Torres v. Hunter et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Torres
Defendant: Robert Hunter and Diamond Hunter
Case Number: 4:2014cv05347
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jesus Torres. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 29 Notice filed by Jesus Torres. Dismissal or statement due by 4/29/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO FILE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Notice of Settlement or Statement due by 3/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Torres
Represented By: Jason G. Gong
Represented By: Thomas Nelson Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?