C. v. Blue Shield of California

Plaintiff: Krysten C.
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Case Number: 4:2015cv02421
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
May 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING AND SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/27/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
September 24, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Bench Trial set for 8/29/2016 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysten C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Katherine Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Joseph Edward Laska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?