Righetti v. Authority Tax Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Hope Righetti
Defendant: Authority Tax Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00146
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AND RESETTING CMC. re 52 Proposed Order filed by Hope Righetti. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 6/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ALLOWING CHARLES JONES TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 44 Case Management Statement filed by Hope Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE BY PHONE re 37 Proposed Order filed by Hope Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - CORRECTED Order Re 31 Order Granting Stipulated Request to Vacate Early Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/2014. Hearing on Motion to Withdraw and CMC remain on calendar for 10/16/2014 01:30 PM. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER. CASE WAS REFERRED TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT 5/15/14 CMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014) Modified on 5/19/2014 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righetti v. Authority Tax Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Righetti
Represented By: Charles Aubrey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authority Tax Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?