Sebastian Brown Productions LLC v. Muzooka Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sebastian Brown Productions LLC
Defendant: Muzooka Inc., Shawn Wilson, Chester Aldridge and Ivory Octaves LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv01720
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 108 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 114 Handal's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition; granting 119 Defendant's Motion to Continue Mediation Deadline; denying as moot 122 Handal's Ex Parte Application to Submit Communications for In Camera Review. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/6/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 92 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Reconsideration to Allege Newly Presented Facts. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/4/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/31/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 68 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
November 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/29/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Directing the Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebastian Brown Productions LLC v. Muzooka Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Brown Productions LLC
Represented By: Julia Heaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muzooka Inc.
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Wilson
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Aldridge
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivory Octaves LLC
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?