Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Light In The Box Limited
Plaintiff: |
Restoration Hardware, Inc. and RH US, LLC |
Defendant: |
Light In The Box Limited |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00924 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
County: |
Marin |
Presiding Judge: |
Kandis A. Westmore |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 501 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/7/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant's time to answer is extended to October 7, 2015. Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting 29 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/2 9/2015. Defendant LITB Holding Co.'s time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended from August 26, 2015, to and including September 9, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
|
July 24, 2015 |
Filing
28
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 27 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2015. Case Management Conference continued to 9/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 7/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
23
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 22 STIPULATION. Defendant LITB Holding Co.'s time to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended by thirty days, from June 26, 2015, to and including July 27, 2015. Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?