Perez et al v. John Muir Health
Plaintiff: Marlene Perez and Rosa Cerisano
Defendant: John Muir Health and John Muir Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2015cv01792
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re 99 , 100 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/30/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/29/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 95 Stipulation REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE (JUNE 24, 2016). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 84 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER REGARDING 71 MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 70 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 73 MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Reset Deadlines/Hearings Re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Responses due by 5/26/2016; Replies due by 6/2/2016; Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2016 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (10-day) set for 8/22/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/18/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 74 Motion to Shorten Time for Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Be Heard. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Discovery Order re: 67 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rosa Cerisano, Marlene Perez. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CORRECTED 64 ORDER Denying 63 MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/29/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 63 MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Discovery Order re: 61 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/15/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING 47 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES; 50 STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER TO ALLOW FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 43 Stipulation REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ****DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 41 .*** ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 38 Motion to Relate Case to 15-cv-4564-RS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/9/2015 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/29/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation Selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. John Muir Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Perez
Represented By: James Reed Rosen
Represented By: Joshua David Schein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Cerisano
Represented By: James Reed Rosen
Represented By: Joshua David Schein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Muir Health
Represented By: Michael D. Bruno
Represented By: Hieu Minh Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Muir Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?