Juan Lucero, Jr. v. John Ettare, et al
Plaintiff: Juan Lucero, Jr.
Defendant: John Ettare and City of Berkeley
Case Number: 4:2015cv02654
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Dismissing Case with Prejudice; Denying as Moot 112 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by City of Berkeley Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 33 SERVICE AND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/12/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Parties to file required declaration within 7 days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/03/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 19 Motion to Substitute Party; referring case to magistrate judge for settlement; continuing case management conference to April 12, 2016 at 1:30 p.m.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016) Modified on 1/12/2016 (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Lucero, Jr. v. John Ettare, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ettare
Represented By: Lynne Sarah Bourgault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Lynne Sarah Bourgault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lucero, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?