Bem v. Stryker Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James Bem
Defendant: Stryker Corporation, Norman Cheung, Saint Rose Medical Building, Inc., Hayward Sisters Hospital, Inc. and Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv02485
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND. Stryker's motion is granted, and the above-titled action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 14, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing scheduled for October 16, 2015, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 14, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 21, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. The hearing is continued to October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 21, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 2, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court continues the Case Management Conference to December 18, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
July 29, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Stryker's motion to dismiss is granted, and Bem's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Bem shall file his Third Amended Complaint no later than August 19, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 1, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(e)(7) and the Court's Standing Orders by immediately submitting a chambers copy of his second amended complaint. Plaintiff is hereby advised that if he fails in the future to comply with the Court's Standing Orders to provide a chambers copy of each electronically-filed document, the Court may impose sanctions, including, but not limited to, striking from the record any electronically-filed document of which a chambers copy has not been timely provided to the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bem v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bem
Represented By: Lawrence Alan Strick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Mario Horwitz
Represented By: James Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Cheung
Represented By: Ricardo Artemio Martinez, Esq.
Represented By: Robert Michael Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Rose Medical Building, Inc.
Represented By: Marc G. Cowden
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Sisters Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Marc G. Cowden
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Marc G. Cowden
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?