J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Maria Guada Mendoza De Corona

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Maria Guada Mendoza De Corona
Case Number: 4:2015cv02473
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 26 Notice (Other) filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 2/12/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing due 2/5/16.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/20/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; WAIVING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRE-FILING CONFERENCE REQUIREMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 11, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 19 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
October 2, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, Case referred to ADR for mediation to be completed by 12/18/15. Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2015. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 1/8/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2015. One day Bench Trial set for 5/23/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2016 02:00 P M in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for 4/8/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 23, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Filing due 9/25/2015 at noon. Request for telephonic appearance is DENIED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/23/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Maria Guada Mendoza De Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Guada Mendoza De Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?