Baldwin et al v. Colley et al

Plaintiff: Malad Baldwin and Kathryn Wade
Defendant: James Colley, Casey Brogdon, Antioch Police Department and City of Antioch, California
Case Number: 4:2015cv02762
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal of Entire Action filed by James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/31/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
April 21, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Casey Brogdon. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 20, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/20/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Modified on 4/20/2017 (kawlc2, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant James Colley. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/11/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
July 29, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Antioch Police Department, James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/29/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
March 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Amended Stipulated Protective Order) filed by James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon, Motions terminated: 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOS ED ORDER (Protective Order) filed by James Colley, Casey Brogdon, 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Amended Stipulated Protective Order) filed by James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/22/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Parties to file required declaration within 7 days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/15/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
November 4, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline for Mediation filed by City of Antioch, California, Antioch Police Department, James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/4/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 7, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 10 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint due within 14 days of this amended order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/07/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 2, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 29, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 1, 2015 HEARING RE 10 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 09/29/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 16, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference.Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 2, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Antioch Police Department, Casey Brogdon, City of Antioch, California, James Colley filed by City of Antioch, California, Antioch Police Department, James Colley, Malad Baldwin, Kathryn Wade, Casey Brogdon, Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/2/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathryn Wade, 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Malad Baldwin. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/01/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 25, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF KATHRYN WADE TO FILE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITHIN 14 DAYS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/25/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin et al v. Colley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Brogdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antioch Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malad Baldwin
Represented By: Mark William Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Wade
Represented By: Mark William Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?