Richard Dent, et al v. National Football League

Plaintiff: Richard Dent, Jeremy Newberry, Roy Green, JD Hill, Keith Van Horne, Ron Stone, Ron Pritchard, James McMahon and Marcellus Wiley
Defendant: National Football League
Case Number: 4:2014cv02324
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JUDGMENT (AMENDED). Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/18/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING 113 MOTION TO RELATE CASE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/31/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REQUEST FOR FURTHER STATEMENT FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/5/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REQUEST TO NFL FOR FURTHER SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/3/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL STATEMENT FROM THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PLAYERS ASSOCIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MODIFIED ORDER RE BRIEFING ON SUBMISSION OF THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE PLAYERS ASSOCIATION. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014).
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE 83 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014).
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on October 16, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Dent, et al v. National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dent
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Newberry
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Green
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Hill
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Van Horne
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Stone
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Pritchard
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McMahon
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Byrne
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Mel Tyrae Owens
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus Wiley
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Represented By: Steven D. Silverman
Represented By: William Nelson Sinclair
Represented By: Andrew G. Slutkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?