Turner v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Defendant: G. D. Lewis, Montanez, Staint Lois and R. Butcher
Case Number: 4:2015cv00078
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: PSLC RMH
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Request for Special Status Conference filed by Montanez, Lafonzo R. Turner, Love. Status Conference set for 6/5/2018 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 5/31/2018. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Montanez, Lafonzo R. Turner, Love.***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/2/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 121 Motion for Order of Unmonitored Phone Calls. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staint Lois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?