Weiss v. City of Santa Rosa Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Terry L Weiss
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa Police Department, Tom Schwedhelm, John Deadman, Kaiden Kemp and Andrew Romero
Case Number: 4:2015cv01639
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER SUBMISSION re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Tom Schwedhelm, Andrew Romero, John Deadman, Kaiden Kemp, City of Santa Rosa Police Department. Filing due by Noon on Friday, 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/28/18. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: OUTSTANDING MOTIONS. No further filings by either party will be permitted until the Court rules on the pending motions. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the striking of the filing. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re 110 , 111 In Camera Review of Plaintiff's Mental Health Records. The records do not require redaction, but are subject to the stipulated protective order. Defendants may retrieve the original records from the Oakland Clerk's Office between 9:00 AM and 4:00 PM within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/31/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding Defendants' 99 Discovery Letter Brief. Plaintiff shall furnish discovery responses by May 1, 2017, and pay the City of Santa Rosa $936.25 for failing to appear at her deposition by May 31, 2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 77 County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2017. Case Management Conference for plaintiff and remaining defendants in this action is set for Monday, 1/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss v. City of Santa Rosa Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa Police Department
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schwedhelm
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deadman
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiden Kemp
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Romero
Represented By: John Jeffrey Fritsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?