Lopez v. United Abrasives, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Idalia Lopez
Defendant: United Abrasives, Inc. and T.C. Service Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv02780
Filed: June 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Idalia Lopez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 5, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Estate of Ariel Munoz Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 6, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINORS' COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 30, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 53 Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise filed by Estate of Ariel Munoz Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 9, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER REGARDING 47 MOTION TO APPROVE MINORS' COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/2015. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 1, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINORS COMPROMISE (EX PARTE) filed by Estate of Ariel Munoz Garcia, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINORS COMPROMISE (EX PARTE). Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
April 27, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 allowing telephonic appearance filed by Estate of Ariel Munoz Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
February 12, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Stipulation filed by T.C. Service Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
October 29, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by T.C. Service Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 27, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by T.C. Service Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
September 12, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES re (12 in 3:14-cv-02840-EMC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by T.C. Service Company, Inc.. All future filings shall be filed under C14-2780 EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
August 7, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATED CASE (C-14-2840 RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/7/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. United Abrasives, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalia Lopez
Represented By: Fernando Fabela Chavez(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: William Hacking Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.C. Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Dollar(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nathaniel R Lucey
Represented By: Von Ryan Reyes(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?