Illumination Dynamics Co., LTD. v. Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Illumination Dynamics Co., LTD.
Defendant: Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C. and Bill Zhang
Case Number: 4:2014cv00078
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND COURTS ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 114 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REFERRING ACTION FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/02/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Extending Time to File Motion to Reopen. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/06/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/14/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting Continuance of Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Settlement Conference is continued to 8/7/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Removing Improperly Filed Document by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE RELEASE OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/15/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/23/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED ORDER Re: Stipulation to Modify Pretrial Schedule. Fact Discovery cut-off is extended to 3/31/2015. Expert Disclosures due by 3/31/2015. Expert Rebuttals due by 4/21/2015. Expert Discovery cut-off is extended to 5/18/2015. Law and Motion c ut-off is 6/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2015 01:00 PM. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/19/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/6/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING DEFENDANTS 80 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 50 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge 8/8/2014 Granting 67 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Serge Tomassian for Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C.. Attorney Scott Lawrence Baker and Yuval Mordechai Rogson terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 63 Stipulation Re Filing a Second Amended Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION For Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge: Responses due by 4/22/2014; Replies due by 4/25/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/15/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER STRIKING NON-COMPLIANT 47 MOTION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/14/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 42 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING 31 MOTION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/25/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown ArmstrongGranting 28 Stipulation RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (terminating 25 Motion to Dismiss). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 20 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re 17 Stipulation To Extend Time for Defendant Pacific Lighint to Respond to Complaint filed by Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/3/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WRIT of Attachment issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illumination Dynamics Co., LTD. v. Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illumination Dynamics Co., LTD.
Represented By: Jack William Schwartz, Jr.
Represented By: Jimmie Lett Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Lighting Solutions L.L.C.
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?