Lily Jeung et al v. Yelp Inc

Plaintiff: Lily Jeung, Amy Sayers and Darren Walchesky
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Mediator: Robert D Coviello
Case Number: 4:2015cv02228
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
August 13, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE, DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, AND DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
July 28, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES re 57 MOTION for Discovery Compel RFA Set One filed by Darren Walchesky, Lily Jeung, Amy Sayers. Responses/Opposition due by 8/3/2015. No reply brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/28/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
June 29, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING "EX PARTE" RELIEF, VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/29/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lily Jeung et al v. Yelp Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Jeung
Represented By: Daniel Alan Bernath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Sayers
Represented By: Daniel Alan Bernath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Walchesky
Represented By: Daniel Alan Bernath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Represented By: Adrianos Matthew Facchetti
Represented By: Aaron Schur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Robert D Coviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?