Bernstein et al v. Virgin America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia and Lisa Marie Smith
Defendant: Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Air Group and Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02277
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar Re Motion to Amend/Correct. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 12/29/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #447 MOTION to Amend the Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 454 US Supreme Court Notice that The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 30, 2022 Filing 453 REPLY (re #447 MOTION to Amend the Judgment ) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Judgment)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 16, 2022 Filing 452 Request for Judicial Notice re #447 MOTION to Amend the Judgment, #451 Opposition/Response to Motion to Amend the Judgment filed byAlaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #447 , #451 ) (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 16, 2022 Filing 451 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #447 MOTION to Amend the Judgment ) filed byAlaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valentin Estevez)(Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
May 27, 2022 Filing 450 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish t o be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 17, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #447 MOT ION to Amend/Correct The Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Related documents(s) #447 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Filing 449 Renotice motion hearing to Amend the Judgment filed byJulia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Filing 448 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file #447 Motion to Amend/Correct The Judgment. Hearing date of July 28, 2022, is vacated due to the date being listed as unavailable to further settings on Judge Tigar's calendar. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Judge's webpage on the Court's website regarding scheduling before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 26, 2022 Filing 447 MOTION to Amend the Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/9/2022. Replies due by 6/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 5/26/2022) Modified on 5/27/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAYDefendants' motion to stay this case pending resolution of their petition for certiorari to the United States Supreme Court, ECF No. 438, is denied. The Court finds that Defendants have failed to meet their burden of demonstrating that a stay would serve the orderly course of justice or that any party would suffer hardship or inequity if the case goes forward. See Lockyer v. Mirant Corp., 398 F.3d 1098, 1110 (9th Cir. 2005). Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion is due May 26, 2022; Defendants' summary judgment opposition is due June 16, 2022; and Plaintiffs' summary judgment reply is due June 30, 2022. See ECF No. 436. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 29, 2022 Filing 445 NOTICE of Change of Address by Monique Olivier Email (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #438 MOTION to Stay ; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 443 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish t o be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 20, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #438 MOTI ON to Stay ; Memorandum in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER RESCHEDULING THE HEARING FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #441 Stipulation.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 16, 2022 Filing 441 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #438 MOTION to Stay ; Memorandum in Support Thereof RESCHEDULING THE HEARING FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS filed by Alaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 4, 2022 Filing 440 REPLY (re #438 MOTION to Stay ; Memorandum in Support Thereof ) IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY filed byAlaska Air Group, Virgin America, Inc.. (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
February 25, 2022 Filing 439 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #438 MOTION to Stay ; Memorandum in Support Thereof ) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Stay)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 438 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/25/2022. Replies due by 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Stay)(Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Filing 437 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Marie Shirey for Plaintiffs and the Class (Shirey, Hannah) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #435 Stipulation Further Continuing the Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Stay the Proceedings. Motions due by 2/11/2022. Replies due by 3/4/2022. Responses due by 2/25/2022. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2022)
February 3, 2022 Filing 435 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Continuing the Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Setting the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Stay the Proceedings filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Markelov, Aleksandr) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER CONTINUING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #432 Stipulation. Motions due by 3/3/2022. Replies due by 4/14/2022. Responses due by 3/21/2022. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 433 Notice of Errata and Correction to Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing the Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Beckley, Maureen) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2021 Filing 432 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing the Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Beckley, Maureen) (Filed on 12/3/2021) Modified on 12/6/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2021 Filing 431 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2021. Hearing held via Zoom videoconference. Briefing schedule set. Opening Briefs due by 12/17/2021. Responses due by 1/14/2022. Replies due by 1/28/2022. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified b y the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 23, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Opening Reports due by 12/17/2021. Responses due by 1/ 14/2022. Replies due by 1/28/2022. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar.Total Time in Court: 21 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Monique Olivier. Defendant Attorney: Brendan Killeen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 430 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Beckley, Maureen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 429 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participatin g in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 8, 2021 at Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland , - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEAt the parties' request, ECF No. 427 at 3, the case management conference currently scheduled for September 21, 2021 is continued to October 12, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. An updated joint case management statement is due October 7, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 9/19/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 427 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 426 USCA Case Number 21-260 U.S. Supreme Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 425 Supreme Court of the United States Case Number 21-260 - Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed on August 19, 2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 424 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 20, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oak land, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS RELATING TO THE APPEALS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #421 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS RELATING TO THE APPEALS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #420 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 421 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Relating to The Appeals filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Killeen Decl. ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Enlarge Time Re: Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Relating to The Appeals)(Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 420 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees re Appeals filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 2021.08.11 Decl. of M. Olivier ISO Pl.'s Admin. Motion to Cont. Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees re Appeals, #2 Proposed Order 2021.08.11 [Proposed] Order Granting Pl.'s Admin. Motion to Cont. Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees re Appeals)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER of USCA as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 418 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Nicole Beckley (Beckley, Maureen) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER of USCA as to #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 416 MANDATE of USCA as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 415 MANDATE of USCA as to #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER and Amended Opinion of USCA: AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 413 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Robert Jon Hendricks (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Frederick (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER of USCA as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
March 25, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information to be in effect Re: #410 Notice (Other) filed by Lisa Marie Smith, Est her Garcia, Julia Bernstein (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 410 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND EMAIL ADDRESS by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith (Miller, James) (Filed on 3/25/2021) Modified on 3/26/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER and Amended Opinion of USCA - AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER of USCA - AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, Remanded for Further Proceedings as to #404 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., #370 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 26, 2020 Filing 407 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/1/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #406 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2020. (Related documents(s) #406 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 406 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/01/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 405 USCA Case Number 20-15186 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #404 Notice of Appeal, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 404 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-14162406 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 21, 2020 Order, #2 Exhibit B - Representation Statement)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER of USCA as to Case No. 19-15382. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #374 .(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
October 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information to be in effect Re: #401 Notice of Change of Address filed by Lisa Marie Smith, Esther Garcia, Julia Bernstein (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 401 NOTICE of Change of Address by James C. Shah (Shah, James) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 400 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses ) (Supplemental Opposition Brief) filed byAlaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 399 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct event is Supplemental Brief. The event can be found at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Oth er Supporting Documents > Supplemental Brief. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #397 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Julia Bernstein (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 398 Request for Judicial Notice re #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed byJulia Bernstein. (Related document(s) #374 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 397 Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Julia Bernstein, Lisa Marie Smith and Esther Garcia. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2019 Filing 396 STIPULATION re #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Julia Bernstein, Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., Lisa Marie Smith and Esther Garcia. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Supplemental Brief due by 8/16/2019. Responses due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 5, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019. Argument heard from parties. Motion taken under submission. Written order to issue. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Monique Olivier, Alison Kosinski. Defendant Attorney: Brendan Killeen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 393 Declaration of Josephine Bravata in Support of #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses (Declaration of Class Administrator re Notice) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Related document(s) #374 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Order for Approval of Class Notice Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #391 Stipulation. Motion for Attorneys' Fees Hearing set for 8/1/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 391 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for Approval of Class Notice Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 390 Supplemental Brief in Support of re #374 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Proposed Notice)(Related document(s) #374 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER re #374 REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 5/9/2019. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 26, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 388 Costs Taxed in the amount of $29,797.77 against Defendants. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 387 REPLY (re #374 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier ISO Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Supplemental))(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 386 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #374 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Brendan T. Killeen in Support of Opposition to Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses)(Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 385 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 10/18/2016; 12/13/2016; 02/27/2017; 05/18/2017; 07/27/2017; 01/29/2018; 03/08/2018; 08/01/2018; 08/15/2018; 11/01/2018; 12/13/2018 before Judge Judge Jon S. Tigar; Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, re #370 Notice of Appeal, #381 Transcript Designation Form Transcript due by 5/3/2019. (Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 384 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, (510) 367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #143 Transcript Order ) (Related documents(s) #143 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/1/2017) Modified on 4/3/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2019 Filing 383 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 18, 2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, (510) 367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #163 Transcript Order, #162 Transcript Order ) (Related documents(s) #163 , #162 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
April 3, 2019 Filing 382 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 13, 2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510)367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Tape Number: joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #118 Transcript Order ) (Related documents(s) #118 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
April 2, 2019 Filing 381 Transcript Designation Form (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 380 NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND ON APPEAL filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #378 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND TO CONTINUE STAY OF EXECUTION AND ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 378 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND TO CONTINUE STAY OF EXECUTION AND ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 377 *** DISREGARD - HEARINGS ARE NOT AVAILABLE FOR TRANSCRIPTION (NO AUDIO AVAILABLE OR COURT REPORTER PRESENT) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/26/2015, 10/30/2015, 12/18/2015 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #372 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment and Setting of Supersedeas Bond Amount; and to Extend Stay of Enforcement Pending Resolution of the Foregoing Issue filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 375 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to #374 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses. The briefing schedule for this motion is reset as follows per the #369 Order issued 2/15/2019: Responses due by 4/3/2019. Replies due by 4/17/2019. The hearing remains set for 5/9/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 374 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/27/2019. Replies due by 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Fees and Expenses, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Monique Olivier, #9 Declaration of Alison Kosinski in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Fees and Expenses, #10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alison Kosinski, #11 Declaration of James E. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Fees and Expenses, #12 Exhibit A to Declaration of James E. Miller)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 373 USCA Case Number 19-15382 for #370 Notice of Appeal filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 372 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment and Setting of Supersedeas Bond Amount; and to Extend Stay of Enforcement Pending Resolution of the Foregoing Issue filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Killeen, Brendan) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 371 BILL OF COSTS filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. Objections due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Supplement A, #(2) Supplement B)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 370 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc. - (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-13141388) (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A (Judgment), #(2) Exhibit B (Representation Statement))(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #368 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (1) EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE BILL OF COSTS; (2) SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AND SETTING OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AMOUNT filed by Julia Bernstein. Motions due by 3/13/2019. Responses due by 4/3/2019. Replies due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 368 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to (1) EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE BILL OF COSTS; (2) SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AND SETTING OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AMOUNT; AND (3) EXTEND STAY OF ENFORCEMENT PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE FOREGOING ISSUES filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 367 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 4, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 366 NOTICE OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part #343 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
December 19, 2018 Filing 363 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/13/2018, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #361 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2019. (Related documents(s) #361 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 362 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 361 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 360 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJulia Bernstein. (Related document(s) #343 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 359 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2018 re #343 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. FTR Time: 2:38 - 3:17 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #333 Motion for Sanctions. Request for fees and costs due by 11/16/2018. Objections due by 11/30/2018. Response due by 12/7/2018. Correction of Docket 345. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #356 Administrative Motion re #345 Order Granting Motion for Sanctions filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 356 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #345 Order Granting Motion for Sanctions filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Decl. of RJ Hendricks, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 355 REPLY (re #343 MOTION to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF) - Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 354 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5(D) in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Opposition of Defendants Virgin America Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5(D) to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain, #3 Exhibit Redacted, #4 Exhibit Unredacted)(Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 353 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #352 Opposition/Response to Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #352 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 352 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #343 MOTION to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF) filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of Opposition of Defendants Virgin America Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 10, 2018 Filing 351 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/1/18, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporterr until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #347 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2019. (Related documents(s) #347 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2018)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc.; #349 RESPONSE to re 346 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 9, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 349 RESPONSE to re #346 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Exhibit B to Declaration of Laura Crisp Under Seal] by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/01/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/01/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 SEE CORRECTED ORDER AT DKT. NO. #358 .ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #333 Motion for Sanctions. Request for fees and costs due by 11/16/2018. Objections due by 11/30/2018. Response due by 12/7/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) Modified on 11/28/2018 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2018 Filing 344 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2018 re #333 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37 filed by Julia Bernstein. Total Time in Court: 43 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 343 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Julia Bernstein. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/14/2018. Replies due by 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Monique Olivier ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Judgment for a Sum Certain, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order [Proposed] Judgment)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES re #341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines filed by Julia Bernstein. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings due by 10/31/2018. Responses due by 11/14/2018. Replies due by 11/21/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial conference statement due by 2/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Bench Trial set for 3/4/2019 - 3/14/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 31, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 341 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Deadlines filed by Julia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 340 REPLY (re #333 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37 ) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Supplemental] of Monique Olivier)(Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 339 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 and Statement due date of 10/17/2018 are VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 338 EXHIBITS to re #336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - [Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Opposition to FRCP 37 Motion] filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F to Villarreal Declaration, #2 Exhibit G to Villarreal Declaration, #3 Exhibit H to Villarreal Declaration, #4 Exhibit I to Villarreal Declaration, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N, #11 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #336 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 337 EXHIBITS to re #336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - [Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37] filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Declaration of Valentin Estevezs in Support of Opposition to Motion Pursuant to FRCP 37, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E to Declaration of Valentin Estevez, #4 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #336 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Declaration of Laura Crisp in Support of Opposition to Motion, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit C)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 335 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #333 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37) filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 334 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on August 15, 2018, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: 2:09 - 2:58 pm. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #331 Transcript Order, #328 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2018. (Related document(s) #331 , #328 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 333 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 37 filed by Julia Bernstein. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/27/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/1/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/15/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #329 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Julia Bernstein. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Rule 37 motion regarding Defendants' Career Choice defense; 9/6/2018. Responses due by 9/27/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Deadline to file proposed stipulated judgment and/or any motion for judgment on the following issues: (1) revised damages report; (2) declaratory relief; (3) PAGA penalties 10/25/2018. Responses due 11/8/2018. Replies due 11/15/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 329 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/15/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/15/2018. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 12/7/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Bench Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. FTR Time: 2:09 - 2:58 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2018) Modified on 8/16/2018: Matter transcribed by Raynee Mercado. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2018 Filing 326 STIPULATION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41 filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 4, 2018 Filing 325 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/01/2018, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 9:48 a.m. - 10:32 a.m. = 44 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #322 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2018. (Related documents(s) #322 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 8/4/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER TO PRO TEM REPORTER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 1, 2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/01/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 321 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/1/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. FTR Time: 9:48 - 10:32 AM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2018) Modified on 8/1/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2018 Filing 320 NOTICE OF ERRATA to re #319 Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Joint Case Management Conference Statement)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 319 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE of Change of Address by Chiharu Gina Sekino Attorney of Record for Plaintiffs (Sekino, Chiharu) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 9, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2018 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING #225 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #286 Motion to Strike. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER RE: #226 MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER DENYING #295 MOTION FOR STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 314 Supplemental Disclosure Statement of Defendants Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 313 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Price (T. Rowe) Associates, Inc. for Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.. - Supplemental Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Defendants (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald Scott Kravitz (Kravitz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 310 ANSWER to #298 Third Amended Complaint; byAlaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America, Inc.(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/18/2018) Modified on 4/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alison L. Kosinski - Change of Address of Plaintiffs' Counsel Alison Kosinski and Emily Thiagaraj (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 308 REPLY (re #295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay; Memorandum in Support Thereof) - Reply Memorandum of Defendant Virgin America Inc. in Further Support of its Motion for Temporary Stay - [Correction to Docket #307] filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 307 REPLY (re #295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay; Memorandum in Support Thereof]) - Reply Memorandum of Defendant Virgin America Inc. in Further Support of its Motion for Temporary Stay filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 306 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Monique Olivier affiliated with Olivier Schreiber & Chao LLP (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 305 Answer of Defendant Virgin America Inc. to re #298 Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 304 Declaration of Monique Olivier in Support of #303 Opposition/Response to Defendant's Motion for Stay filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #303 ) (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 303 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay; Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Stay)(Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julia Bernstein re #298 Amended Complaint (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2018 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2018 - 11/13/2018 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2018. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 300 Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 299 Proposed Summons. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 298 THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Demand against Virgin America, Inc. & Alaska Airlines, Inc.. Filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #293 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Julia Bernstein. Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 296 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of #295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #295 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 295 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Stay; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/30/2018. Replies due by 4/6/2018. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Granting Virgin's Motion for Temporary Stay)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 294 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/8/18, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #292 Transcript Order, #290 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2018. (Related documents(s) #292 , #290 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 293 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/8/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 291 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/08/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 289 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2018 re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein, #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc. Total Time in Court: 58 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 288 EXHIBITS 64, 67 to Kosinski Declaration, Submitted Pursuant to Order Denying Admin Mtn to File Under Seal filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 67)(Related document(s) #282 ) (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 287 Plaintiffs' Objection Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(d)(1) to re #281 Supplemental Declaration of Valentin Estevez filed by Julia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 286 Objection and Motion to Strike Portions of re #282 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Order filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of RJ Hendricks ISO Objection and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MSJ and Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Granting Objection and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply ISO MSJ and Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER RE:PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 284 Summons on Second Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Alaska Air Group, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #268 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 282 REPLY (re #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Kosinski ISO Plaintiffs' Reply on Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 61, #3 Exhibit 62, #4 Exhibit 63, #5 Exhibit 64, #6 Exhibit 65, #7 Exhibit 66, #8 Exhibit 67, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment and Denying Decertification)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 281 Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of #279 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #279 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 280 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #279 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PP, #2 Exhibit QQ, #3 Exhibit RR, #4 Exhibit SS, #5 Exhibit TT, #6 Exhibit UU, #7 Exhibit VV, #8 Exhibit WW, #9 Exhibit XX)(Related document(s) #279 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 279 REPLY (re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action ) filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Reply to Pltfs' Mtn for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier ISO Admin Mtn to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Alison Kosinski ISO Pltfs' Mtn for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 64 - SEAL, #5 Exhibit 67 - SEAL, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 277 Proposed Summons. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 276 CLASS ACTION SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. Filed by Julia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #274 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 274 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 273 EXHIBITS re #258 Exhibits - Exhibit 56 to Kosinski Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendant's Mtn for Decertification, Submitted Pursuant to Order re Plaintiffs' Admin Mtn to Seal filed by Julia Bernstein. (Related document(s) #258 ) (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #274 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 3/7/2018. Replies due by 3/14/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 271 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Opposition to Motion to Decertify - [Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5(D) to File Documents Regarding Defendant Virgin America Inc. Under Seal filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #255 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re #255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Opposition to Motion to Decertify filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 268 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge re #247 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 2/26/2018. Replies due by 3/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief, #2 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal ISO Motion for Relief, #3 Exhibit A to Villarreal Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Villarreal Declaration)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 267 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #225 [Opposition of Defendant Virgin America Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 266 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #262 Opposition/Response of Defendant Virgin America Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 265 EXHIBITS to re #260 Declaration in Support - Exhibits Q-DD filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit X, #8 Exhibit Y, #9 Exhibit Z, #10 Exhibit AA, #11 Exhibit BB, #12 Exhibit CC, #13 Exhibit DD)(Related document(s) #260 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 264 Declaration of Valerie Jenkins in Support of #262 pposition/Response to Motion; -[Declaration of Valerie Jenkins in Support of Opposition of Defendant Virgin America Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #262 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 263 Exhibits K - P to re #260 Declaration in Support filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #260 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 262 Opposition/Response of Defendant Virgin America, Inc. to re #225 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 261 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 260 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 259 Exhibits 30-60 to re #258 Declaration of Alison Kosinski ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Decertification filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30 pt2, #2 Exhibit 30 pt3, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit 38, #11 Exhibit 39, #12 Exhibit 40, #13 Exhibit 41, #14 Exhibit 42, #15 Exhibit 43, #16 Exhibit 44, #17 Exhibit 45, #18 Exhibit 46, #19 Exhibit 47, #20 Exhibit 48, #21 Exhibit 49, #22 Exhibit 50, #23 Exhibit 51, #24 Exhibit 52, #25 Exhibit 53, #26 Exhibit 54, #27 Exhibit 55, #28 Exhibit 56, #29 Exhibit 57, #30 Exhibit 58, #31 Exhibit 59, #32 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) #258 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 258 [Redacted] Declaration of Alison Kosinski in Support of Opposition to Motion for Decertification with Exhibits 1-29 filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27 pt1, #28 Exhibit 27 pt2, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julia Bernstein of re #255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Opposition to Motion to Decertify (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Opposition to Motion to Decertify filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Alison Kosinski - TO SEAL, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 27 pt1, #8 Exhibit 27 pt2, #9 Exhibit 27 pt3, #10 Exhibit 27 pt4, #11 Exhibit 28 pt1, #12 Exhibit 28 pt2, #13 Exhibit 28 pt3, #14 Exhibit 28 pt4, #15 Exhibit 29 pt1, #16 Exhibit 29 pt2, #17 Exhibit 29 pt3, #18 Exhibit 30 pt1, #19 Exhibit 30 pt2, #20 Exhibit 30 pt3, #21 Exhibit 30 pt4, #22 Exhibit 31 pt1, #23 Exhibit 31 pt2, #24 Exhibit 32, #25 Exhibit 54, #26 Exhibit 56)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar. The #253 Stipulation regarding enlargement of briefs is denied.This is a text-only order; there is no document associated with this entry. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 253 Joint Stipulation Regarding Enlargement of Briefs; [Proposed Order filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 3, 2018 Filing 252 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/29/2018, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 8:30 a.m. - 8:42 a.m. = 12 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #248 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 2/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2018. (Related documents(s) #248 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 250 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (HEARINGS WERE NOT REPORTED OR RECORDED) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/15/2017; 07/28/2017; 12/06/2017 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 2/6/2018 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2018 Filing 249 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (HEARING NOT REPORTED OR RECORDED) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/20/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 1/31/2018 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2018 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2018 Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/30/2018) Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 1/31/2018 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2018 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2018: Removed special note. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/29/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 1/29/2018. Defendant's Motion to Strike is denied. Court to issue order. (FTR Time: 8:30-8:42.)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Monique Olivier; Alison Kosinski. Attorneys for Defendant: Robert J. Hendricks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2018) Modified on 2/6/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #224 Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79.5(D) to File Documents Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 244 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #224 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 243 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for January 25, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. All counsel must appear in person. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing: Discovery Hearing reset for 1/29/2018 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 242 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re #224 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 19, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 240 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #225 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action. Responses due by 2/8/2018. Replies due by 2/22/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Updating briefing schedule per the #211 STIPULATION AND ORDER. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 239 Discovery Letter Brief with Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 238 Exhibits AA - OO to re #236 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF, #6 Exhibit GG, #7 Exhibit HH, #8 Exhibit II, #9 Exhibit JJ, #10 Exhibit KK, #11 Exhibit LL, #12 Exhibit MM, #13 Exhibit NN, #14 Exhibit OO)(Related document(s) #236 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 237 Exhibits O - Z to the re #236 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U, #7 Exhibit V, #8 Exhibit W, #9 Exhibit X, #10 Exhibit Y, #11 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) #236 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 236 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, Part 1, #4 Exhibit K, Part 2, #5 Exhibit L, Part 1, #6 Exhibit L, Part 2, #7 Exhibit M, Part 1, #8 Exhibit M, Part 2, #9 Exhibit N, Part 1, #10 Exhibit N, Part 2)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 235 Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 234 Declaration of Richard Hendrickson in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 233 Declaration of Valerie Jenkins in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 232 EXHIBITS 21-60 in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27 part 1, #7 Exhibit 27 part 2, #8 Exhibit 28 part 1, #9 Exhibit 28 part 2, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30 part 1, #12 Exhibit 30 part 2, #13 Exhibit 30 part 3, #14 Exhibit 31, #15 Exhibit 32, #16 Exhibit 33, #17 Exhibit 34, #18 Exhibit 35, #19 Exhibit 36, #20 Exhibit 37, #21 Exhibit 38, #22 Exhibit 39, #23 Exhibit 40, #24 Exhibit 41, #25 Exhibit 42, #26 Exhibit 43, #27 Exhibit 44, #28 Exhibit 45, #29 Exhibit 46, #30 Exhibit 47, #31 Exhibit 48, #32 Exhibit 49, #33 Exhibit 50, #34 Exhibit 51, #35 Exhibit 52, #36 Exhibit 53, #37 Exhibit 54, #38 Exhibit 55, #39 Exhibit 56, #40 Exhibit 57, #41 Exhibit 59, #42 Exhibit 60, #43 Exhibit 58)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 231 Declaration of Steven Trupkin in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 230 Declaration of Yvette Hau-Lepera in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 229 Declaration of Barry Valentine in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 228 Declaration of Michael Boyd in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 227 Declaration of Darin Lee in Support of re #226 MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Decertification of Class Action filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 225 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Julia Bernstein. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/8/2018. Replies due by 2/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Kosinski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 224 Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79.5(d) to File Documents Under Seal filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Declaration of Alison Kosinski, #5 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 4- Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 27 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 28 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 29 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 30 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 31 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 32 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 33 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 51- Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 52 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 54 - Unredacte, #18 Exhibit 56 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 57 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 47 - Unredacted)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENDAN KILLEEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #222 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brendan Killeen, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12013250) filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Scott Kravitz for Plaintiffs (Kravitz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #218 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 219 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #218 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Second Motion for Summary Judgment re #214 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Monique Olivier, #(2) Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Order)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 218 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment re #214 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of Amended Administrative Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Granting Amended Administrative Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 217 Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Virgin America Inc. [Dkt. 214] (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2017. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #210 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 214 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 213 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. This matter is set for a Telephonic Case Management Conference on 12/6/2017 at 2:00 PM. A Case Management Statement is due 12/4/2017 by 12:00 PM. Not less than 24 hours before the conference the parties shall email to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) one number at which all attorneys appearing by telephone can be reached. Due to the number of hearings scheduled for 12/6/2017, it may be some time after 2:00 PM before the Court can join the call. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 212 CLERK'S NOTICE NOTIFYING PARTIES OF DENIED MOTION as to #204 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. The Court has not issued an order denying the motion or setting a briefing schedule within 14 days of filing the motion. Per Civil L.R. 72-2 the motion is deemed denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017).
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #207 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES filed by Julia Bernstein. Deadline for production of rebuttal reports 12/27/2017. Deadline for completion of expert discovery 1/10/2018. Deadline to file dispositive motions or motions to decertify 1/12/2018. Deadline to file oppositions to dispositive motions or motions to decertify 2/8/2018. Deadline to file replies in support of dispositive motions or motions to decertify 2/22/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 210 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge re #205 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2017. Replies due by 12/18/2017. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Order of Magistrate Judge)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 209 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #206 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 207 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2 filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11899251). filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing)(Zipperian, Nathan) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #203 Defendant's Request to Obtain Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 204 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #202 Order filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 11/20/2017. Replies due by 11/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, #2 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Defendant's Motion for Relief from Order of Magistrate Judge, #3 Exhibit A to Villarreal Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Villarreal Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Villarreal Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Villarreal Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Villarreal Declaration)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 203 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Defendant's Request to Obtain Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37 filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit C - Email exchange between Parties)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/23/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #198 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admissibility of Documents and Depositions filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 200 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 199 Letter from RJ Hendricks - Joint Discovery Letter. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 198 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admissibility of Documents and Depositions filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #192 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS #193 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 193 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 192 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 189] re #189 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/17/2017. Replies due by 10/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 189], #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 189])(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN DEADLINES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by Virgin America, Inc. Deadline for parties to finalize deposition schedule 9/29/2017. Fact discovery cutoff 10/9/2017. Deadline for Defendant to provide responsive documents 10/9/2017. Deadline for completion of outstanding depositions 10/27/2017. Deadline for production of expert reports 11/10/2017. Deadline for production of rebuttal reports 12/1/2017. Deadline for completion expert discovery 12/12/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions or motions to decertify 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN DEADLINES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #186 Defendant's Discovery Request (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 188 Discovery Letter Brief - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Discovery Letter Brief filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 187 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to a change in the Court's schedule and with the consent of the parties, the Telephonic Case Management Conference previously set for 10/13/2017 is advanced to 10/11/2017 at 10:00 AM. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 186 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #179 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Kolin Tang as counsel of record for Plaintiffs (Tang, Kolin) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Miller as counsel of record for Plaintiffs (Miller, James) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Chiharu Gina Sekino as counsel of record for Plaintiffs (Sekino, Chiharu) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Shah as counsel of record for Plaintiffs (Shah, James) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 180 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/27/2017, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 11:16 a.m. - 11:44 a.m. = 28 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #178 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2017. (Related documents(s) #178 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #175 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/25/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nancy Villarreal, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nancy Villarreal)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 177 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 7/31/2017) Modified on 7/31/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/1/2017 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2017 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2017. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2017. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2017 at 2:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 13 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ABSENT CLASS MEMBER DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/28/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Dkt. Nos. #165 & #172 held on 7/27/2017. Court to issue order. (FTR Time 11:16-11:44.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Monique Olivier. Attorneys for Defendant: Robert Hendricks; Nancy Villarreal. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2017) Modified on 8/1/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2017 Filing 173 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 25, 2017 Filing 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #170 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Hearing. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing: Discovery Hearing reset for 7/27/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 170 Joint Stipulation to Continue Discovery Hearing; [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for July 11, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #166 Joint STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #164 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 166 JOINT STIPULATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 165 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery of Absent Class Members filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents to Each Absent Class Member, Set One, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Request for Production of Documents to Each Absent Class Member, Set Two, #3 Exhibit C - Response to Defendant's Interrogatories to Each Absent Class Member, Set One)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 164 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #159 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/7/2017. Replies due by 7/14/2017. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge [Dkt. No. 159])(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 161 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2017. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2017. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 2:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 160 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT for Telephonic Case Management Conference on 6/20/17 filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #156 Defendant's Request for Plaintiffs' Tax Returns. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017) Modified on 6/12/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2017 at 12:00 p.m. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 157 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 156 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendant's Request for Plaintiffs' Income Tax Returns filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-E)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Dkt. No. #154 held on 5/18/2017. Defendant to file supplemental briefing re: tax returns by 5/23/2017. Plaintiff to respond by 5/26/2017. Defendant to reply by 5/30/2017. The Court will then take the matter submission. (FTR Time 9:08-9:22.)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Monique Olivier; Alison Kosinski. Attorneys for Defendant: R.J. Hendricks; Nancy Villarreal. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2017) Modified on 5/18/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini.(ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/20/2017 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2017 Filing 154 Joint Statement re. Discovery filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEFrom the parties' most recent Case Management Statement, it does not appear that there is a need for this afternoon's Telephonic Case Management Conference. Accordingly, the Telephonic Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 2:00 p.m. today is CONTINUED to June 16, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. An updated Joint Case Management Statement is due June 14, 2017. The Court notes Defendant's request, in the parties' most recent Case Management Statement, that the Court continue the current case deadlines. Defendant's request is premature: it depends on the existence of discovery disputes that have not yet been adjudicated and, in some cases, on discovery that has not yet been propounded. The Court therefore denies the request without prejudice. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 4/7/2017) This is a text-only order; there is no document associated with this entry.
April 7, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2017. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 2:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 152 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #127 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER REGARDING FORM OF PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE re #147 Joint Submission re Class Notice filed by Julia Bernstein, #148 Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of form, #149 Defendant's Proposed Class Notice filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 149 Statement in Support of re #147 Defendant's Proposed Class Notice filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 148 Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of form of re #147 Proposed Class Notice filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 147 Joint Submission re Class Notice filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 146 EXHIBITS 53 to Kosinski Supp. Decl. ISO Motion for Class Certification, Submitted Pursuant to Order Denying in Part Mtn to Seal filed byJulia Bernstein. (Thiagaraj, Emily) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Thiagaraj, Emily) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 144 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #143 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2017. (Related documents(s) #143 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 28, 2017 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing re: docket no. #128 held on 2/27/2017. Court to issue order. (FTR Time 3:01-3:33.)Plaintiff Attorneys: Alison Kosinski & Monique Olivier. Defendant Attorneys: Robert J. Hendricks & Nancy Villarreal. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2017) Modified on 2/28/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REGARDING #128 DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.( jsclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE PLAN. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 139 EXHIBITS 39, 40 to Kosinski Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Mtn for Summary Judgment, Submitted Pursuant to Order Denying in Part Mtn to Seal filed byJulia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER as modified by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley; granting #135 Joint Stipulation To Continue Discovery Hearing. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing: Discovery Hearing reset for 2/27/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 20, 2017 Filing 137 Statement re #134 Statement of Plaintiffs In Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice Plan filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/20/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 135 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER To Continue Discovery Hearing filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 16, 2017 Filing 134 Statement of Defendant Virgin America, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Work E-mail Addresses of the Class by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 16, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 Filing 133 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery Hearing set for 2/23/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2017 at 12:00 PM. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 THIRD SCHEDULING ORDER. Fact discovery cut-off 9/22/2017. Expert disclosures 10/13/2017. Expert rebuttal 11/3/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 11/17/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions or motions to decertify the class 12/8/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 3/27/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2018 - 6/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/15/2017. Total Time in Court: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 128 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for an Order Certifying the Summary Judgment Order for Interlocutory Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 126 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 125 Certificate of Interested Entities by Virgin America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Alaska Air Group for Virgin America, Inc.. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities - [Supplemental Certificate of Interested Parties] (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC to February 15, 2017 filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC to February 15, 2017 filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Further Case Management Conference on 2/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/30/2017 at 5:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #97 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 22, 2016 Filing 120 Supplemental Brief re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment [Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment] filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 119 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to re #97 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2016 re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc. FTR Time 2:09 p.m. to 3:20 p.m. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2016) Modified on 4/3/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2016 Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE REMINDING PARTIES OF LOCATION OF HEARING. The hearing on the #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 12/13/2016 at 2:00 PM will be held in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #114 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant Virgin America Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 114 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant Virgin America Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION OF HEARING as to #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 at 2:00 PM will be held in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY to Response of Defendant Virgin America to the FRCP Rule 56(D) Declaratioin of Monique Olivier (re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 111 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #100 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 110 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of #109 Response filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF, #6 Exhibit GG, #7 Exhibit HH, #8 Exhibit II, #9 Exhibit JJ, #10 Exhibit KK, #11 Exhibit LL, #12 Exhibit MM, #13 Exhibit NN)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 109 Response of Defendant Virgin America, Inc. to FRCP Rule 56(d) Declaration of Monique Olivier re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 108 Supplemental Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of re #97 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit F-1, #5 Exhibit G-1, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V, #10 Exhibit W, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit Y, #13 Exhibit Z, #14 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 107 REPLY (re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment); -Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Point & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 18, 2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Julia Bernstein, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 105 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/18/16, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #103 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Related documents(s) #103 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #70 Motion to Certify Class; denying #74 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 18, 2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Virgin America, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 102 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment), with CORRECTED Table of Contents filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Alison Kosinski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Declaration Monique Olivier per FRCP 56(d), #50 Exhibit A, #51 Exhibit B, #52 Exhibit C-J)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Plaintiffs' Opp to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier, #2 Declaration of Alison Kosinski, #3 Exhibit 38 SEAL, #4 Exhibit 39 SEAL, #5 Exhibit 40 SEAL, #6 Exhibit 41 SEAL, #7 Exhibit 42 SEAL, #8 Exhibit 43 SEAL, #9 Exhibit 44 SEAL, #10 Exhibit 45 SEAL, #11 Exhibit 46 SEAL, #12 Exhibit 47 SEAL, #13 Proposed Order)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2016 re #70 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Lisa Marie Smith, Esther Garcia, Julia Bernstein. Further Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2016. Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 98 Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of #97 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment [Amended Declaration of Valentin Estevez] filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit R-1)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 97 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/31/2016. Replies due by 11/7/2016. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virgin America, Inc. of Declaration of Nancy Villarreal Submitted Conditionally Under Seal (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pursuant to Local Rule 79.5(d)) Documents Regarding Defendant in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Defendant's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal [Conditionally Lodged Under Seal], #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #74 MOTION to Strike the Report of David Breshears filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #88 Administrative Motion To Set The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 92 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Exhibits re Reply Brief ISO Class Certification filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #83 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 10, 2016 Filing 91 RESPONSE to (re #88 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Set The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 [Correction to DKT #86]) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Supplement)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 10, 2016 Filing 90 EXHIBITS 19, 28 to re #90 Motion for Class Certification filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Mtn for Class Cert - Submitted Pursuant to Order Denying in Part Mtn to Seal, #2 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Mtn for Class Cert - Submitted Pursuant to Order Denying in Part Mtn to Seal)(Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 89 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of #88 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Set The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 - [Correction to DKT # 87] filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #88 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 88 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Set The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 - [Correction to DKT #86] filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2016. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 87 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of #86 MOTION To Set the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION To Set the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 85 EXHIBITS to re #83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Exhibits re Reply Brief ISO Class Certification - Proof of Service of Unredacted Exhibits filed by Julia Bernstein. (Related document(s) #83 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 84 REPLY (re #83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Exhibits re Reply Brief ISO Class Certification, #70 MOTION to Certify Class Submitted Pursuant to Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits On The Parties' Class Certification Briefing, #50 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' ) filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Breshears, #2 Declaration Alison Kosinski, Redacted, #3 Exhibit 42, #4 Exhibit 43, Redacted, #5 Exhibit 44, #6 Exhibit 45, #7 Exhibit 46, Redacted, #8 Exhibit 47, #9 Exhibit 48, #10 Exhibit 49, #11 Exhibit 50, #12 Exhibit 51, Redacted, #13 Exhibit 52, #14 Exhibit 53, Redacted, #15 Exhibit 54)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Exhibits re Reply Brief ISO Class Certification filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Monique Olivier, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 43, Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 46, Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 51, Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 53, Unredacted)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 82 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #81 Reply to Opposition/Response; -Supplemental Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of Reply Regarding Virgin America Inc.'s Motion to Strike the Report of David Breshears filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Z, #(2) Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY (re #74 MOTION to Strike the Report of David Breshears; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 79 RESPONSE to (re #74 MOTION to Strike the Report of David Breshears; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Monique Olivier, #(2) Exhibit 1, #(3) Exhibit 2, #(4) Exhibit 3, #(5) Exhibit 4, #(6) Declaration of David Breshears) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2016. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/1/2016. Replies due by 11/15/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 77 Declaration of Robert Jon Hendricks in Support of #76 Opposition/Response to Motion, re: Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 76 RESPONSE to (re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virgin America, Inc. of Document Submitted Conditionally Under Seal (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION to Strike the Report of David Breshears; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/29/2016. Replies due by 10/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike the report of David Breshears)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 73 Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of #71 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit R-1, #3 Exhibit R-2)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 72 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #71 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, Part 1 of 5, #17 Exhibit P, Part 2 of 5, #18 Exhibit P, Part 3 of 5, #19 Exhibit P, Part 4 of 5, #20 Exhibit P, Part 5 of 5, #21 Exhibit Q, Part 1 of 7, #22 Exhibit Q, Part 2 of 7, #23 Exhibit Q, Part 3 of 7, #24 Exhibit Q, Part 4 of 7, #25 Exhibit Q, Part 5 of 7, #26 Exhibit Q, Part 6 of 7, #27 Exhibit Q, Part 7 of 7, #28 Exhibit S, #29 Exhibit T, #30 Exhibit U, #31 Exhibit V, #32 Exhibit W, #33 Exhibit X, #34 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 71 RESPONSE (re #70 MOTION to Certify Class Submitted Pursuant to Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits On The Parties' Class Certification Briefing ) filed byVirgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denyinjg Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Richard Hendrickson, #3 Declaration of Valerie Jenkins, #4 Declaration of Matthew Kliff, #5 Declaration of Jon Weaver)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION to Certify Class Submitted Pursuant to Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits On The Parties' Class Certification Briefing filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia, Lisa Marie Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/15/2016. Replies due by 10/6/2016. (Thiagaraj, Emily) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 13, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE by Virgin America, Inc. re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support - Of Intent to File Oppositon to Plaintiff's Motion To Enlarge Time to File Opposition (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 67 [Proposed] Order Granting re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 66 Declaration of Valentin Estevez in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit R)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 65 Declaration of Jon Weaver in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 64 Declaration of Matthew Kliff in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 63 Declaration of Valerie Jenkins in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 62 Declaration of Richard Hendrickson in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 61 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P (Part 1 of 5), #17 Exhibit P (Part 2 of 5), #18 Exhibit P (Part 3 of 5), #19 Exhibit P (Part 4 of 5), #20 Exhibit P (Part 5 of 5), #21 Exhibit Q (Part 1 of 7), #22 Exhibit Q (Part 2 of 7), #23 Exhibit Q (Part 3 of 7), #24 Exhibit Q (Part 4 of 7), #25 Exhibit Q (Part 5 of 7), #26 Exhibit Q (Part 6 of 7), #27 Exhibit Q (Part 7 of 7))(Related document(s) #60 ) (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Virgin America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/20/2016. Replies due by 9/27/2016. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 59 Declaration of Nancy Villarreal in Support of #43 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Villarreal for Defendant Virgin America, Inc. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE re #54 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #50 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs'. Responses due by 9/15/2016. Replies due by 10/6/2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Filing 55 Joint Administrative MOTION Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 to Extend the Page Limits on the Parties' Class Certification Briefing and Extend the Deadline for Defendants' Opposition Brief; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-12 filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Page Limits and Extend Deadline for Defendant's Opp. Brief)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 54 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #52 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Villarreal, Nancy) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the #50 MOTION to Certify Class and Further Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 10/06/2016 are continued to 10/18/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The motion briefing schedule remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Class Certification Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 23(b); Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Julia Bernstein. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/1/2016. Replies due by 9/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Kosinski ISO Motion w Redacted Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 3-5, #4 Exhibit 6-7, #5 Exhibit 8-10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18, #14 Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit 20-21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23-25, #18 Exhibit 26-28, #19 Exhibit 29, #20 Exhibit 30-34, #21 Exhibit 35, #22 Exhibit 36-39, #23 Exhibit 40-41, #24 Declaration of Monique Olivier ISO Motion, #25 Declaration of Emily Thiagaraj ISO Motion, #26 Proposed Order)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 49 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 48 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 19, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 27-28)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 47 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 12 part 1, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 12 part 2, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 16 part 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 16 part 2, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 16 part 3, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 16 part 4, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 16 part 5)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 46 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 9 part 1, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 9 part 2, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 9 part 3, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 9 part 4, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 9 part 5, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 10 part 1, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 10 part 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 10 part 3, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 10 part 4)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 45 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 8 part 1 - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit Ex 8 part 2 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit Ex 8 part 3 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit Ex 8 part 4 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit Ex 8 part 5 - Unredacted)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 44 EXHIBITS re #43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed byJulia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 2, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Ex 3-4)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' filed by Julia Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique Olivier ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion for Class Cert - Redacted, #4 Motion for Class Cert - Unredacted)(Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 41 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Joint Agenda due by 6/29/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2016 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 39 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court sets a Case Management Conference for 6/10/2016 at 1:30 PM. A joint agenda is due by 6/8/2016. Please email the Courtroom Deputy Clerk one number at which all counsel can be reached for the conference. jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #36 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Class Certification Briefing and Hearing filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 36 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Class Certification Briefing and Hearing filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
December 18, 2015 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/18/2015. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2015)
December 16, 2015 Filing 34 JOINT AGENDA FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 33 AMENDMENT to the ANSWER to re #32 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Tomlin, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 32 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Virgin America, Inc.. Filed by Julia Bernstein, Esther Garcia & Lisa Marie Smith. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2015. Agenda due by 12/16/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Stipulated Request For Leave to File Amended ComplaintThe parties' Stipulated Request for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 29, is GRANTED. The issuance of this order does not effect the filing of the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must separately file their First Amended Complaint within five court days of the issuance of this order.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 30, 2015 Filing 29 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Permit Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Julia Bernstein. (Olivier, Monique) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; -Joint Agenda for Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #26 Stipulation filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2015 will begin at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The conference agenda remains due by 10/28/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2015. Case Management Agenda due by 10/28/2015. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Court Reporter: Not reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Virgin America, Inc. filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and F.R.C.P. Rule 26(f) Report filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Tomlin, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Virgin America, Inc. filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Tomlin, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Virgin America, Inc. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 17 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Julia Bernstein (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alison L. Kosinski (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison L. Kosinski (Kosinski, Alison) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/5/2015. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virgin America, Inc. re #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Tomlin, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Virgin America, Inc... (Tomlin, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel /Filing and Service of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by Robert Jon Hendricks on behalf of Virgin America, Inc. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2015 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 20, 2015 Answer to Removal Complaint by Virgin America, Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virgin America, Inc. re #4 Statement, #2 Notice (Other), #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 4 Statement [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement] by Virgin America, Inc.. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Virgin America, Inc. (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE by Virgin America, Inc. of Related Cases (Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-15-544804, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-9537858). Filed by Virgin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Declaration of Diane Chandra in Support of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendricks, Robert Jon) (Filed on 5/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein et al v. Virgin America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Bernstein
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: Alison L. Kosinski
Represented By: Chiharu Gina Sekino
Represented By: Emily Ann Thiagaraj
Represented By: Hannah Marie Shirey
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan Curtis Zipperian
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Garcia
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: Alison L. Kosinski
Represented By: Chiharu Gina Sekino
Represented By: Emily Ann Thiagaraj
Represented By: Hannah Marie Shirey
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan Curtis Zipperian
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Smith
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: Alison L. Kosinski
Represented By: Chiharu Gina Sekino
Represented By: Emily Ann Thiagaraj
Represented By: Hannah Marie Shirey
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Nathan Curtis Zipperian
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Aleksandr Markelov
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Brendan T Killeen
Represented By: Jennifer Adkins Tomlin
Represented By: Maureen Nicole Beckley
Represented By: Nancy Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group
Represented By: Aleksandr Markelov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Aleksandr Markelov
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Brendan T Killeen
Represented By: Maureen Nicole Beckley
Represented By: Nancy Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?