Surzyn v. Diamond Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dominika Surzyn
Defendant: Diamond Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00136
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADMINSTRATIVELY CLOSING ACTION. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/10/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION Staying Case. Case stayed. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2015; Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2015 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING DEFENDANTS 15 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 25 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 12 Stipulation CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surzyn v. Diamond Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominika Surzyn
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?