Moralez v. Circle A Foodmart and Gas et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: Circle A Foodmart and Gas and Gurnath Singh
Case Number: 4:2015cv02759
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Michael Welch's 54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 11-5(b), counsel shall continue to receive notices via ECF and shall forward all documents unto his former clients until a substitution of counsel is filed. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
February 28, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER imposing sanctions in the amount of $500.00 on counsel Michael Welch for failure to appear at the January 31, 2017 case management conference. Sanctions shall be paid to the Clerk of the U.S. District Court by 3/15/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/28/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 2, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants' Show Cause Response due by 2/14/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/2/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
November 14, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Francisca Moralez Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
October 19, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 31 Order to Show Cause; ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 11/15/2016 01:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/19/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 2, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to all parties for Failure to Appear at the 8/30/16 Case Management Conference. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/2/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
June 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 1, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE GENERAL ORDER 56 AND FOR SANCTIONS 16 .(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
November 4, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/3/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Circle A Foodmart and Gas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Russell Scott Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle A Foodmart and Gas
Represented By: Michael David Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurnath Singh
Represented By: Michael David Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?