Hunt v. Continental Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Susan Hunt
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv05966
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2015 265 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 20, 2015 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 243 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 16, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (granting 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/13/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 26, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 217 Motion For USE OF EQUIPMENT for TRIAL (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 21, 2015 214 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/21/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 14, 2015 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT PRETRIAL FILING. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/14/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 16, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 14, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ( 124 , 141 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
August 31, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 134 STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 18, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2015; Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2015 02:00 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2015 03:00 PM. Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/18/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 24, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Amended Rule 26 Expert Report. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
May 29, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 82 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 83 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 99 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 112 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
April 28, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 87 REQUEST TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/28/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 3, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 53 MOTION TO COMPEL, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 63 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 62 MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 31, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures re 55 , 56 , 57 , 58 , 59 , 60 , 61 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/31/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 26, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 65 Motion to Shorten Time (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 25, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Motion to Shorten Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 12, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2015. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/12/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 6, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation Requesting Further CMC. (terminating 48 Stipulation, its a duplication of docket no. 47 (no attestation)). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
September 25, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION re 35 Letter Brief filed by Continental Casualty Company. Defendants may depose Hunt for an additional four hours. They should not repeat any topics on which she has already been deposed unless they have received discovery that was not produced at the time of the first day of her deposition that is relevant to an issue about which she has already been questioned. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/25/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
June 16, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 , Settlement Conference continued to 8/18/2014 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/16/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 1, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/01/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hunt
Represented By: Charles Michael Louderback
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Cassandra H. Carroll
Represented By: Richard Burk Lapp
Represented By: Camille Annette Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?