Finjan, Inc. v. Proofpoint, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Proofpoint, Inc. and Armorize Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv05808
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 478 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 473 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 464 STIPULATION VACATING DATES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING REGARDING 430 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/16/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 432 Stipulation Regarding Replies in Support of Daubert Motions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 426 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 420 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Daubert Motions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. 396 STIPULATION Regarding Oppositions to Motions in Limine. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 381 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 349 Stipulation Regarding Opening Daubert Motions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ( 310 , 312 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Redacted Version of Order Filed Under Seal). (terminating 221 ; 223 228 ; 250 ; 257 ; 262 ; 310 ; 312 ) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL Re: 308 , 311 , 320 , 322 , 328 , 331 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 335 Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Deadlines.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE ( 208 , 244 , 260 )MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 292 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hillemann, Lauren). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Order by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 236 Finjan's Motion to Require Defendants' to Conform to the Court's November 14, 2014 Case Management Order and Strike Theories Not Disclosed in Invalidity Contentions. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINITFFS 235 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS RENEWED 149 MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 195 Motion to Strike. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/3/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 237 Unopposed Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing re 236 Finjan's Motion to Require Defendants' to Conform to the Court's November 14, 2014 Case Management Order and Strike Theories Not Disclosed in Invalidity Contentions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 206 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 204 Stipulation Extending Time for Expert Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 180 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 183 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 4. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 178 Stipulation Extending Time for Certain Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 140 Stipulation Granting Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 119 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 130 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cristina Martinez. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER re 109 Discovery Dispute Joint Report. No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/5/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REINSTATING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd terminating 86 plaintiff's Discovery Letter Brief; denying 87 plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 80 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document no later than 11/21/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/10/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman denying 63 Motion to Stay. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Claims Construction Tutorial set for 4/17/2015 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 05/08/2015 at 9:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/12/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/21/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re 38 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Finjan, Inc., 32 MOTION to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 31 filed by Finjan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Stipulation. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BENU WELLS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Proofpoint, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: Benu C. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proofpoint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armorize Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?