Barrilleaux v. Mendicino County et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Barrilleaux
Defendant: Mendocino County, Mendocino County Superior Court, State of California and Judicial Council of California/Administrative Office of the Courts
Case Number: 4:2014cv01373
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/1/2018. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 166 Motion for Summary Judgment and 197 Motion for Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2018. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 01:30 PM. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 135 County of Mendocino's administration motion to postpone deposition. Briefing schedule on 136 County of Mendocino's motion for summary judgment is stayed, pending withdrawal or stipulated revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 : Replies due by 8/5/2016. Responses due by 7/22/2016. Motion Hearing re 99 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 8/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Opposition due 7/22/2016; Reply due 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/12/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 74 81 Motions to Strike. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re: 62 Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses. Briefing deadlines are suspended, and hearing date is vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/23/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from General Order 56. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/09/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff shall file Notice of Need for Mediation by 10/23/14, if necessary. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/30/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses and ORDER requiring declarations re: General Order 56. Declarations and, if appropriate, stipulation and proposed order due by 09/29/14. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/17/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014).
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/31/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrilleaux v. Mendicino County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Barrilleaux
Represented By: Catherine M. Cabalo
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Represented By: Jim W. Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Council of California/Administrative Office of the Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?