Phoenix Technologies Ltd. v. VMware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Phoenix Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv01414
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 510 WRIT of Execution issued against Phoenix Technologies Ltd. in the amount of $131, 978.99, issued to Santa Clara County (Sheriff). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER DIRECTING TAXATION OF COSTS Re Docket No. 503 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/29/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 497 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Defendant shall file an accounting and documentation of the costs of the trial transcripts, as directed in the Order, within seven days of the date of this Order.(hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 460 , 482 ) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS RENEWED 467 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AND DEFENDANTS 462 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 491 Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision in Support of VMware's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 479 Motion to Reschedule Hearing of VMware's 462 Motion for Attorneys Fees & Costs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 452 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 464 Stipulation REGARDING FILING OF VMWARE'S AMENDED BILL OF COSTS & PHOENIX'S OBJECTIONS.; Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2017; Objections due by 9/22/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/3/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER ON JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 27 REGARDING IMPUTATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/12/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 409 MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF CAROL HALLETT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Re 353 Errata re: Stipulation to Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/25/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 346 Stipulation REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 343 Joint Request Permitting Use of Equipment in the Courtroom. (terminating docket no. 339 in light of docket no. 343 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Parties Respective ( 183 , 185 , 190 , 191 , 192 , 291 , 293 ) Motions in Limine and Filings Regarding Various Pretrial Issues. (granting 314 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and denying 321 Motion to Strike )(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PHOENIXS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 4 & 5 RE 286 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE PARTIES ADMINISTRATIVE ( 181 , 182 , 230 , 247 , 279 , 280 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 276 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 248 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE PARTIES ADMINISTRATIVE ( 120 , 124 , 143 , 148 , 157 , 166 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 208 Stipulation RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES. (terminating 203 Stipulation RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 172 Ex Parte Application. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part 79 Motion to Compel.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re June 30, 2016 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/27/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 102 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Stipulation TO MODIFY CERTAIN EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 96 Joint Stipulation to Continue Certain Deadlines Relating to Fact Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Stipulation to Modify Expert Report Deadlines.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/8/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re January 28, 2016 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/15/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Stipulated Request FOR REFERRAL TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE CORLEY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Stipulation REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND ITS ANSWER TO PHOENIX TECHNOLOGIES LTD.'S COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 22 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/18/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Technologies Ltd. v. VMware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Pramode Chiruvolu
Represented By: Amy S. Park
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?