Rebucas et al v. City of San Bruno et al
Plaintiff: Anne Rebucas, A. S., D. S. and The Estate of Ryan Salonga
Defendant: City of San Bruno and Andrew Harper
Case Number: 4:2014cv03313
Filed: July 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 Continue CMC filed by Anne Rebucas Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate Trial Date and all Related Trial Deadlines filed by Anne Rebucas. Trial and trial related deadlines vacated. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 CONTINUING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES to 3/31/2017. 3/9/2017 motion hearing vacated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 to Continue CMC filed by D. S., The Estate of Ryan Salonga, Anne Rebucas, A. S. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/3/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 44 Proposed Order filed by Anne Rebucas. Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/8/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 10/1/15 TO 1/21/16 filed by City of San Bruno, Andrew Harper Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC filed by D. S., The Estate of Ryan Salonga, Anne Rebucas, A. S. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebucas et al v. City of San Bruno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Rebucas
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. S.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ryan Salonga
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Bruno
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Harper
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?