Winkfield v. Childrens Hospital Oakland et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Latasha Winkfield
Defendant: Childrens Hospital Oakland and David Durand
Case Number: 4:2013cv05993
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Before Opposing Party Serves An Answer or MSJ (FRCP 41), filed by Latasha Winkfield (Cutlip, Quinton) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/22/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 7, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/6/2014 Granting 14 Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/7/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 19 NOTICE of Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines re 9 Clerks Notice, filed by Latasha Winkfield (Cutlip, Quinton) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 12 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS MOOT AND VACATING MOTION HEARING (terminating 2 Motion for TRO). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 16 STATUS REPORT by Childrens Hospital Oakland. (Straus, Douglas) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 3, 2014 17 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, in which parties entered into confidential agreements. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2014 15 Memorandum in Opposition re 12 Motion to Compel Further Life Support and the Installation of the Tracheostomy tube and gastric feeding tube to allow transportation of Jahi McMath, filed by Childrens Hospital Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Gospe, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Petru, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Durand, # 4 Declaration of Dr. Flori, # 5 Declaration of Dr. Flori (Supplemental))(Straus, Douglas) (Filed on 1/3/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2014 14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Childrens Hospital Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted) to Declaration of Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted) to Declaration of Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted) to Declaration of Counsel in Support of Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Records Under Seal)(Straus, Douglas) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 13 Featured Case ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The court has reviewed Defendant's confidential settlement letter. It appears that Defendant will be represented by someone other than lead trial counsel at the January 3, 2014 emergency settlement conference. The court's order dated January 2, 2014 11 specified that lead trial counsel must appear. The court expects that lead counsel Douglas C. Straus will be present on behalf of Defendant at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 12 MOTION to Compel Further Life Support and the Installation of the Tracheostomy tube and gastric feeding tube to allow transportation of Jahi McMath filed by Latasha Winkfield. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/16/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cutlip, Quinton) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 11 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 10 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Settlement. Settlement Conference set for 1/3/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 31, 2013 9 CLERKS NOTICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 31, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER Motions due by 1/2/2014; Replies due by 1/4/2014; Responses due by 1/3/2014; Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/7/2014 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/31/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2014 at 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Childrens Hospital Oakland. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER DEFERRING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 2 APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Responses due by 1/2/2014. Replies due by 1/3/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2014 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 4 DECLARATION of Douglas C. Straus in Opposition to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byChildrens Hospital Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3)(Related document(s) 2 ) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 3 RESPONSE (re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byChildrens Hospital Oakland. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Received Proposed Order re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Latasha Winkfield. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Latasha Winkfield. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Childrens Hospital Oakland, David Durand (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #44611011166). Filed byLatasha Winkfield. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkfield v. Childrens Hospital Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Winkfield
Represented By: Quinton Blair Cutlip
Represented By: Christopher B. Dolan
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childrens Hospital Oakland
Represented By: Douglas C. Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Durand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?