TracFone Wireless, Inc. v. LG Chemical Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Tracfone Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: LG Chemical Ltd., LG Chemical America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc, Hitachi Maxell, Ltd, Maxell Corporation of America, GS Yuasa Corporation, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation and Toshiba Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv02199
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST NEC CORPORATION re (2188 in 4:13-md-02420-YGR) re (75 in 4:15-cv-2199-YGR) Stipulation filed by TracFone Wireless Inc, NEC Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/21/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS UNDER FLORIDA LAW by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying (1017) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:13-md-02420-YGR; denying (25) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:15-cv-02199-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS UNDER FLORIDA LAW. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (1017 in 4:13-md-02420-YGR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss TracFone Wireless Inc.'s Claims Under Florida Law, (25 in 4:15-cv- 02199-YGR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss TracFone Wireless, Inc.'s Claims Under Florida Law. Motion Hearing set for Friday, 11/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/18/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS UNDER FLORIDA LAW.The 3/15/16 hearing date is VACATED. Supplemental filing by 3/15/2016. ***Deadlines terminated. (1017 in 4:13- md-02420-YGR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss TracFone Wireless Inc.'s Claims Under Florida Law filed by LG Chem America, Inc, Maxell Corporation of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Corporation, Sanyo North A merica Corporation, Hitachi Maxell, Ltd, Sony Corporation, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, NEC Tokin Corporation, Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, NEC Corporation, LG Chem Ltd., Samsung SDI Americ a Inc, (25 in 4:15-cv-02199-YGR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss TracFone Wireless, Inc.'s Claims Under Florida Law filed by LG Chemical Ltd., Maxell Corporation of America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation, Hitachi Maxell, Ltd, Sony Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sony Electronics Inc, LG Chemical America, Inc., NEC Corporation, Samsung SDI America Inc... Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/9/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT GS YUASA CORPORATION re (925 in 4:13-md-02420-YGR) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by TracFone Wireless Inc, (11 in 4:15-cv-02199-YGR) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tracfone Wireless, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/6/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TracFone Wireless, Inc. v. LG Chemical Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracfone Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chemical Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chemical America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Energy Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Maxell, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxell Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Yuasa Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Tokin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?