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/4/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/7/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER:The parties shall participate in a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley within 90 days, or as soon thereafter as is convenient to Judge Corley. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2016 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (5 days) set for 8/8/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/15. (Attachments: # 1 Trial Exhibit Markers)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 15, 2015 Filing 183 Letter from Plaintiff Regarding Trial Dates and ADR preferences. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 182 CLERK'S NOTICE: On 11/19/15, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint letter within 2 weeks setting forth their preference re: ADR referral and potential trial dates. As of today, the Court has not received the joint letter. Parties must file the joint letter by no later than 12/15/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Denying O'Brien's Rule 50(a) Motion. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/7/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 178 Transcript of excerpt of rule 50 Proceedings held on 11-17-15, before Judge Donna Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order - Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2016. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 20, 2015 Exhibit Location: Plaintiff and Defendants exhibits located on shelf B-2. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 180 Jury Notes. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 179 Exhibit and Witness List. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 177 JURY VERDICT. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further jury deliberations held. Jury reached verdict as to Defendants Daniel Dudley and Brian Stansbury. Jury did not reach a unanimous verdict as to Defendant Christopher O'Brien. Within two weeks, the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth their preference re: ADR referral and potential trial dates. Defendants' Rule 50(a) motion as to Defendants Daniel Dudley and Brian Stansbury, motion denied as moot; Defendants' Rule 50(a) motion as to Defendant Christopher O'Brien, motion taken under submission. Jury Trial completed on 11/19/2015. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Jury Trial held on 11/18/2015. Plaintiff's closing argument. Defendants' closing argument. Plaintiff's rebuttal. Jury began their deliberations. Further Jury deliberations set for 11/19/2015 09:00 AM. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 173 Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/17/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015) Modified on 11/18/2015 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2015 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Jury Trial held on 11/17/2015. Defendants' Rule 50 motion, motion taken under submission. Court gave the final Jury Instructions to the Jury. Further Jury Trial set for 11/18/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Jury Trial held on 11/16/2015. Plaintiff voluntary dismissed his Bane and Ralph Act claims. Further Jury Trial set for 11/17/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 171 Amended [Proposed] Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/16/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 170 Transcript of excerpt of Proceedings held on 11-12-15, before Judge Donna Ryu. Court reporter r/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 169 Amended Proposed Final Jury Instructions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 168 DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE CALIFORNIA PENAL CODE SECTION 835a, ELEMENTS OF SECTION 52.1 CAUSE OF ACTION, AND AVAILABLE DAMAGES UNDER 52.1 filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Filing 166 Brief Re: Section 51.7 and State Immunities filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 165 Brief Re: Section 52.1 and Civil Penalties filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Jury Trial held on 11/13/2015. Further Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Charging Conference held on 11/13/2015.Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 162 *** FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT 170 . *** Transcript of EXCERPT OF Proceedings held on 11-12-15, before Judge Donna Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2016. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2015 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Jury Trial held and continued on 11/12/2015. Further Jury Trial set for 11/13/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2015)
November 12, 2015 Filing 161 Proposed Verdict Form. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 12, 2015 Filing 160 Proposed Final Jury Instructions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 158 Transcript of excerpt of Proceedings held on 11-10-15, before Judge Donna Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2016. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Jury Trial held and continued on 11/10/2015. Further Jury Trial set for 11/12/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 157 Transcript excerpt of opening by Mr. Lacy of Proceedings held on 11-9-15, before Judge Donna Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Jury Selection held on 11/9/2015. Jury Trial began on 11/9/2015. Further Jury Trial set for 11/10/2015 08:30 AM (with Counsel) and 09:00 AM (with Jury) before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Jury Trial Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 155 RESPONSE to re 149 Brief DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS BRIEF RE CAL. CIV. CODE § 51.7, CAL. CIV. CODE 52.1 AND 42 USC § 1983 by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/6/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 153 RESPONSE (re 147 Eighth MOTION in Limine ) filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2015 Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/5/2015. Court's Pretrial Conference Order to follow will reflect all of the Court's pretrial rulings. Court Reporter Name Katherine Wyatt. Attachment Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 151 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE REGARDING FAILURE OF ADAMSON TO IDENTIFY HIMSELF AS AN OFFICER filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/5/2015) Modified on 11/6/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2015 Filing 150 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. Counsel shall raise any objections to these proposed preliminary jury instructions on November 9, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/5/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 149 BRIEF REGARDING § 1983, CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE § 52.1, AND CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE § 51.7 filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Related document(s) 134 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/5/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2015 Filing 148 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSION RE DANESHIA ADAMSON filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/5/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2015 Filing 147 Eighth MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 11/18/2015. Replies due by 11/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 146 JOINT SUBMISSION RE STATEMENT OF CASE AND STATEMENT RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 145 Brief re 137 Order Regarding Mrs. Adamson Testimony at Trial filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 137 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 144 REPLY BRIEF re 139 Brief RE: PLAINTIFS OTHER POLICE ENCOUNTERS filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Related document(s) 139 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 143 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE NON-DISCLOSED TREATING PHYSICIANS filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 142 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE LOST WAGES AND PROOF THAT THE CRIMINAL PROSECUTION WAS BASED ON MISREPRESENTATION OF FACTS filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/3/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2015 Filing 141 Brief filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Related document(s) 134 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2015 Filing 140 Brief re 138 Order, re: Defendants MIL 5 & 6 filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Related document(s) 138 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 139 Brief RE PLAINTIFFS OTHER POLICE ENCOUNTERS filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Correcting Deadline for Supplemental Submissions in Minute Order 134 . The minute order incorrectly stated that Plaintiff's brief regarding his claim for lost wages under the Ralph Act is due on November 4, 2015. As stated at the hearing, Plaintiff must submit his brief by November 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Re Supplemental Submission Regarding Mrs. Adamson. Plaintiff shall file the supplemental submission regarding Mrs. Adamson by 5 p.m. on November 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 136 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 133 Motion allowing specific equipment, food and drink through security for trial.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION ALLOWING EQUIPMENT THROUGH SECURITY filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 11/4/2015. Replies due by 11/6/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Pretrial Conference held on 10/29/2015. Hearing on Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions in Limine held. See minute Order for all particulars. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2015 09:00 AM.Court Reporter Name: Katherine Wyatt. FTR Time 1:42-4:41 and 4:44-5:14. Attachment Civil Pretrila Minute Order.(igS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Gary Knox as co-counsel for plaintiff Adamson (Knox, Randall) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 131 OBJECTIONS to re 126 Exhibit List by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2015 Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE Per the court's order on October 20, 2015 [Docket No. 123], Defendants were to file any objections to Plaintiff's amended exhibit list by 9 a.m. today, October 27, 2015. If the court does not receive any objections by 5:00 p.m. today, the court will assume that the Defendants do not object to any of Plaintiff's exhibits. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 27, 2015 Filing 129 SECOND AMENDED Witness List by Lorenzo Adamson . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2015 Filing 128 AMENDED Witness List by Lorenzo Adamson . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/27/2015) Modified on 10/28/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2015 Filing 127 TRIAL BRIEF by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 21, 2015 Filing 126 Proposed Exhibit List by Lorenzo Adamson.. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/21/2015) Modified on 10/22/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2015 Filing 125 TRIAL BRIEF by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re Subpoena to SFFD-EMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/21/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER to Submit Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/20/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 122 RESPONSE to re 80 Exhibit List by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2015 Filing 121 RESPONSE to re 89 Seventh MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 120 RESPONSE to re 88 Sixth MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 119 RESPONSE to re 87 Fifth MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 118 RESPONSE to re 86 Fourth MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 117 RESPONSE to re 85 Third MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 116 RESPONSE to re 84 Second MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 115 RESPONSE to re 83 First MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 114 OBJECTIONS to re 81 Proposed Form of Verdict PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORM by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 113 OBJECTIONS to re 79 Proposed Jury Instructions PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 112 OBJECTIONS to re 77 Pretrial Conference Statement PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' WITNESS LIST by Lorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 111 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 98 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE: The 12/2/2014 Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial 39 ordered the parties to file trial briefs by 10/9/2015, but no trial briefs have been filed. The parties shall file trial briefs by no later than 10/21/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 109 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7, MEDICAL SCREENING CARD filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 108 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE CONCLUSIONS OF DEFENDANTS POLICE PRACTICES EXPERT CAMERON filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 107 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE STATEMENTS MADE BY OFFICER ADAMSON TO INTERNAL AFFAIRS filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE OTHER INSTANCES OF OFFICER ADAMSONS ENCOUNTERS WITH POLICE filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 105 OBJECTIONS to re 92 Exhibit List DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED WITNESSES by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 104 OBJECTIONS to DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED WITNESSES by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 103 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INTERNAL AFFAIRS ALLEGATIONS AND INVESTIGATION filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 102 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE INVESTIGATION AND INTERNAL INVESTIGATION MEMORANDA filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 101 RESPONSE (re 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 ) DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE OTHER INSTANCES WHEN PLAINTIFF DROVE WITH NO PLATES filed byDaniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 100 OBJECTIONS to re 94 Proposed Form of Verdict DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 99 OBJECTIONS to re 95 Proposed Jury Instructions DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 98 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 12, 2015 Filing 97 ERRATA re 91 Exhibits RE EXPERT QUALIFICATION & EXPERIENCE by Lorenzo Adamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/12/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 96 MOTION in Limine 1-7 filed by Lorenzo Adamson. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/19/2015. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 95 Plaintiff's Separate Proposed Jury Instructions by Lorenzo Adamson . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2015 Filing 94 Proposed Form of Verdict by Lorenzo Adamson . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 93 Proposed Voir Dire by Lorenzo Adamson . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 92 Exhibit List [Proposed] by Lorenzo Adamson.. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 91 EXHIBITS RE EXPERT QUALIFICATION & EXPERIENCE filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5)(Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 90 Proposed Voir Dire by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury . (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 89 Seventh MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 88 Sixth MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 87 Fifth MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 86 Fourth MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 85 Third MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 84 Second MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 83 First MOTION in Limine filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 10/30/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 82 DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT RE EXPERT QUALIFICATIONS filed by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2015 Filing 81 Proposed Form of Verdict by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury . (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 80 Trial Exhibits by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury.. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2015 Filing 79 DEFENDANTS SEPARATE PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2015 Filing 78 Proposed Jury Instructions by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury . (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 77 Pretrial Conference Statement by Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury . (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David Lipton (Lipton, Mark) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are directed to use the attached format for trial exhibit markers in connection with their upcoming pretrial submissions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015) Modified on 10/2/2015 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 15, 2015 Filing 73 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Pretrial Conference currently set for 10/28/2015 03:00 PM has been rescheduled to 10/29/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/10/2015. Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2015 re 58 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion taken under submission. Court's written Order to follow. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Attachment Civil Law & Motion and Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 71 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr, Lorenzo Adamson. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 9/3/2015) Modified on 9/4/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 Filing 70 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 69 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO DISCLOSE EXPERTS AND CONDUCT EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 68 Supplemental Declaration of MARGARET W. BAUMGARTNER in Support of 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 58 ) (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/27/2015) Modified on 8/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2015 Filing 67 REPLY (re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 66 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lorenzo Adamson. Amendment to 65 Declaration in Support, . (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 65 Declaration of DeWitt M. Lacy in Support of 64 Opposition/Response to Motion For Summary Judgment filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 64 RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 63 EXHIBIT E MANUALLY FILED re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Related document(s) 58 ) (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr re 60 Declaration in Support, DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 59 , 60 , 58 ) (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2015) Modified on 8/7/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2015 Filing 60 Declaration of MARGARET W. BAUMGARTNER in Support of 59 Brief, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 59 , 58 ) (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 59 Brief re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/20/2015. Replies due by 8/27/2015. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Further Case Management Conference previously scheduled for August 13, 2015 is continued to September 10, 2015 at 11:00 AM (to coincide with the last date to hear dispositive motions), with an Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by September 3, 2015.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR HEARING DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Deadline extended to September 10, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/13/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND CONSTRUING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES AS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/08/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 54 Letter from MARGARET W. BAUMGARTNER . (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE: Having reviewed the parties' 6/25/2015 joint updated case management statement, it does not appear that the 7/1/2015 01:30 PM Further Case Management Conference is necessary at this time. If any party believes that a conference would be beneficial, the party shall notify the court by calling Ivy Garcia at 510-637-3639 by no later than 12:00 pm on 6/29/2015. If no calls are received, the 7/1/2015 01:30 PM Further Case Management Conference will be vacated and continued to 8/13/2015 11:00 AM (to coincide with the hearing of the Motion) with Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 8/6/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE: Having reviewed the parties' 5/22/2015 joint updated case management statement, it does not appear that the 5/27/2015 01:30 PM Further Case Management Conference is necessary at this time. If any party believes that a conference would be beneficial, the party shall notify the court by calling Ivy Garcia at 510-637-3639 by no later than 9:00 am on 5/27/2015. If no calls are received, the 5/27/2015 01:30 PM Further Case Management Conference will be vacated and continued to 7/1/2015 01:30 p.m. with Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 6/24/2015.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr., Lorenzo Adamson (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 5/22/2015) Modified on 5/26/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2015 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE: Having reviewed the parties' 4/2/2015 joint updated case management statement, it does not appear that the 4/8/2015 Further Case Management Conference is necessary at this time. If any party believes that a conference would be beneficial, the party shall notify the court by calling Ivy Garcia at 510-637-3639 by no later than 9:00 am on 4/7/2015. If no calls are received, the 4/8/2015 Further Case Management Conference will be vacated and continued to 5/27/2015 01:30 p.m. with Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 5/20/2015. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 48 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Lorenzo Adamson, Greg Suhr, Brian Stansbury, Christopher O'Brien, Daniel Dudley. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 4/2/2015) Modified on 4/3/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2015 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2015. Case did not settle. Plaintiff to call Court after April 14 to discuss a further settlement conference. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorney: John Burris; DeWitt Lacy. Defendant Attorneys: Margaret Baumgartner; Newton Oldfather. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2015) Modified on 3/17/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER EXCUSING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/4/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 45 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 44 Stipulation AS MODIFIED.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 3/2/2015) Modified on 3/3/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2015 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE: Having reviewed the parties' 2/18/2015 joint updated case management statement, it does not appear that the 2/25/2015 Further Case Management Conference is necessary at this time. If any party believes that a conference would be beneficial, the party shall notify the court by calling Ivy Garcia at 510-637-3639 by no later than 9:00 am on 2/25/2015. If no calls are received, the 2/25/2015 Case Management Conference will be vacated and continued to 4/8/2015 01:30 p.m. with Updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 4/1/2015. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lorenzo Adamson, Greg Suhr, Brian Stansbury, Christopher O'Brien, Daniel Dudley, City of San Francisco. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 2/18/2015) Modified on 2/19/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2015 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Settlement Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the settlement conference currently scheduled for February 4, 2015 is continued to March 17, 2015 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The settlement conference order (Dkt. No. 34) issued on October 10, 2014 shall remain in effect. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING DOE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/17/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial (10 days) set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Discovery due by 6/27/2015. See Court's Order for all other dates set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/2/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/5/2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Pretrial Dates filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 12/1/2014) Modified on 12/2/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/2/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2014 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Deadline for amending the pleadings to name Doe Defendants is 11/12/2014. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2015 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2015 03:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording 2:34-2:46) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/9/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Margaret W. Baumgartner (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/1/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff's counsel established good cause for non-appearance. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2014 01:30 PM. (FTR Recording: 1:34-1:37) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr, Lorenzo Adamson. (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2014 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/11/2014. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Lorenzo Adamson. (Burris, John) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Margaret W. Baumgartner (Baumgartner, Margaret) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/21/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties and counsel of record that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu has amended her General Standing Order. Effective immediately, all parties shall follow Judge Ryu's revised General Standing Order which can be found on the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Order Setting Settlement Conference, the Settlement Conference scheduled for July 8, 2014 is herby VACATED. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/30/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 23 Stipulation.The case is stayed until the resolution of the criminal case against Plaintiff. The case management conference scheduled for June 25, 2014 is vacated. The parties shall file a status update within one week of the resolution of Plaintiff's criminal case.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PENDING LITIGATION AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lorenzo Adamson. (Burris, John) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for June 25, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., is continued to June 25, 2014, at 3:00 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Please check the public calendar the day before for courtroom designation. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/7/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial (estimated 10 days) set for 7/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. See Order for all other dates set by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/20/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 19 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference HELD on 2/19/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, CASE REFERRED to a randomly-assigned Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference which shall be held in June or July 2014. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2014 01:30 PM. Last day to hear dispositive motions on 4/23/2015 11:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2015 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated 10 days) set for 7/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Recording 2:22-2:40) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr, Lorenzo Adamson. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/13/2014 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 2/5/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD:Due to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's Jury Trial on a Civil matter set on the week of 2/10/2014, the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 2/12/2014 01:30 PM has been CONTINUED to 2/19/2014 01:30 p.m. The Case Management Statement is due no later than 2/12/2014. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (ig, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 16 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, February 5, 2014 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) re 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options re document 13 ) (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr.. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by City of San Francisco. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lorenzo Adamson.. (Lacy, DeWitt) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorenzo Adamson. City of San Francisco served on 11/14/2013, answer due 12/5/2013; Daniel Dudley served on 11/14/2013, answer due 12/5/2013; Christopher O'Brien served on 11/14/2013, answer due 12/5/2013; Brian Stansbury served on 11/14/2013, answer due 12/5/2013; Greg Suhr served on 11/14/2013, answer due 12/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Burris, John) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2014 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (gmS, ) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, John) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of San Francisco, Daniel Dudley, Christopher O'Brien, Brian Stansbury, Greg Suhr ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8151803.). Filed byLorenzo Adamson. (Burris, John) (Filed on 11/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stansbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Adamson
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?