Mehr et al v. Federation Internationale de Football Association et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Mehr, Beata Ivanauskiene, Sarah Aranda, Kira Akka-Seidel and Karen Christine O'Donoghue
Defendant: Federation Internationale de Football Association, United States Soccer Federation, Inc., US Youth Soccer Association, Inc., National Association of Competitive Soccer Clubs, Inc., California Youth Soccer Association and American Youth Soccer Organization
Case Number: 4:2014cv03879
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion to Compel; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 52 Motion for Joinder; granting 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting 56 Motion to Dismiss; denying 57 Motion for Joinder; denying 82 Motion to Compel (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 101 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/17/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/8/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehr et al v. Federation Internationale de Football Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Mehr
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jon T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beata Ivanauskiene
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jon T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Aranda
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jon T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kira Akka-Seidel
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jon T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Christine O'Donoghue
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jon T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federation Internationale de Football Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Fredrick Sauer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Youth Soccer Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Competitive Soccer Clubs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Youth Soccer Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Youth Soccer Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?