Brickman v. Fitbit, Inc.
Plaintiff: James P Brickman
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02077
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 153 Motion for Summary Judgment, 154 Motion to Strike Expert Report. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/8/17. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re 130 Motion to Certify Class filed by James P. Brickman. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/20/17. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/4/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order re: 63 Motion to Dismiss entered by Hon. James Donato.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickman v. Fitbit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Brickman
Represented By: Frank A. Bartela
Represented By: Christopher Land
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By: Erin McCalmon Bosman
Represented By: James Webb Huston
Represented By: Julie Yongsun Park
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?