Jimenez et al v. Menzies Aviation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Jimenez and Orlando Mijos
Defendant: Menzies Aviation Inc and Menzies Aviation Group (USA) Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv02392
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
July 22, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 13, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick re 42 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' counsel should file a declaration justifying their fees and providing an itemization of the fees and costs associated this motion within 14 days of this Order. Menzies may thereafter file a response within 7 days addressing the reasonableness of the request. No reply brief or hearing is necessary absent further court order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 4, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 50 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 6/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
December 15, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLASS DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION FILING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/15/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
September 23, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S 28 MOTION FOR PARTIAL STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
August 17, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 11 Motion to Compel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez et al v. Menzies Aviation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jimenez
Represented By: Vilmarie Cordero
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Mijos
Represented By: Vilmarie Cordero
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menzies Aviation Inc
Represented By: Archana R Acharya
Represented By: Kristy K. Marino
Represented By: Christopher Gary Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menzies Aviation Group (USA) Inc
Represented By: Archana R Acharya
Represented By: Kristy K. Marino
Represented By: Christopher Gary Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?