Marcus et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uriel Marcus and Benedict Verceles
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv03824
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [denying 49 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/27/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE DISCOVERY ON SAFETY ISSUE AND RE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/16/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ADDITIONAL QUESTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/13/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ADDITIONAL QUESTION [re 60 REQUEST FOR THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING]. Responses due by NOON ON 3/16/2015. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/12/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING [re 49 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Uriel Marcus]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/2/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 11, 2014 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS TO JANUARY 8, 2015.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 36 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY OMAR ROSALES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 JOINT STIPULATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/9/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Kai S Bartolomeo
Represented By: Erin Hudson
Represented By: Rose S Lee
Represented By: William Michael Mills
Represented By: Edward Michael Rodriguez
Represented By: David M. Walsh
Represented By: David Michael Walsh, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Marcus
Represented By: Omar Weaver Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benedict Verceles
Represented By: Omar Weaver Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?