Forto v. Capital One Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Simonette D Forto
Defendant: Capital One Bank, National Association and United Recovery Systems, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2014cv05611
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re: 56 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/5/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 56 Motion for Attorney Fees. URS' time keeping records due by 10/4/2017. Plaintiff's response due by 10/11/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James Donato on March 20, 2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brandon Carnes. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forto v. Capital One Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simonette D Forto
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Recovery Systems, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?