Johnson v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Johnson
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv01964
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/01/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE Continued Harrassment by Ronald Johnson (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Johnson. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) Modified on 6/23/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2014 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Filed byRonald Johnson. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing complaint with leave to amend. Amended complaint due 6/16/14.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Johnson.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2014 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 4/30/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/30/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on April 30, 2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/30/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Johnson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed by Ronald Johnson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2014: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?