Hatamian et al v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Babak Hatamian and Lussu Dennj Salvatore
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Rory P. Read, Thomas J. Seifert and Lisa T. Su
Case Number: 4:2014cv00226
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 367 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES, PAYMENT OF EXPENSES, AND PAYMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES' EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 332 Motion Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Approving Form and Manner of Notice and Setting Date for Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set 2/27/2018 at 2:00PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER EXTENDING LOCAL RULE 37-3 DEADLINE AS TO CERTAIN DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/19/2016.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE PERTAINING TO NUMBER OF DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/16/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 182 , 190 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/6/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ( 185 Letter filed by KBC Asset Management NV ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/13/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 143 Motion to Certify Class.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 170 Stipulation to Stay Without Prejudice (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION re 164 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by KBC Asset Management NV, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/16/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY MATERIALS [MODIFED BY THE COURT AT 6.3]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL re 149 Letter from Defendants requesting discovery relief filed by Richard A. Bergman, Thomas J. Seifert, Rory P. Read, Lisa T. Su, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/24/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING SET FOR 7/10/15 AT 9:01AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 127 Proposed Order filed by Richard A. Bergman, Thomas J. Seifert, Rory P. Read, Lisa T. Su, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 127 Proposed Order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2016. Non-Ex pert Discovery due by 6/15/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2016. Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due by 11/17/2016. Replies due by 2/16/2017. Responses due by 1/16/2017. Compliance Hearing re name of private mediator Conference set for 7/10/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 125 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 66 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 70 Motion to Strike (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. James Donato no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/16/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REQUIRING PREPARATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL CHART. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/5/14. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatamian et al v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babak Hatamian
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lussu Dennj Salvatore
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory P. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa T. Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?