Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia v. Does 1-3
Plaintiff: Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Case Number: 4:2015cv00332
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 21 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Early Discovery. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/18/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 10 Ex Parte Application.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia v. Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kechara House Buddhist Association Malaysia
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Asa Hutchinson, III
Represented By: Stephanie Egner Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?