Smith v. Hoffman

Plaintiff: Thomas E. Smith
Defendant: Brad Hoffman, Lia Russell, Billy Harville, Juana Garcia, Nohemi Castenda-Martinez, Jamie Ott and Sonoma County Human Services Department/Family Youth and Children's Services
Case Number: 4:2014cv01741
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Motions terminated: 74 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;Declaration of Thomas A. Moore in support filed by Thomas E. Smith. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/30/2017 09:30 AM.The attached order grants Mr. Moore's motion to withdraw, directs him to continue accepting service on behalf of Mr. Smith and to serve him with all filings and file proof of service, directs him to serve Mr. Smith with the attached order and file proof of service, and sets a hearing for 11/30/2017 at 9:30 a.m. At the hearing, Mr. Smith must appear. If he does not, he risks dismissal of his case for failure to prosecute it. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
September 15, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The court orders Mr. Smith and his counsel to appear in person on October 5, 2017, at 9:30 a.m., and show cause why the court should not dismiss the case for failure to prosecute it. They must respond in writing to this ord er no later than September 28, 2017. The court warns Mr. Smith that his failure to participate in his litigation may result in dismissal of his case for failure to prosecute it and entry of judgment in favor of the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on September 15, 2017. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
July 13, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court directs Mr. Smith to file and serve a first amended complaint no later than August 31, 2015. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/13/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
June 29, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER (1) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND (2) CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/29/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
April 16, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) EXTENDING THE DEADLINES FOR THE FILING AND SERVICE OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff's counsel shall file and serve the First Amended Complaint by June 1, 2015. The court c ontinues the April 23, 2015 case management conference to July 2, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15h Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/15/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
March 19, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE FILED AND SERVED BY APRIL 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/19/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 9, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND (2) CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court now orders Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismis sed for failure to prosecute. By March 12, 2015, Plaintiff shall explain, in writing, why he has not filed an amended complaint and why he has not either perfected service or requested entry of Defendants' default. In light of this order, the court also continues the case management conference from March 19, 2015 to April 23, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/9/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Smith
Represented By: Thomas Allen Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lia Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Harville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nohemi Castenda-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Human Services Department/Family Youth and Children's Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?