Kozlow v. Hangtime, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Kozlow
Defendant: Hangtime, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv02249
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation filed by Hangtime, Inc., Emily Kozlow, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/7/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 2/27/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 2/17/15.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/9/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER IN ADVANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Westmore for Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Spero for mandatory Settlement Conference to be held 3/19/15. Order to Show Cause re failure to comply with Court's Case Management and Pretrial Order to be heard 2/9/2015 at 2:00pm at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/28/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/21/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlow v. Hangtime, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Kozlow
Represented By: Phillip Andrew Bock
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doherty
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: James Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hangtime, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?